This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/05/2016 at 01:28:22 (UTC).

ZELKO SIMONI et al VS. SIAVASH TAHBAZOF et al

Case Summary

On 10/02/2009 ZELKO SIMONI filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SIAVASH TAHBAZOF. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3140

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SIMONI, RENEE

SIMONI, ZELKO

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

PREGO VIEW HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

DOES 1 TO 40, INCLUSIVE

TAHBAZOF, SIAVASH AN INDIVIDUAL

SYTS INVESTMENTS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED COMPANY

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN, CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN OR INTEREST IN THE EASEMENT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFF'S , OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFF'S TITLE TO THE EASEMENT

Cross Defendants

ABINANTI, RAYMOND R.

ABINANTI, STANLEY R.

NANSEN, LINDA L.

ROES 1 THROUGH 40

Other

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KEITH, BRENDA CRUZ

Attorney at BRENDA CRUZ KEITH LAWYER

1965 Market Street, 2Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94103

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

MADDEN, ROSS MCLAURAN

Attorney at ROSS MCLAURAN MADDEN

2001 Union St., Suite 330

San Francisco, CA 94123

QUASHNOCK, MARIE G

 

Court Documents

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF DEC-23-2011 CONTINUED TO MAR-23-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610, FOR DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT FOLLOWING SETTLEMENT; FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FOLLOWING BINDING ARBITRATION OF CROSS COMPLAINT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order To Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR MAY-07-2012 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 2:00 PM TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL AND CROSS COMPLAINANT'S COUNSEL FOR FAILURE TO FILE DISMISSAL OR JUDGMENT. THE MAR-23-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING (PLAINTIFFS ZELKO SIMONI AND RENEE SIMONI) MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SIMONI, ZELKO SIMONI, RENEE SERVED OCT-12-2009, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT TAHBAZOF, SIAVASH AN INDIVIDUAL

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SIMONI, ZELKO SIMONI, RENEE SERVED OCT-12-2009, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT PREGO VIEW HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR APR-19-2010 CONTINUED TO JUN-01-2010 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPT. 212 FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, OR DISMISS DEFENDANT(S) PREGO VIEW HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION. THE APR-19-2010 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

NOTICE OF REMOVAL FROM THE EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM

NOTICE OF REMOVAL FROM THE EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM

NOTICE OF EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE--EARLY SETTLEMENT PRGM

NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM

Notice of Rescheduled Settlement Conference

SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR FEB-07-2011 CONTINUED TO FEB-18-2011 AT 9:00 AM IN 502

CROSS COMPLAINT

CROSS COMPLAINT FILED PER ORDER BY CROSS COMPLAINANT TAHBAZOF, SIAVASH AN INDIVIDUAL SYTS INVESTMENTS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED COMPANY AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT ABINANTI, STANLEY R. ABINANTI, RAYMOND R. NANSEN, LINDA L. ROES 1 THROUGH 40

Order Setting Case Management Conference

REMOVED FROM MASTER COURT CALENDAR ON FEB-22-2011. PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAINANTS PRESENT. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO PRETRIAL DEPT. 610 ON AUG-26-2011 AT 9:00 AM FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR STATUS OF BINDING ARBITRATION. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. (206)

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-26-2011 CONTINUED TO OCT-21-2011 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF BINDING ARBITRATION RE CROSS COMPLAINT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-21-2011 CONTINUED TO DEC-23-2011 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT TAHBAZOF, SIAVASH AN INDIVIDUAL SYTS INVESTMENTS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED COMPANY

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY TAHBAZOF, SIAVASH, SYTS INVESTMENTS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED

Order to Show Cause RE Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385 SET FOR JUN-21-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610. ***FOR PLAINTIFF TO DISMISS CROMPLAINT.*** MAY-07-2012 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order Dismissing Case Pursuant to CRC 3.1385

COMPLAINT DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE BY COURT AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING JUN-21-2012 AT 2:00 PM PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE BY COURT AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING JUN-21-2012 AT 2:00 PM PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2012
  • MINI MINUTES FOR JUN-21-2012 02:00 PM FOR DEPT 610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385 SET FOR JUN-21-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610. ***FOR PLAINTIFF TO DISMISS CROMPLAINT.*** MAY-07-2012 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT TAHBAZOF, SIAVASH AN INDIVIDUAL SYTS INVESTMENTS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR MAY-07-2012 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 2:00 PM TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL AND CROSS COMPLAINANT'S COUNSEL FOR FAILURE TO FILE DISMISSAL OR JUDGMENT. THE MAR-23-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY TAHBAZOF, SIAVASH, SYTS INVESTMENTS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF DEC-23-2011 CONTINUED TO MAR-23-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610, FOR DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT FOLLOWING SETTLEMENT; FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FOLLOWING BINDING ARBITRATION OF CROSS COMPLAINT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT TAHBAZOF, SIAVASH AN INDIVIDUAL SYTS INVESTMENTS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-21-2011 CONTINUED TO DEC-23-2011 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2011
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT TAHBAZOF, SIAVASH AN INDIVIDUAL SYTS INVESTMENTS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED COMPANY ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 1.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2009
  • DECLARATION OF ANNE M. GANNON ISN UPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIM INJUNCTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF SIMONI, ZELKO SIMONI, RENEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2009
  • DECLARATION OF THOMAS FOWLER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRELIM INJUNCTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF SIMONI, ZELKO SIMONI, RENEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2009
  • DECLARATION OF RICHARD A. SUTTER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRLEIMINARY HEARING FILED BY PLAINTIFF SIMONI, ZELKO SIMONI, RENEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2009
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAININHG ORDER FILED BY PLAINTIFF SIMONI, ZELKO SIMONI, RENEE (Fee:40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2009
  • DECLARATION OF SIAVASH TAHBAZOF IN SUPPORT OF DEFTS OPPOS TO PLTFS APPLICATION FOR TEMP. RESTRAING ORDER FILED BY DEFENDANT TAHBAZOF, SIAVASH AN INDIVIDUAL SYTS INVESTMENTS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2009
  • DECLARATION OF SAVID KHAN FILED BY DEFENDANT TAHBAZOF, SIAVASH AN INDIVIDUAL SYTS INVESTMENTS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2009
  • FIRST APPEARANCE FEES PAID FILED BY DEFENDANT TAHBAZOF, SIAVASH AN INDIVIDUAL SYTS INVESTMENTS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED COMPANY (Fee:740.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2009
  • OPPOSITION TO PLTFS APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAING ORDER FILED BY DEFENDANT TAHBAZOF, SIAVASH AN INDIVIDUAL SYTS INVESTMENTS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • QUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SIMONI, ZELKO SIMONI, RENEE AS TO DEFENDANT TAHBAZOF, SIAVASH AN INDIVIDUAL SYTS INVESTMENTS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED COMPANY PREGO VIEW HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION DOES 1 TO 40, INCLUSIVE ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN, CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN OR INTEREST IN THE EASEMENT ADVERSE TO PLAINTIFF'S , OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFF'S TITLE TO THE EASEMENT SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAR-05-2010 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON DEC-01-2009 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON FEB-18-2010 (Fee:370.00)

    Read MoreRead Less