This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 11/22/2021 at 15:24:36 (UTC).

ZAIF INC. VS. BINANCE HOLDINGS LTD. ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 ZAIF INC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against BINANCE HOLDINGS LTD. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SAMUEL K. FENG, ETHAN P. SCHULMAN and RICHARD B. ULMER. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9318

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

SAMUEL K. FENG

ETHAN P. SCHULMAN

RICHARD B. ULMER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZAIF INC.

Defendants and Others

BAM TRADING SERVICES INC.

BINANCE HOLDINGS LTD.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

COOPER, C. BENJAMIN

Attorney at COOPER & ELLIOT

305 West Nationwide Boulevard

Columbus, OH 43215

BALABANIAN, RAFEY S

Attorney at EDELSON PC

150 California Street, 18Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

BOND, JON N.

Attorney at COOPER & ELLIOTT, LLC

305 West Nationwide Boulevard

Columbus, OH 43215

COOPER, JR., CHARLES H.

Attorney at COOPER & ELLIOTT, LLC

305 West Nationwide Boulevard

Columbus, OH 43215

ELLIOTT, REX H.

Attorney at COOPER & ELLIOTT, LLC

305 West Nationwide Boulevard

Columbus, OH 43215

Defendant and Other Attorneys

HUANG, JESSICA H.

Attorney at GOODWIN PROCTER LLP

Three Embarcadero Center

San Francisco, CA 94111

KING, KAREN R.

Attorney at MORVILLO ABRAMOWITZ GRAND IASON & ANELLO PC

565 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 100172413

REIDER, NICHOLAS A.

Attorney at GOODWIN PROCTER LLP

Three Embarcadero Center

San Francisco, CA 94111

SPILLANE, MEGHAN K.

Attorney at GOODWIN PROCTER LLP

620 Eighth Avenue

New York, NY 10018

WELLS, JR., THEODORE V.

Attorney at PAUL, WEISS, RIFKIND, WHARTON & GARRISON LLP

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 100196064

BOUTIN, PETER RUCKER

Attorney at KEESAL, YOUNG & LOGAN

450 Pacific Avenue

San Francisco, CA 94133

FONDO, GRANT P

Attorney at GOODWIN PROCTER LLP

601 Marshall Street

Redwood City, CA 94063

 

Court Documents

Complaint

BUSINESS TORT, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 66278895) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ZAIF INC. AS TO DEFENDANT BINANCE HOLDINGS LTD. BAM TRADING SERVICES INC. NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-23-2021 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAR-22-2021 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-01-2021

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF NOV-24-2021 CONTINUED TO JAN-19-2022 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF NOV-24-2021 CONTINUED TO JAN-19-2022 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ORDER - STIPULATION REGARDING UPCOMING CASE DEADLINES

ORDER - STIPULATION REGARDING UPCOMING CASE DEADLINES

Specially Appearing Defendant Binance Holdings Ltd. Notice Of Motion A

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION NOTICES AND FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 100142597) FILED BY DEFENDANT BINANCE HOLDINGS LTD. HEARING SET FOR OCT-18-2021 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 302

Proof Of Service Of Specially Appearing Defendant Binance Holdings Ltd

PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL (TRANSACTION ID # 100142597) FILED BY DEFENDANT BINANCE HOLDINGS LTD.

Specially Appearing Defendant Binance Holdings Ltd. Memorandum Of Poin

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION NOTICES AND FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 100142597) FILED BY DEFENDANT BINANCE HOLDINGS LTD.

Declaration Of Karen R. King In Support Of Specially Appearing Defenda

DECLARATION OF KAREN R. KING IN SUPPORT OF SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT BINANCE HOLDINGS LTD. MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION NOTICES AND FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 100142597) FILED BY DEFENDANT BINANCE HOLDINGS LTD.

Declaration of Jonathan N. Bond in Support of Plaintiff Zaif Inc.s Uno

DECLARATION OF JONATHAN N. BOND IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF ZAIF INC.'S UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 66960182) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ZAIF INC.

Plaintiff Zaif Inc.s Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support o

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF ITS UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON BINANCES AND BAM TRADING SERVICES INC.'S MOTIONS TO QUASH, FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 66960182) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ZAIF INC.

Plaintiff Zaif Inc.s Unopposed Ex Parte Application and Supporting Dec

PLAINTIFF ZAIF INC.'S UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION AND SUPPORTING DECLARATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR HEARING ON BINANCE HOLDINGS LTD. AND BAM TRADING SERVICES INC.'S MOTIONS TO QUASH, FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 66960182) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ZAIF INC.

Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant BAM Trading Servic

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BAM TRADING SERVICES INC.'S MOTION TO QUASH NOTICE OF ORAL DEPOSITION AND TO STAY THE DEPOSITION, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 100142563) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAM TRADING SERVICES INC.

Declaration of Jessica Huang in Support of Defendant BAM Trading Servi

DECLARATION OF JESSICA HUANG IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BAM TRADING SERVICES INC.'S MOTION TO QUASH NOTICE OF ORAL DEPOSITION AND TO STAY THE DEPOSITION, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 100142563) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAM TRADING SERVICES INC.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant BAM Tradi

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BAM TRADING SERVICES INC.'S MOTION TO QUASH NOTICE OF ORAL DEPOSITION AND TO STAY THE DEPOSITION, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 100142563) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAM TRADING SERVICES INC.

Notice of Motion and Defendant BAM Trading Services Inc.s Motion to Qu

NOTICE OF MOTION AND DEFENDANT BAM TRADING SERVICES INC.'S MOTION TO QUASH NOTICE OF ORAL DEPOSITION AND TO STAY THE DEPOSITION, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 100142563) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAM TRADING SERVICES INC. HEARING SET FOR OCT-18-2021 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 302

granting Zaif Inc. s motion to compel defendant Binance Holdings Ltd.

ORDER GRANTING ZAIF INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT BINANCE HOLDINGS LTD. TO RESPOND TO ITS JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY REQUESTS (TRANSACTION ID # 66956131)

re: stipulation and order for motion to be heard by a member of the Ca

ORDER RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR MOTION TO BE HEARD BY A MEMBER OF THE CALIFORNIA BAR SERVING AS A TEMPORARY JUDGE (TRANSACTION ID # 66956131)

Notice of Entry of Order of Stipulated Protective Order Regarding Conf

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 100142108) FILED BY DEFENDANT BINANCE HOLDINGS LTD.

ORDER

ORDER ON STIPULATION REGARDING JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY DEADLINE AND CONTINUANCE OF BINANCE'S MOTION TO DISMISS (TO NOVEMBER 5, 2021)

140 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2022
  • HearingMatter(s): PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE STATUS FOR ATTORNEY CHARLES C. COOPER; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • HearingMatter(s): PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE STATUS FOR ATTORNEY C. BENJAMIN COOPER; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • HearingMatter(s): PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE STATUS FOR ATTORNEY REX R. ELLIOTT; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • HearingMatter(s): PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE STATUS FOR ATTORNEY THEODORE V. WELLS, JR.; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • HearingMatter(s): PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE STATUS FOR ATTORNEY KAREN R. KING; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • HearingMatter(s): PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE STATUS FOR ATTORNEY MEGHAN K. SPILLANE; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • HearingMatter(s): PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE STATUS FOR ATTORNEY JON N. BOND; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • HearingMatter(s): MOTION TO DISMISS; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 302; Judge Name: ETHAN P. SCHULMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Off Calendar Nov-04-2021 Continued To Jan-19-22 At 10:30 A.M. In Dept 610; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    Read MoreRead Less
283 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF AND VERIFIED APPLICATION OF THEODORE V. WELLS, JR. TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100126483) FILED BY DEFENDANT BINANCE HOLDINGS LTD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION OF THEODORE V. WELLS, JR. TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100126483) FILED BY DEFENDANT BINANCE HOLDINGS LTD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE / NOTICE OF HEARING ON THEODORE V. WELLS, JR. TO APPEAR AS COUNSELPRO HAC VICE & PAYMENT FOR COURT REPORTER FEE (TRANSACTION ID # 100126483) FILED BY DEFENDANT BINANCE HOLDINGS LTD. HEARING SET FOR APR-09-2021 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:$530.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketFEE PAID ON: STIPULATION REGARDING DEADLINES TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND ENLARGEMENT OF PAGE LIMIT; [PROPOSED] ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 100126458) FILED BY DEFENDANT BINANCE HOLDINGS LTD. (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 66392528), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ZAIF INC. SERVED FEB-16-2021, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT BAM TRADING SERVICES INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 66278895) TO PLAINTIFF ZAIF INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W6621129F001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 66278895) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ZAIF INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBUSINESS TORT, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 66278895) FILED BY PLAINTIFF ZAIF INC. AS TO DEFENDANT BINANCE HOLDINGS LTD. BAM TRADING SERVICES INC. NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-23-2021 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAR-22-2021 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-01-2021 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******9318
Case Title:ZAIF INC. VS. BINANCE HOLDINGS LTD. ET AL
Court Date:APR-09-2021 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE
Rulings:Matter on the Law & Motion Calendar for Friday, April 9, 2021, Line 9, 3. PLAINTIFF ZAIF INC.'s MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE (Charles H. Cooper, Jr.):All seven of these unopposed pro hac vice applications are granted.As a result of the COVID-19 emergency, all attorneys and parties are required to appear remotely. Hearings will be conducted by videoconference using Zoom. To appear at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link, or dial the corresponding phone number.Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. The text of the email shall include the name and contact information, including email address, of the attorney or party who will appear at the hearing. Counsel for the movant is required to prepare a proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the tentative ruling is not contested. =(302/RBU)


Case Number:*******9318
Case Title:ZAIF INC. VS. BINANCE HOLDINGS LTD. ET AL
Court Date:JUN-11-2021 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Specially Appearing Defendant Binance Holdings Ltd.S Notice Of Motion And Motion To Stay Discovery
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Friday, June 11, 2021, Line 11Binance Holdings Ltd.'s motion to stay discovery is granted through July 1, 2021, when other motions in this case are set to be heard.As a result of the COVID-19 emergency, all attorneys and parties are required to appear remotely. Hearings will be conducted by videoconference using Zoom. To appear at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link, or dial the corresponding phone number.Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. The text of the email shall include the name and contact information, including email address, of the attorney or party who will appear at the hearing. Counsel for Binance is required to prepare a proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the tentative ruling is not contested. = (302/RBU)


Case Number:*******9318
Case Title:ZAIF INC. VS. BINANCE HOLDINGS LTD. ET AL
Court Date:JUL-30-2021 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Continue Hearing On Motions To Quash And Dismiss
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Friday, July 30, 2021, Line 9PLAINTIFF ZAIF INC.'S Motion To Continue Hearing On Motions To Quash And Dismiss.Plaintiff Zaif Inc.'s motion for an "order continuing the August 13, 2021 hearing on specially appearing defendant Binance Holdings Ltd.'s motion to dismiss for inconvenient forum or, in the alternative, motion to quash for lack of personal jurisdiction" is denied. Discovery will be addressed at the August 13 hearing.Effective Monday, June 28, 2021, for the 9:30 a.m. Law & Motion calendar, attorneys and parties may appear either in person in Department 302 or remotely by videoconference using Zoom. To appear remotely at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link, or dial the corresponding phone number.Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. The text of the email shall include the name and contact information, including email address, of the attorney or party who will appear at the hearing. Counsel for the defendant is required to prepare a proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the tentative ruling is not contested. = (302/RBU)


Case Number:*******9318
Case Title:ZAIF INC. VS. BINANCE HOLDINGS LTD. ET AL
Court Date:AUG-13-2021 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION TO DISMISS
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Friday, August 13, 2021, Line 7 1. DEFENDANT BINANCE HOLDINGS LTD.'S MOTION TO DISMISS.Specially appearing defendant Binance Holdings Ltd.'s motion to dismiss for inconvenient forum, or in the alternative, motion to quash for lack of personal jurisdiction is continued to allow for jurisdictional discovery. (See Mihlon v. Superior Court (1985) 169 Cal.App.3d 703 [plaintiff entitled to conduct discovery with regard to the issue of jurisdiction before the hearing on the motion to quash].) "In order to prevail on a motion for a continuance for jurisdictional discovery, the plaintiff should demonstrate that discovery is likely to lead to the production of evidence of facts establishing jurisdiction." (In re Automobile Antitrust Cases I & II (2005) 135 Cal.App.4th 100, 127.) Here, Zaif shows that further discovery is likely to lead to the production of evidence establishing personal jurisdiction against Binance Holdings. Zaif additionally shows that discovery will produce evidence needed for the forum non conveniens analysis. The specific and targeted jurisdictional discovery requested by Zaif, such as the location of servers and storage devices, may establish jurisdiction and be relevant to the alter ego and forum non conveniens motion.The motion is continued to Friday, October 15, 2021. Supplemental memo due September 22, not exceeding 10 pages. Supplemental opposition due October 1, not exceeding ten (10) pages. Supplemental reply due October 7, not exceeding five (5) pages.Effective Monday, June 28, 2021, for the 9:30 a.m. Law & Motion calendar, attorneys and parties may appear either in person in Department 302 or remotely by videoconference using Zoom. To appear remotely at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link, or dial the corresponding phone number. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. The text of the email shall include the name and contact information, including email address, of the attorney or party who will appear at the hearing. Counsel for the Zaif is required to prepare a proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the tentative ruling is not contested. = (302/RBU)


Case Number:*******9318
Case Title:ZAIF INC. VS. BINANCE HOLDINGS LTD. ET AL
Court Date:SEP-22-2021 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion To Compel Defendant Binance Holdings Ltd. To Respond To Its Jurisdictional Discovery Requests
Rulings:Discovery Calendar for Wednesday, September 22, 2021, Line 4,PLAINTIFF ZAIF INC.'s Motion To Compel Defendant Binance Holdings LTD. To Respond To Its Jurisdictional Discovery Requests:Pro Tem Judge James Fleming, a member of the California State Bar who meets all the requirements set forth in CRC 2.812 to serve as a temporary judge, has been assigned to hear this motion. Prior to the hearing all parties to the motion will be asked to sign a stipulation agreeing that the motion may be heard by the Pro Tem Judge. If all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the hearing will proceed before the Judge Pro Tem who will decide the motion with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. If a party appears by telephone, the stipulation may be signed via fax or consent to sign given by email. If not all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the Pro Tem Judge will hold a hearing on the motion and, based on the papers submitted by the parties and the hearing, issue a report in the nature of a recommendation to the Dept. 302 Judge, who will then decide the motion. If a party does not appear at the hearing, the party will be deemed to have stipulated that the motion will be decided by the Pro Tem Judge with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. The Pro Tem Judge has issued the following tentative ruling: Hearing required. Counsel should be prepared to explain the effect of the Stipulation and Order Regarding Jurisdictional Discovery Deadlines filed September 15, 2021.For the 9:00a.m. Discovery calendar, all attorneys and parties are required to appear remotely. Hearings will be conducted by videoconference using Zoom. To appear at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link (DISCOVERY, DEPT 301 @ 9:00AM), or dial the corresponding phone number.Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to jameshfleming@gmail.com with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. If parties have arranged for a court reporter to appear, please include the following in your email: (1) ensure that they are California Certified Shorthand Reporters; (2) the reporter's full contact information [name, CSR number, personal work email, and phone number]. If the reporter is not a California Certified Shorthand Reporter, the transcript cannot be certified for use in California courts. If the tentative ruling is not contested, the parties are deemed to have stipulated to the Pro Tem hearing the motion and the Pro Tem will sign an order confirming the tentative ruling. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must e-mail it to the Judge Pro Tem. =(302/JPT)


Case Number:*******9318
Case Title:ZAIF INC. VS. BINANCE HOLDINGS LTD. ET AL
Court Date:OCT-18-2021 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Quash Deposition Notices And For A Protective Order
Rulings:Matter on the Discovery Calendar for Monday, October 18, 2021, Line 3,2- DEFENDANT BINANCE HOLDINGS LTD.'s Motion To Quash Deposition Notices And For A Protective Order.Pro Tem Judge Paul Renne, a member of the California State Bar who meets all the requirements set forth in CRC 2.812 to serve as a temporary judge, has been assigned to hear this motion. Prior to the hearing all parties to the motion will be asked to sign a stipulation agreeing that the motion may be heard by the Pro Tem Judge. If all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the hearing will proceed before the Judge Pro Tem who will decide the motion with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. If a party appears by telephone, the stipulation may be signed via fax or consent to sign given by email. If not all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the Pro Tem Judge will hold a hearing on the motion and, based on the papers submitted by the parties and the hearing, issue a report in the nature of a recommendation to the Dept. 302 Judge, who will then decide the motion. If a party does not appear at the hearing, the party will be deemed to have stipulated that the motion will be decided by the Pro Tem Judge with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. The Pro Tem Judge has issued the following tentative ruling: THE COURT WILL ISSUE NO TENTATIVE RULING. A REVIEW OF THE COURT'S DOCKET DOES NOT REFLECT A FILING OF OPPOSITION BY PLAINTIFF TO DEFENDANT BINANCE HOLDING, LTD'S MOTION TO QUASH THE DEPOSITION NOTICE IF SUCH AN OPPOSITION WAS FILED, PLAINTIFF IS TO PROVIDE ELECTRONICALY A COPY TO THE COURT BY THE CLOSE OF BUSIINESS ON OCTOBER 15, 2021. BASED ON THE PAPERS SUBMITTED BY THE MOVING PARTY THE COURT IS INCLINDED TO GRANT THE MOTION TO QUASH, BUT WILL PERMIT ORAL ARGUMENT AS TO WHY SUCH AN ORDER SHOULD NOT BE ENTERED. COUNSEL FOR BOTH PARTIES SHOULD PREPARE A PROPOSED ORDER REFLECTING THEIR HOPED FOR OUTCOME, DELIVER A COPY TO OPPOSING COUNSEL FOR APPROVAL AS TO FORM AND DELIVER ELECTRONICALLY TO THE COURT IN ADVANCE OF THE HEARING ON OCTOBER 18, 2021.For the 9:00 a.m. Discovery calendar, all attorneys and parties are required to appear remotely. Hearings will be conducted by videoconference using Zoom. To appear at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link (DISCOVERY, DEPT 301 @ 9:00AM), or dial the corresponding phone number.Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to rennepar85@gmail.com with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. If parties have arranged for a court reporter to appear, please include the following in your email: (1) ensure that they are California Certified Shorthand Reporters; (2) the reporter's full contact information [name, CSR number, personal work email, and phone number]. If the reporter is not a California Certified Shorthand Reporter, the transcript cannot be certified for use in California courts. If the tentative ruling is not contested, the parties are deemed to have stipulated to the Pro Tem hearing the motion and the Pro Tem will sign an order confirming the tentative ruling. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must e-mail it to the Judge Pro Tem. =(302/JPT)


Case Number:*******9318
Case Title:ZAIF INC. VS. BINANCE HOLDINGS LTD. ET AL
Court Date:NOV-17-2021 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Defendant Binance Holdings Ltd.'S Motion To Quash Deposition Notices And For A Protective Order
Rulings:Matter on the Discovery Calendar for Wednesday, November 17, 2021, Line 8,2- Defendant Binance Holdings Ltd.'s Motion To Quash Deposition Notices And For A Protective Order.Pro Tem Judge Peter Catalanotti, a member of the California State Bar who meets all the requirements set forth in CRC 2.812 to serve as a temporary judge, has been assigned to hear this motion. Prior to the hearing all parties to the motion will be asked to sign a stipulation agreeing that the motion may be heard by the Pro Tem Judge. If all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the hearing will proceed before the Judge Pro Tem who will decide the motion with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. If a party appears by telephone, the stipulation may be signed via fax or consent to sign given by email. If not all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the Pro Tem Judge will hold a hearing on the motion and, based on the papers submitted by the parties and the hearing, issue a report in the nature of a recommendation to the Dept. 302 Judge, who will then decide the motion. If a party does not appear at the hearing, the party will be deemed to have stipulated that the motion will be decided by the Pro Tem Judge with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. The Pro Tem Judge has issued the following tentative ruling:The Court has not received electronic courtesy copies of the Moving, Opposition, or the Reply papers. The Motion is continued to December 1, 2021 for counsel to provide electronic courtesy copies of Moving, Opposition, and Reply papers. Per the instructions posted on the department's website (https: sfsuperiorcourt.org/divisions/civil/law-motion), parties must attach electronic copies of discovery motion papers to an email addressed to Discovery302@sftc.org. The subject line of the email should state the case name and number and the continued hearing date. For the 9:00 a.m. Discovery calendar, all attorneys and parties are required to appear remotely. Hearings will be conducted by videoconference using Zoom. To appear at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link (DISCOVERY, DEPT 301 @ 9:00AM), or dial the corresponding phone number.Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to Peter.Catalanotti@wilsonelser.com with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. If parties have arranged for a court reporter to appear, please include the following in your email: (1) ensure that they are California Certified Shorthand Reporters; (2) the reporter's full contact information [name, CSR number, personal work email, and phone number]. If the reporter is not a California Certified Shorthand Reporter, the transcript cannot be certified for use in California courts. If the tentative ruling is not contested, the parties are deemed to have stipulated to the Pro Tem hearing the motion and the Pro Tem will sign an order confirming the tentative ruling. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must e-mail it to the Judge Pro Tem. =(302/JPT)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAM Trading Services Inc. doing business as Binance.US is a litigant

Latest cases where Binance Holdings Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer R. H Elliott

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BALABANIAN RAFEY SARKIS