This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/12/2016 at 15:41:48 (UTC).

YISSELA ROSALES VS. SELLERS MARKET INC et al

Case Summary

On 09/26/2012 YISSELA ROSALES filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against SELLERS MARKET INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4724

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROSALES, YISSELA

Defendants

GARCIA, VERONICA

SELLERS MARKET INC

DOES 1 TO 25, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LADVA, ASHWIN V.

Attorney at LADVA LAW FIRM

530 Jackson Street,, 2Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94133

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROSALES, YISSELA AS TO DEFENDANT SELLERS MARKET INC GARCIA, VERONICA DOES 1 TO 25, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-27-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON NOV-26-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON FEB-13-2013 (Fee:450.00)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROSALES, YISSELA

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF FEB-27-2013 CONTINUED TO APR-24-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROSALES, YISSELA

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

STATEMENT RE OSC FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROSALES, YISSELA

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JAN-07-2014 CONTINUED TO APR-08-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE JAN-07-2014 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Entry of Default Reject

REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF ROSALES, YISSELA AS TO DEFENDANT SELLERS MARKET INC GARCIA, VERONICA

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JUL-08-2014 CONTINUED TO SEP-16-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT VERONICA GARCIA; OBTAIN ANSWER(S) FROM OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST DEFENDANT(S). THE JUL-08-2014 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR SEP-16-2014 CONTINUED TO DEC-09-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT VERONICA GARCIA; OBTAIN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST DEFENDANTS. THE SEP-16-2014 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROSALES, YISSELA SERVED NOV-12-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SELLERS MARKET INC

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-24-2013 CONTINUED TO JUN-12-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

STATEMENT RE: OSC FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROSALES, YISSELA

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

STATEMENT RE OSC FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROSALES, YISSELA

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR APR-08-2014 CONTINUED TO JUL-08-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT VERONICA GARCIA; OBTAIN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). THE APR-08-2014 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Entry of Default Reject

REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF ROSALES, YISSELA AS TO DEFENDANT SELLERS MARKET INC GARCIA, VERONICA

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

STATEMENT RE: OSC FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROSALES, YISSELA

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF DEC-09-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2014
  • MINI MINUTES FOR DEC-09-2014 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2014
  • MINI MINUTES FOR OCT-29-2014 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2014
  • LAW AND MOTION, 302, THE LADVA LAW FIRM'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FOR THE PLAINTIFF YISSELA ROSALES IS OFF CALENDAR. THE MOVING PARTY FAILED TO PROVIDE A PROOF OF SERVICE. JUDGE: ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH, CLERK: CYNTHIA HERBERT, NOT REPORTED. (302)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR SEP-16-2014 CONTINUED TO DEC-09-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT VERONICA GARCIA; OBTAIN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST DEFENDANTS. THE SEP-16-2014 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2014
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROSALES, YISSELA (Fee:30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT RE: OSC FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROSALES, YISSELA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2014
  • MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD, DECLARATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROSALES, YISSELA HEARING SET FOR OCT-29-2014 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JUL-08-2014 CONTINUED TO SEP-16-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT VERONICA GARCIA; OBTAIN ANSWER(S) FROM OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST DEFENDANT(S). THE JUL-08-2014 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT RE: OSC FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROSALES, YISSELA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JUL-30-2013 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) VERONICA GARCIA; OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). THE JUN-12-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROSALES, YISSELA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-24-2013 CONTINUED TO JUN-12-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROSALES, YISSELA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF FEB-27-2013 CONTINUED TO APR-24-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROSALES, YISSELA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROSALES, YISSELA SERVED NOV-12-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SELLERS MARKET INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROSALES, YISSELA AS TO DEFENDANT SELLERS MARKET INC GARCIA, VERONICA DOES 1 TO 25, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-27-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON NOV-26-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON FEB-13-2013 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less