This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/14/2016 at 08:38:29 (UTC).

YELLOW CAB COOPERATIVE, INC. VS. ANMOL SHETH

Case Summary

On 02/01/2013 YELLOW CAB COOPERATIVE, INC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ANMOL SHETH. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3059

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YELLOW CAB COOPERATIVE, INC.

1200 Mississippi Street

San Francisco, CA 94107

Defendant

SHETH, ANMOL

San Francisco, CA 94110

 

Court Documents

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF

AUTO ACCIDENT CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $1,037.21 FILED BY YELLOW CAB COOPERATIVE, INC. AS TO DEFENDANT SHETH, ANMOL ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR APR-11-2013 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:100.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (SERVICE FEE $59.00) SERVED FEB-04-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SHETH, ANMOL

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULLY SATISFIED, AS TO DEFENDANT SHETH, ANMOL

Notice of Entry of Judgment

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM

THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF YELLOW CAB COOPERATIVE, INC. RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT SHETH, ANMOL $1,037.21 PRINCIPAL, $89.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $1,126.21 STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS NO EXHIBITS FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULLY SATISFIED, AS TO DEFENDANT SHETH, ANMOL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF YELLOW CAB COOPERATIVE, INC. RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT SHETH, ANMOL $1,037.21 PRINCIPAL, $89.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $1,126.21 STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS NO EXHIBITS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF APR-11-2013 - JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS CALENDAR OF APR-11-2013 - TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION AS OF APR-11-2013 BY DONALD S. MITCHELL.APPEARANCES BY BOTH PARTIES. PLAINTIFF IS REPRESENTED BY RICHARD WEINER--OPERATION MANAGER.NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE: DONALD S. MITCHELL. CLERK: M. GOODMAN. NOT REPORTED. (506)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • DECLARATION OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF CORPORATION PURSUANT TO CCP 116.540 (B)-(H) FILED BY PLAINTIFF YELLOW CAB COOPERATIVE, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (SERVICE FEE $59.00) SERVED FEB-04-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SHETH, ANMOL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTO ACCIDENT CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $1,037.21 FILED BY YELLOW CAB COOPERATIVE, INC. AS TO DEFENDANT SHETH, ANMOL ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR APR-11-2013 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:100.00)

    Read MoreRead Less