This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 06/24/2019 at 06:43:06 (UTC).

YEEWAH SHIU VS. GALLERIA DESIGN CENTER

Case Summary

On 02/01/2013 YEEWAH SHIU filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against GALLERIA DESIGN CENTER. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DONALD S. MITCHELL. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3068

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

DONALD S. MITCHELL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHIU, YEEWAH

San Francisco, CA 94107

Defendants

SAN FRANCISCO DESIGN CENTER ASSOCIATES, INC.

832 Folsom St. Ste

San Francisco, CA 94107

GALLERIA DESIGN CENTER

# 2 Henry Adam Street

San Francisco, CA 94107

SAN FRANCISCO DESIGN CENTER ASSOCIATIES INC. LLC

832 Folsom St. Ste 500

San Francisco, CA 94107

SAN FRANCISCO DESIGN CENTER ASSOCIATES A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

2 Henry Adams Street Suite 450

San Francisco, CA 94103

SAN FRANCISCO DESIGN CENTER ASSOCIATIES INC. LLC 832 FOLSOM ST. STE

500

San Francisco, CA 94107

GALLERIA DESIGN CENTER # 2 HENRY ADAM STREET SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94107

SAN FRANCISCO DESIGN CENTER ASSOCIATES A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP 2 HENRY ADAMS STREET SUITE

450

San Francisco, CA 94103

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

JEWEL, SUSAN K.

Attorney at JEWEL & STONEMAN, LLP

220 Montgomery St., Suite 678

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM

THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF SHIU, YEEWAH IS NOT OWED ANY MONEY BY DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO DESIGN CENTER ASSOCIATES, INC. STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS NO EXHIBITS FILED

Notice of Entry of Judgment

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF

AMENDED MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $10,000.00 3RD AMENDED FILED BY SHIU, YEEWAH AS TO DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO DESIGN CENTER ASSOCIATIES INC. LLC SAN FRANCISCO DESIGN CENTER ASSOCIATES, INC.

SUBPOENA RETURNED AND FILED

SUBPOENA RETURNED AND FILED - SUBPOENA FOR DR. THOMAS VAIL M.D.

SUBPOENA RETURNED AND FILED

SUBPOENA RETURNED AND FILED - SUBPOENA FOR DR. WILLIAM ZHAO -

SUBPOENA RETURNED AND FILED

SUBPOENA RETURNED AND FILED - SUBPOENA FOR NANCY ANDERSON

ORDER

ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL - GRANTED - JUDGE DONALD S. MITCHELL -

SUBPOENA RETURNED AND FILED

SUBPOENA RETURNED AND FILED - SUBPOENA FOR PATRICK BRIDGETT, FEE FOR SERVICE $ 5.00 -

SUBPOENA RETURNED AND FILED

SUBPOENA RETURNED AND FILED - SUBPOENA FOR DR. KENNETH AKIZUKI M.D. FEE FOR SERVICE $ 2.00

Small Claims - Continue Order

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF MAR-18-2013 - CONTINUED TO MAY-30-2013 AT 3:30 PM IN DEPT. 506

Small Claims - Continue Order

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF SEP-05-2013 - CONTINUED PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF TO SEP-09-2013 AT 03:30 PM IN DEPT. 506

SUBPOENA RETURNED AND FILED

SUBPOENA RETURNED AND FILED - SUBPOENA FOR MARTHA THOMPSON - FEE FOR SERVICE $ 25.00

SUBPOENA RETURNED AND FILED

SUBPOENA RETURNED AND FILED - SUBPOENA FOR TIM TREADWAY - FEE FOR SERVICE $ 5.00 -

Small Claims - Continue Order

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF MAY-30-2013 - CONTINUED PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF TO JUL-08-2013 AT 3:30 PM IN DEPT. 506

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF

MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $10,000.00 FILED BY SHIU, YEEWAH AS TO DEFENDANT GALLERIA DESIGN CENTER ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR MAR-18-2013 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:75.00)

ORDER

ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL - GRANTED - JUDGE DONALD S. MITCHELL

ORDER

ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL - GRANTED JUDGE DONALD S. MITCHELL

PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON AMENDED CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (FEE FOR SERVICE $125.00) SERVED SEP-13-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO DESIGN CENTER ASSOCIATES A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2013
  • Payment : REQUEST FOR POSTPONEMENT OF HEARING; Payment Type : NO FEE; Receipt Number : W0513823S016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2013
  • Payment : REQUEST FOR POSTPONEMENT OF HEARING; Amount : $10; Payment Type : CREDIT CARD; Receipt Number : W0513627S014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2013
  • Payment : REQUEST FOR POSTPONEMENT OF HEARING; Amount : $10; Payment Type : CREDIT CARD; Receipt Number : W0513515S006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2013
  • Payment : REQUEST FOR POSTPONEMENT OF HEARING; Amount : $10; Payment Type : CREDIT CARD; Receipt Number : W0513228S009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • Payment : SERVICE BY MAIL; Amount : $10; Payment Type : CREDIT CARD; Receipt Number : W0513204S013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • Payment : SMALL CLAIMS > 5000; Amount : $75; Payment Type : CREDIT CARD; Receipt Number : W0513201S012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2013
  • RETURN MAIL RE: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT SENT TO DEFENDANT SF DESIGN CTR. ASSOC, INC. NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED - UNABLE TO FORWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2013
  • RETURN MAIL RE: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT SENT TO DEFENDANT GALLERIA DESIGN CENTER ENVELOPE MARKED: RETURN TO SENDER - NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED - UNABLE TO FORWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • RETURN MAIL - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - SENT TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS - CONTINUE ORDER RETURNED UNCLAIMED. SENT TO:YEEWAH SHIU (ENVELOPE MARKED:RETURNED TO SENDER - ATTEMPTED - NOT KNOWN - UNABLE TO FORWARD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF MAR-18-2013 - CONTINUED TO MAY-30-2013 AT 3:30 PM IN DEPT. 506

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL - GRANTED - JUDGE DONALD S. MITCHELL -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2013
  • REQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARING FILED BY PLAINTIFF SHIU, YEEWAH (Fee:$10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON AMENDED CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF COURT CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED UNSERVED ON PLAINTIFF SHIU, YEEWAH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • SERVICE OF COMPLAINT BY CERTIFIED MAIL FILED BY PLAINTIFF SHIU, YEEWAH AS TO DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO DESIGN CENTER ASSOCIATIES INC. LLC (Fee:$10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF AMENDED CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED BY PLAINTIFF SHIU, YEEWAH AS TO DEFENDANT GALLERIA DESIGN CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $10,000.00 FILED BY SHIU, YEEWAH AS TO DEFENDANT GALLERIA DESIGN CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • DECLARATION OF YEEWAH SHIU FILED BY PLAINTIFF SHIU, YEEWAH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $10,000.00 FILED BY SHIU, YEEWAH AS TO DEFENDANT GALLERIA DESIGN CENTER ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR MAR-18-2013 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:$75.00)

    Read MoreRead Less