Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/10/2016 at 07:41:42 (UTC).

WING SZE WU, VS. ROBERT S. BASSO et al

Case Summary

On 08/24/2011 WING SZE WU filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against ROBERT S BASSO. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3652

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WING SZE WU, INDIVIDUALLY ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED AND DERIVATIVELY ON BEHALF OF PONIARD PHARMACEUTICALS INC.

Defendants

PERRY, MICHAEL S.

PONIARD PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (NOMINAL DEFENDANT)

STEVENS, DAVID R.

BASSO, ROBERT S.

SIMON III, NICHOLAS J.

LITTAUER, ROBERT M.

LYONS, GARY A.

DICKSON, EDGAR ROLLAND

GOLDFISCHER, CARL S.

WIGHT, ANNA LEWAK

MARTELL, RONALD A.

KWOK, CHENI

CRAVES, FREDERICK B.

JACKSON, MICHAEL K.

MCMAHON, GERALD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOWER, DAVID ELDRIDGE

Attorney at LEVI & KORSINSKY, LLP

600 Corporate Pointe, Suite 1170

Culver City, CA 90230-7600

Defendant Attorney

FELDMAN, BORIS

Attorney at WILSON SONSINI GOODRICH & ROSATI A PROF. CORP.

650 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304-1050

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

SECURITIES/INVESTMENT, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WING SZE WU, INDIVIDUALLY ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED AND DERIVATIVELY ON BEHALF OF PONIARD PHARMACEUTICALS INC. AS TO DEFENDANT BASSO, ROBERT S. CRAVES, FREDERICK B. DICKSON, EDGAR ROLLAND GOLDFISCHER, CARL S. LITTAUER, ROBERT M. LYONS, GARY A. MARTELL, RONALD A. MCMAHON, GERALD SIMON III, NICHOLAS J. STEVENS, DAVID R. PERRY, MICHAEL S. JACKSON, MICHAEL K. KWOK, CHENI WIGHT, ANNA LEWAK PONIARD PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (NOMINAL DEFENDANT) SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JAN-27-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-24-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JAN-12-2012 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:960.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WING SZE WU, INDIVIDUALLY ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED AND DERIVATIVELY ON BEHALF OF PONIARD PHARMACEUTICALS INC. SERVED AUG-25-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT PONIARD PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (NOMINAL DEFENDANT)

ORDER

ORDER - STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JAN-27-2012 CONTINUED TO MAR-29-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF COMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION. PARTIES TO CHECK STATUS WITH DEPARTMENT 304. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order To Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR MAY-14-2012 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 2:00 PM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE MAR-29-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ORDER RE: COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION - DENIED

ORDER RE: COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION - DENIED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED RE COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION FILED BY DEFENDANT BASSO, ROBERT S. CRAVES, FREDERICK B.

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR MAY-14-2012 CONTINUED TO JUN-25-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). THE MAY-14-2012 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Sanction Order

SANCTIONS ORDERED IN THE AMOUNT OF $350.00 AGAINST BOWER E. DAVID, ESQ., FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON: JUN-25-2012, PAYABLE ON OR BEFORE JUL-11-2012. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JUN-25-2012 CONTINUED TO AUG-28-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Sanction Order

SANCTIONS ORDERED IN THE AMOUNT OF $350.00 AGAINST BOWER E DAVID, ESQ., FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON: AUG-28-2012, PAYABLE ON OR BEFORE SEP-13-2012. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR AUG-28-2012 CONTINUED TO SEP-25-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S); FAILURE TO PAY OUTSTANDING SANCTIONS. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Sanction Order

SANCTIONS ORDERED IN THE AMOUNT OF $350.00 AGAINST DAVID ELDRIDGE BOWER, ESQ. FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON: SEP-25-2012, PAYABLE ON OR BEFORE OCT-15-2012. NOTE: SANCTIONS PREVIOUSLY ISSUED TO DAVID BOWER, ESQ. ON JUN-26-2012 IN THE AMOUNT OF $350.00 AND AUG-29-2012 IN THE AMOUNT OF $350.00 ARE ALSO DUE. (TOTAL AMOUNT DUE $1050.00). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR SEP-25-2012 CONTINUED TO NOV-27-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S), AND PAY OUTSTANDING SANCTIONS. ***NOTICE OF IMPENDING REFERRAL TO THE STATE BAR AS REQUIRED BY BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONS CODE SECTION 6086.7 (A) (3). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order Dismissing Entire Action

CASE DISMISSED AS TO ENTIRE ACTION BY COURT AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING NOV-27-2012 AT 2:00 PM. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE DISMISSED AS TO ENTIRE ACTION BY COURT AT ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING NOV-27-2012 AT 2:00 PM. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2012
  • MINI MINUTES FOR NOV-27-2012 02:00 PM FOR DEPT 610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR SEP-25-2012 CONTINUED TO NOV-27-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S), AND PAY OUTSTANDING SANCTIONS. ***NOTICE OF IMPENDING REFERRAL TO THE STATE BAR AS REQUIRED BY BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONS CODE SECTION 6086.7 (A) (3). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SANCTIONS ORDERED IN THE AMOUNT OF $350.00 AGAINST DAVID ELDRIDGE BOWER, ESQ. FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON: SEP-25-2012, PAYABLE ON OR BEFORE OCT-15-2012. NOTE: SANCTIONS PREVIOUSLY ISSUED TO DAVID BOWER, ESQ. ON JUN-26-2012 IN THE AMOUNT OF $350.00 AND AUG-29-2012 IN THE AMOUNT OF $350.00 ARE ALSO DUE. (TOTAL AMOUNT DUE $1050.00). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2012
  • MINI MINUTES FOR SEP-25-2012 02:00 PM FOR DEPT 610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR AUG-28-2012 CONTINUED TO SEP-25-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S); FAILURE TO PAY OUTSTANDING SANCTIONS. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SANCTIONS ORDERED IN THE AMOUNT OF $350.00 AGAINST BOWER E DAVID, ESQ., FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON: AUG-28-2012, PAYABLE ON OR BEFORE SEP-13-2012. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2012
  • MINI MINUTES FOR AUG-28-2012 02:00 PM FOR DEPT 610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JUN-25-2012 CONTINUED TO AUG-28-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SANCTIONS ORDERED IN THE AMOUNT OF $350.00 AGAINST BOWER E. DAVID, ESQ., FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON: JUN-25-2012, PAYABLE ON OR BEFORE JUL-11-2012. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR MAY-14-2012 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 2:00 PM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE MAR-29-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JAN-27-2012 CONTINUED TO MAR-29-2012 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF COMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION. PARTIES TO CHECK STATUS WITH DEPARTMENT 304. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER - STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2011
  • FEE PAID FOR ORDER FOR STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER FILED BY PLAINTIFF WING SZE WU, INDIVIDUALLY ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED AND DERIVATIVELY ON BEHALF OF PONIARD PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (Fee:20.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2011
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE: CGC-11-512033 FILED BY DEFENDANT PONIARD PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (NOMINAL DEFENDANT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2011
  • APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF COMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION FILED BY DEFENDANT BASSO, ROBERT S. CRAVES, FREDERICK B. DICKSON, EDGAR ROLLAND GOLDFISCHER, CARL S. LITTAUER, ROBERT M. LYONS, GARY A. MARTELL, RONALD A. MCMAHON, GERALD SIMON III, NICHOLAS J. STEVENS, DAVID R. PERRY, MICHAEL S. JACKSON, MICHAEL K. KWOK, CHENI WIGHT, ANNA LEWAK PONIARD PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (NOMINAL DEFENDANT) (Fee:NO FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2011
  • NOTICE OF GENERAL APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFENDANT BASSO, ROBERT S. CRAVES, FREDERICK B. DICKSON, EDGAR ROLLAND GOLDFISCHER, CARL S. LITTAUER, ROBERT M. LYONS, GARY A. MARTELL, RONALD A. MCMAHON, GERALD SIMON III, NICHOLAS J. STEVENS, DAVID R. PERRY, MICHAEL S. JACKSON, MICHAEL K. KWOK, CHENI WIGHT, ANNA LEWAK PONIARD PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (NOMINAL DEFENDANT) (Fee:14,400)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WING SZE WU, INDIVIDUALLY ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED AND DERIVATIVELY ON BEHALF OF PONIARD PHARMACEUTICALS INC. SERVED AUG-25-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT PONIARD PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (NOMINAL DEFENDANT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SECURITIES/INVESTMENT, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WING SZE WU, INDIVIDUALLY ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED AND DERIVATIVELY ON BEHALF OF PONIARD PHARMACEUTICALS INC. AS TO DEFENDANT BASSO, ROBERT S. CRAVES, FREDERICK B. DICKSON, EDGAR ROLLAND GOLDFISCHER, CARL S. LITTAUER, ROBERT M. LYONS, GARY A. MARTELL, RONALD A. MCMAHON, GERALD SIMON III, NICHOLAS J. STEVENS, DAVID R. PERRY, MICHAEL S. JACKSON, MICHAEL K. KWOK, CHENI WIGHT, ANNA LEWAK PONIARD PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (NOMINAL DEFENDANT) SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JAN-27-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-24-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JAN-12-2012 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:960.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOWER DAVID E.