This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/24/2016 at 05:59:20 (UTC).

WILMA REEDER VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 09/01/2009 WILMA REEDER filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B/P AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5339

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REEDER, WILMA ,AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO GEORGE REEDER, DECEASED

Defendants

GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

SILVER LINE PRODUCTS, INC.

STANDARD MOTOR PRODUCTS, INC.

EMSCO ASBESTOS COMPANY

AUTO FRICTION CORPORATION

DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION

DANA COMPANIES, LLC (FKA DANA CORPORATION)

STUART-WESTERN, INC.

PEP BOYS MANNY MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA

BRASSBESTOS BRAKE LINING COMPANY

U.S. SPRING & BUMPER COMPANY

DOES 1-8500

LEAR SIEGLER DIVERSIFIED HOLDINGS CORP.

WHEELING BRAKE BLOCK MANUFACTURING COMPANY

GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC

AUTO SPECIALTIES MANUFACTURING COMPANY

MOLDED INDUSTRIAL FRICTION CORPORATION

AMERICAN CONFERENCE OF GOVERNMENTAL INDUSTRIAL HYGIENISTS, INC.

BELL ASBESTOS MINES LTD.

27 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONADIO, DAVID R

Defendant Attorney

LOVE, MARK A

Other Attorneys

KAHN, RUTH DEBRA

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal as to Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company only

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 39499119) AS TO DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 38767742)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT PEP BOYS MANNY MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA ONLY

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 33725713) AS TO DEFENDANT PEP BOYS MANNY MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA

DEFENDANT PEP BOYS MANNY MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIAS INDEX TO MOTIONS IN LIMINE

DEFENDANT PEP BOYS MANNY MOE JACK OF CALIFORNIAS INDEX TO MOTIONS IN LIMINE (TRANSACTION ID # 32840114) FILED BY DEFENDANT PEP BOYS MANNY MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT - MULTIPLE PARTIES

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 32471114) AS TO DEFENDANT AMERICAN CONFERENCE OF GOVERNMENTAL INDUSTRIAL HYGIENISTS, INC. ASBESTOS MANUFACTURING COMPANY AUTO FRICTION CORPORATION AUTO SPECIALTIES MANUFACTURING COMPANY BELL ASBESTOS MINES LTD. BORGWARNER MORSE TEC, INC. BRASSBESTOS BRAKE LINING COMPANY BRIDGESTONE/FIRESTONE NORTH AMERICAN TIRE, LLC DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION DANA COMPANIES, LLC (FKA DANA CORPORATION) EMSCO ASBESTOS COMPANY FIBRE & METAL PRODUCTS COMPANY FORCEE MANUFACTURING CORPORATION FORD MOTOR COMPANY GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC GATKE CORPORATION GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION H. KRASNE MANUFACTURING COMPANY HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. L.J. MILEY COMPANY LASCO BRAKE PRODUCTS LEAR SIEGLER DIVERSIFIED HOLDINGS CORP. MAREMONT CORPORATION MOLDED INDUSTRIAL FRICTION CORPORATION MORTON INTERNATIONAL, INC. NATIONAL TRANSPORT SUPPLY, INC. OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC. PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION PNEUMO ABEX LLC RITESET MANUFACTURING COMPANY ROSSENDALE-RUBOIL COMPANY SILVER LINE PRODUCTS, INC. SOUTHERN FRICTION MATERIALS COMPANY STANDARD MOTOR PRODUCTS, INC. STANDCO, INC. STUART-WESTERN, INC. THE BUDD COMPANY U.S. SPRING & BUMPER COMPANY UNDERWRITERS LABORATORIES, INC. UNIVERSAL FRICTION MATERIALS COMPANY WHEELING BRAKE BLOCK MANUFACTURING COMPANY

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 27831967) FILED BY DEFENDANT PEP BOYS MANNY MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA

OBJECTION TO HEARING BEFORE A DISCOVERY COMMISSIONER AS A TEMPORARY JUDGE

OBJECTION TO HEARING BEFORE A DISCOVERY COMMISSIONER AS A TEMPORARY JUDGE (TRANSACTION ID # 27831967) FILED BY DEFENDANT PEP BOYS MANNY MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA

ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR WRONGFUL DEATH- ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR WRONGFUL DEATH - ASBESTOS (TRANSACTION ID # 27831967) FILED BY DEFENDANT PEP BOYS MANNY MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA (Fee:370.00)

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANYS DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 27478856) FILED BY DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT FOR SURVIVAL - WRONGFUL DEATH ? ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27478856) FILED BY DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (Fee:370.00)

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF REEDER, WILMA ,AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO GEORGE REEDER, DECEASED

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT

ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF REEDER, WILMA ,AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO GEORGE REEDER, DECEASED AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, C, H, I, J, N DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-19-2010 (Fee:370.00)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 39499119) AS TO DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2011
  • DocketREMOVED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON JUL-28-2011. DISMISSAL ON FILE. (206)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 38767742)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2011
  • DocketCONTINUED FROM MASTER CALENDAR JURY ASBESTOS TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR SET FOR 7/28/11 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 220 FOR FILING OF A DISMISSAL AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL REPORTED TO DEPT. 603 THAT THE CASE SETTLED. (206)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2011
  • DocketREFERRED TO ASBESTOS SETTLEMENT MANAGER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 33725713) AS TO DEFENDANT PEP BOYS MANNY MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT PEP BOYS MANNY MOE JACK OF CALIFORNIAS INDEX TO MOTIONS IN LIMINE (TRANSACTION ID # 32840114) FILED BY DEFENDANT PEP BOYS MANNY MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2010
  • DocketREMOVED FROM ASBESTOS CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON AUG-19-2010. ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 206 ON APR-25-2011 AT 11:15 AM FOR TRIAL. BRAYTON GROUP 562, WD/MESO. JUDGE: HAROLD E. KAHN; CLERK: D. LOK; COURT REPORTER KIM RICHARDSON, CSR #5915, PRESENT FOR DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL BERRY & BERRY (206)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 32471114) AS TO DEFENDANT AMERICAN CONFERENCE OF GOVERNMENTAL INDUSTRIAL HYGIENISTS, INC. ASBESTOS MANUFACTURING COMPANY AUTO FRICTION CORPORATION AUTO SPECIALTIES MANUFACTURING COMPANY BELL ASBESTOS MINES LTD. BORGWARNER MORSE TEC, INC. BRASSBESTOS BRAKE LINING COMPANY BRIDGESTONE/FIRESTONE NORTH AMERICAN TIRE, LLC DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION DANA COMPANIES, LLC (FKA DANA CORPORATION) EMSCO ASBESTOS COMPANY FIBRE & METAL PRODUCTS COMPANY FORCEE MANUFACTURING CORPORATION FORD MOTOR COMPANY GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC GATKE CORPORATION GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION H. KRASNE MANUFACTURING COMPANY HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. L.J. MILEY COMPANY LASCO BRAKE PRODUCTS LEAR SIEGLER DIVERSIFIED HOLDINGS CORP. MAREMONT CORPORATION MOLDED INDUSTRIAL FRICTION CORPORATION MORTON INTERNATIONAL, INC. NATIONAL TRANSPORT SUPPLY, INC. OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC. PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION PNEUMO ABEX LLC RITESET MANUFACTURING COMPANY ROSSENDALE-RUBOIL COMPANY SILVER LINE PRODUCTS, INC. SOUTHERN FRICTION MATERIALS COMPANY STANDARD MOTOR PRODUCTS, INC. STANDCO, INC. STUART-WESTERN, INC. THE BUDD COMPANY U.S. SPRING & BUMPER COMPANY UNDERWRITERS LABORATORIES, INC. UNIVERSAL FRICTION MATERIALS COMPANY WHEELING BRAKE BLOCK MANUFACTURING COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 27831967) FILED BY DEFENDANT PEP BOYS MANNY MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION TO HEARING BEFORE A DISCOVERY COMMISSIONER AS A TEMPORARY JUDGE (TRANSACTION ID # 27831967) FILED BY DEFENDANT PEP BOYS MANNY MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR WRONGFUL DEATH - ASBESTOS (TRANSACTION ID # 27831967) FILED BY DEFENDANT PEP BOYS MANNY MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA (Fee:370.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 27478856) FILED BY DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 27478856) FILED BY DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (Fee:370.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF REEDER, WILMA ,AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO GEORGE REEDER, DECEASED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2009
  • DocketPRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF REEDER, WILMA ,AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO GEORGE REEDER, DECEASED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF REEDER, WILMA ,AS WRONGFUL DEATH HEIR, AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO GEORGE REEDER, DECEASED AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, C, H, I, J, N DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-19-2010 (Fee:370.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less