This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/10/2021 at 14:30:59 (UTC).

WILLIAM VILLARROEL ET AL VS. RECOLOGY, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/02/2021 WILLIAM VILLARROEL filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against RECOLOGY, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SAMUEL K. FENG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9528

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

SAMUEL K. FENG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SAND, ROBERT F. INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

SAND, LIESE L. INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

VILLARROEL, WILLIAM INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Defendants

RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

RECOLOGY, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DOES 1 TO 100, INCLUSIVE

RECOLOGY GOLDEN GATE A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SUNSET SCAVENGER COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ONGARO, DAVID R

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

BUSINESS TORT, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF VILLARROEL, WILLIAM INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SAND, LIESE L. INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SAND, ROBERT F. INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED AS TO DEFENDANT RECOLOGY, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION RECOLOGY GOLDEN GATE A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SUNSET SCAVENGER COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1 TO 100, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-07-2021 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-05-2021 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-14-2021 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF VILLARROEL, WILLIAM INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SAND, LIESE L. INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SAND, ROBERT F. INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

Proof of Service of Summons

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 66345021), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF VILLARROEL, WILLIAM INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SAND, LIESE L. INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SAND, ROBERT F. INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SERVED FEB-16-2021, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE FEB-16-2021 AS TO DEFENDANT RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Plaintiffs William Villarroel, Liese L. Sand and Robert F. Sands Appli

APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF COMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION / APPLICATION REQUESTING COMPLEX DESIGNATION (TRANSACTION ID # 66347944) FILED BY PLAINTIFF VILLARROEL, WILLIAM INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SAND, LIESE L. INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SAND, ROBERT F. INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2021
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • FinancialPayment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : H2321217M021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF COMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION / APPLICATION REQUESTING COMPLEX DESIGNATION (TRANSACTION ID # 66347944) FILED BY PLAINTIFF VILLARROEL, WILLIAM INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SAND, LIESE L. INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SAND, ROBERT F. INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED (Fee:$60.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 66345021), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF VILLARROEL, WILLIAM INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SAND, LIESE L. INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SAND, ROBERT F. INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SERVED FEB-16-2021, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE FEB-16-2021 AS TO DEFENDANT RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF VILLARROEL, WILLIAM INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SAND, LIESE L. INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SAND, ROBERT F. INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $1450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W1121209F003

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBUSINESS TORT, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF VILLARROEL, WILLIAM INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SAND, LIESE L. INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED SAND, ROBERT F. INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED AS TO DEFENDANT RECOLOGY, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION RECOLOGY SAN FRANCISCO A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION RECOLOGY GOLDEN GATE A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION SUNSET SCAVENGER COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1 TO 100, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-07-2021 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-05-2021 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-14-2021 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:$1450.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less