This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/24/2016 at 20:15:57 (UTC).

WILLIAM SUTTON VS. ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED et al

Case Summary

On 06/13/2013 WILLIAM SUTTON filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6162

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUTTON, WILLIAM

Defendants

TRANE US, INC. FKA AMERICAN STANDARD, INC.;

SUN SHIP, LLC

MACARTHUR COMPANY;

MOORE DRY DOCK COMPANY SUED HEREIN AS DOE #2 MOORE SECURITIES COMPANY

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.;

CBS CORPORATION (FKA VIACOM INC., FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION);

ABB INC.

ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED

WESTERN MACARTHUR COMPANY;

OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.;

WESTERN ASBESTOS COMPANY;

HOPEMAN BROTHERS, INC.;

DOES 1 THROUGH 800, INCLUSIVE

CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION [SUED AS CBS CORPORATION (F/K/A VIACOM INC., F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATI

A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY;

BORGWARNER MORSE TEC INC., AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO BORG-WARNER CORPORATION;

J.T. THORPE & SON, INC.;

ASSOCIATED INSULATION OF CALIFORNIA;

Other

DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRAYTON, ALAN RICHARD

Attorney at BRAYTON PURCELL LLP

222 Rush Landing Road, P.O. Box 6169

Novato, CA 94948

Defendant and Other Attorneys

FONG, CAMILLE KAMEE

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

333 Bush Street, Suite 1100

San Francisco, CA 94104

LOVE, MARK A

Attorney at SELMAN BREITMAN LLP

33 New Montgomery, Sixth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

SPANOS, EVANTHIA M

Attorney at BERRY & BERRYA PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION

2930 Lakeshore Ave

Oakland, CA 94610

WATANABE, ELMI

Attorney at WILSON ELSER

525 Market Steet 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

KELLEY, RENEE C.

Attorney at SCHIFF HARDIN LLP

One Market, Spear Street Tower, Thirty-Second Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

POND, FRANK D

Pond North Llp, 350 South Grand Avenue, Suite 3300

Los Angeles, CA 90071

GREENE, RAYMOND ALBERT

Attorney at BURNHAM BROWN

P.O. Box 119, 1901 Harrison St., 11Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94604

POPOVICH, JERRY C

Attorney at SELMAN BREITMAN LLP

6 Hutton Centre Drive, Suite 1100

Santa Ana, CA 92707-5755

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, EDLIN, HUIE & BLUM LLP

500 Washington Street, Ste 700

San Francisco, CA 94111

Other Attorneys

MCCALL, MICHAEL T

Attorney at WALSWORTH, FRANKLIN, BEVINS & MCCALL, LLP

601 Montgomery Street, 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

BIDERMAN, DAVID T.

Attorney at PERKINS COIE LLP

Four Embarcadero Center #2400

San Francisco, CA 94111

BASSI, MARTE JOSEPH

Attorney at BASSI, EDLIN, HUIE, & BLUM LLP

500 Washington St., Ste. 700

San Francisco, CA 94111

SPIRA, KIRSTEN HICKS

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON LLP

633 West Fifth Street, Ste 700

Los Angeles, CA 90071

DUMONT, RICHARD DANA

Attorney at SELMAN BREITMAN LLP

33 New Montgomery, Sixth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF DAMAGES AGAINST DEFENDANT ASSOCIATED INSULATION OF CALIFORNIA

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF DAMAGES AGAINST DEFENDANT ASSOCIATED INSULATION OF CALIFORNIA (TRANSACTION ID # 56246748) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SUTTON, WILLIAM

TEXT JUDGMENT

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF DAMAGES AGAINST DEFENDANT ASSOCIATED INSULATION OF CALIFORNIA SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

DECLARATION OF NANCY T. WILLIAMS IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT ASSOCIATED INSULATION OF CALIFORNIA

DECLARATION OF DECLARATION OF NANCY T. WILLIAMS IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT ASSOCIATED INSULATION OF CALIFORNIA (TRANSACTION ID # 55865044) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SUTTON, WILLIAM

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT ASSOCIATED INSULATION OF CALIFORNIA

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (TRANSACTION ID # 55865044) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SUTTON, WILLIAM

APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT ASSOCIATED INSULATION OF CALIFORNIA

APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT ASSOCIATED INSULATION OF CALIFORNIA (TRANSACTION ID # 55865044) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SUTTON, WILLIAM AS TO DEFENDANT ASSOCIATED INSULATION OF CALIFORNIA; HEARING SET FOR OCT-16-2014 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 514 (Fee:60.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE RE DEFENDANT ABB, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS

PROOF OF SERVICE RE DEFENDANT ABB, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS (TRANSACTION ID # 54787441) FILED BY DEFENDANT ABB INC.

DECLARATION OF AARON COSTA IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ABB, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DECLARATION OF AARON COSTA IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ABB, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 54787441) FILED BY DEFENDANT ABB INC.

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ABB, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ABB, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 54787441) FILED BY DEFENDANT ABB INC.

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ABB, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 54787441) FILED BY DEFENDANT ABB INC.

COMPLAINT

ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SUTTON, WILLIAM AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY; ABB INC. WHICH WILL DO BUSINESS IN CA. AS ABB DE INC.; ASSOCIATED INSULATION OF CALIFORNIA; BORGWARNER MORSE TEC INC., AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO BORG-WARNER CORPORATION; CBS CORPORATION (FKA VIACOM INC., FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION); CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC.; DOES 1 THROUGH 800, INCLUSIVE HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.; HOPEMAN BROTHERS, INC.; INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY; J.T. THORPE & SON, INC.; LAMONS GASKET COMPANY; MACARTHUR COMPANY; METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY; OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.; PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION; THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING COMPANY; TRANE US, INC. FKA AMERICAN STANDARD, INC.; WESTERN ASBESTOS COMPANY; WESTERN MACARTHUR COMPANY; SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-19-2014 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:1450.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANTS TRUE NAMES FOR DOES 1 AND 2

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANTS TRUE NAMES FOR DOES 1 AND 2 (TRANSACTION ID # 53024904) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SUTTON, WILLIAM (Fee:60.00)

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANTS TRUE NAMES FOR DOES 1 AND 2

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES ISO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFTS' TRUE NAME FOR DOES 1 AND 2(TRANSACTION ID # 53024904) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SUTTON, WILLIAM

DECLARATION OF NANCY T. WILLIAMS IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANTS TRUE NAMES FOR DOES 1 AND 2

DECLARATION OF NANCY T. WILLIAMS IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANTS TRUE NAMES FOR DOES 1 AND 2 (TRANSACTION ID # 53024904) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SUTTON, WILLIAM

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANTS' TRUE NAMES FOR DOES 1 AND 2

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANTS TRUE NAMES FOR DOES 1 AND 2

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFTS TRUE NAMES FOR DOES 1 AND 2 (TRANSACTION ID # 53058357) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SUTTON, WILLIAM

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANTS TRUE NAMES FOR DOES 1 AND 2

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 53058357) DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 1 TO BE SUN SHIP, LLC DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 2 TO BE MOORE SECURITIES COMPANY

DEFENDANT ABB INC.S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY - ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 53120175) FILED BY DEFENDANT ABB INC. (Fee:1450.00)

96 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 58565039) FILED BY DEFENDANT ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL, WITH PREJUDICE, OF ALL ALLEGATIONS, IF ANY, RELATED TO EXPOSURE TO ASBESTOS ON OR AFTER DECEMBER 5, 1980, AS TO ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED, AND HEREBY AMENDS HIS OR HER COMPLAINT ACCORDINGLY (TRANSACTION ID # 58520632) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SUTTON, WILLIAM AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON NOV-05-2015. DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT FILED ON 11/3/15. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 58102803)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS (TRANSACTION ID # 57768353) AS TO DEFENDANT J.T. THORPE & SON, INC.;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON AUG-06-2015 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON NOV-05-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, KIMBERLY CHU. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2015
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON APR-02-2015 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON AUG-06-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, ATTY. JOHANNES DEMARZI. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: D. LOK; COURT REPORTER: MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 56614550) AS TO DEFENDANT CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, F/K/A VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION [SUED AS CBS CORPORATION (F/K/A VIACOM INC., F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION)]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF DAMAGES AGAINST DEFENDANT ASSOCIATED INSULATION OF CALIFORNIA (TRANSACTION ID # 56246748) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SUTTON, WILLIAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF DAMAGES AGAINST DEFENDANT ASSOCIATED INSULATION OF CALIFORNIA SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
111 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 53163751) FILED BY DEFENDANT BORGWARNER MORSE TEC INC., AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO BORG-WARNER CORPORATION; (Fee:1450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 53120175) FILED BY DEFENDANT ABB INC. (Fee:1450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 53058357) DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 1 TO BE SUN SHIP, LLC DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 2 TO BE MOORE SECURITIES COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFTS TRUE NAMES FOR DOES 1 AND 2 (TRANSACTION ID # 53058357) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SUTTON, WILLIAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANTS' TRUE NAMES FOR DOES 1 AND 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF NANCY T. WILLIAMS IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANTS TRUE NAMES FOR DOES 1 AND 2 (TRANSACTION ID # 53024904) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SUTTON, WILLIAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES ISO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFTS' TRUE NAME FOR DOES 1 AND 2(TRANSACTION ID # 53024904) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SUTTON, WILLIAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDMENT TO THE COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANTS TRUE NAMES FOR DOES 1 AND 2 (TRANSACTION ID # 53024904) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SUTTON, WILLIAM (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SUTTON, WILLIAM AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY; ABB INC. WHICH WILL DO BUSINESS IN CA. AS ABB DE INC.; ASSOCIATED INSULATION OF CALIFORNIA; BORGWARNER MORSE TEC INC., AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO BORG-WARNER CORPORATION; CBS CORPORATION (FKA VIACOM INC., FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION); CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC.; DOES 1 THROUGH 800, INCLUSIVE HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.; HOPEMAN BROTHERS, INC.; INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY; J.T. THORPE & SON, INC.; LAMONS GASKET COMPANY; MACARTHUR COMPANY; METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY; OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.; PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION; THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING COMPANY; TRANE US, INC. FKA AMERICAN STANDARD, INC.; WESTERN ASBESTOS COMPANY; WESTERN MACARTHUR COMPANY; SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-19-2014 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:1450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******6162
Case Title:WILLIAM SUTTON VS. ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED et al
Court Date:AUG-15-2019 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Set Aside Default And Default Judgment Against Defendant Associated Insulation Of California; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities
Rulings: On Asbestos Law and Motion Calendar for Thursday, August 15, 2019 in Department 503, Line 8. Specially-Appearing United States Fire Insurance Company's Motion to Set Aside Default and Default Judgment Against Defendant Associated Insulation of California is denied. U.S. Fire lacks standing to bring this motion or appear in the action at this time. (W. Heritage Ins. Co. v. Superior Court (2011) 199 Cal. App. 4th 1196, 1205 n. 12 ["Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 387, the trial court has discretion to permit a nonparty to intervene whereu2026the nonparty has a direct and immediate interest in the actionu2026"].) U.S. Fire has not demonstrated that it remains liable for any default judgment against Associated. (Id.) If a hearing is requested, it will be at 9:30 a.m. A court reporter will not be provided by the court. If any party wishes to have the matter reported, the parties must meet and confer to agree on only one court reporter for any reported matter in this case. There will be only one official record in a case. The designated reporter must be licensed pursuant to Bus. & Prof. Code, Sec. 8016. If the parties are unable to agree on one reporter, the court will designate a qualified court reporter that will provide the official transcript for the matter. The party or parties shall pay for the cost of reporter. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestasbestostr@sftc.org by 4:30 p.m. stating their intention to contest. If a tentative ruling is contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing. If a tentative ruling is not contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must either bring the proposed order to the hearing or submit it after the hearing in compliance with CRC 3.1312. = (503/CML)


Case Number:*******6162
Case Title:WILLIAM SUTTON VS. ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED et al
Court Date:AUG-06-2019 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Set Aside Default And Default Judgment Against Defendant Associated Insulation Of California; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities
Rulings: On Asbestos Law and Motion Calendar for Tuesday, August 6, 2019 in Department 503, Line 3. Specially-Appearing United States Fire Insurance Company's Motion to Set Aside Default and Default Judgment Against Defendant Associated Insulation of California is continued to August 15, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. in Department 503. = (503/CML)


Case Number:*******6162
Case Title:WILLIAM SUTTON VS. ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED et al
Court Date:NOV-27-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR PREFERENCE / PREFERENTIAL SETTING
Rulings: On Asbestos Trial Motion Calendar for Wednesday, November 27, 2013 in Department 503 at 9:30 a.m., Line 1. Plaintiffu00BFs motion for preference is granted per C.C.P. 36(a). Trial is March 24, 2014 at 11:15am in Department 503. Before any motions in limine are filed with the court the defendants are ordered to meet and confer on all motions in limine in order to avoid frivolous and duplicative hearings. If the parties do not meet and confer on the motions in limine the court will take appropriate actions. Last day for hearing summary motions is March 19, 2014. Summary motions shall be brought on regular notice pursuant to the relevant provisions of the C.C.P., unless plaintiff stipulates otherwise at the hearing. Plaintiffu00BFs deposition needs to be scheduled and at the hearing the court will discuss a deadline for such deposition to conclude. The time to respond to written discovery is shortened to 20 days. Plaintiff to make a settlement demand on defendants no later than February 10, 2014. Responses to the demand are due no later than February 17, 2014. Settlement conference in room 603 at 1:30pm on March 19, 2014. Fact discovery cut-off date is March 7, 2014. Expert discovery cut-off date is March 21, 2014. No later than December 13, 2013, plaintiff must provide a statement stating, as to each defendant, the name and contact information of each lay person with knowledge of any facts supporting any of plaintiffu00BFs claims. No later than December 13, 2013, defendants must provide a statement stating the name and contact information of each lay person with knowledge of any facts supporting any of defendantu00BFs affirmative defenses. Any person not identified on the statements will be barred from testifying at trial or presenting a declaration on a summary motion absent good cause shown. Further case management conference on January 29, 2014 at 1:30pm. No need for any party to file any case management conference statement. Parties may appear at the conference by telephone. There will be a mandatory settlement conference with the court pursuant to San Francisco Local Rules of Court Rule 5 on March 24, 2014 at 1:30p.m. in Department 503. The parties shall comply with Local Rule 5.0 and provide a confidential settlement statement by March 20, 2014 at 2:00p.m. If a hearing is requested, it will be at 9:45a.m. A court reporter will not be provided by the court. If any party wishes to have the matter reported, the parties must meet and confer to agree on only one court reporter for any reported matter in this case. There will be only one official record in a case. The designated reporter must be licensed pursuant to Bus. & Prof. Code, Sec. 8016. If the parties are unable to agree on one reporter, the court will designate a qualified court reporter that will provide the official transcript for the matter. The party or parties shall pay for the cost of reporter. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestasbestostr@sftc.org by 4:30pm stating their intention to contest. If a tentative ruling is contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing. If a tentative ruling is not contested, the prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must either bring the proposed order to the hearing or submit it after the hearing in compliance with CRC 3.1312. = (503/TLJ)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Western MacArthur Company is a litigant

Latest cases where MACARTHUR COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where SUN SHIP, LLC is a litigant