This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/04/2016 at 02:22:39 (UTC).

WILLIAM POLLOCK et al VS. TIMOTHY MULLINS et al

Case Summary

On 05/08/2009 WILLIAM POLLOCK filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against TIMOTHY MULLINS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8210

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FRIEDBERG, VICKI

POLLOCK, WILLIAM

Defendants and Cross Defendants

MULLINS & CO.

MULLINS, TIMOTHY

DOES 1 THRU 20, INCL.

MCCANN, FRANK

MULLINS & COMPANY

S.J. GOGOL CONSTRUCTION

ROES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE

ROES 1-10, INCLUSIVE

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

S.J. GOGOL CONSTRUCTION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CONRAD, DANIEL ALFRED

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF DANIEL A. CONRAD

600 Townsend Street, Suite 375 East

San Francisco, CA 94103

MCNABB, SANDRA JO

SLAVITT, HOWARD A

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

BABBITS, DENNIS ALAN

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF DENNIS P. ISAAC

Two Rincon Ctr, 121 Spear St, Ste 410

San Francisco, CA 94105

WALLACE, KEVIN J

Attorney at LOSCH & EHRLICH

425 California Street, Suite 2025

San Francisco, CA 94104

COLUCCI, DONALD JOHN

Attorney at WOLKIN . CURRAN, LLP

555 Montgomery Street, Suite 1100

San Francisco, CA 94111

LOSCH, RONALD KONRAD

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

COLUCCI, DONALD JOHN

Attorney at WOLKIN . CURRAN, LLP

555 Montgomery Street, Suite 1100

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

FRAUD, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF POLLOCK, WILLIAM FRIEDBERG, VICKI AS TO DEFENDANT MULLINS, TIMOTHY MULLINS & CO. S.J. GOGOL CONSTRUCTION MCCANN, FRANK DOES 1 THRU 20, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-09-2009 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-07-2009 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON SEP-24-2009 (Fee:365.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT S.J. GOGOL CONSTRUCTION (Fee:365.00)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT MULLINS, TIMOTHY MULLINS & COMPANY (Fee:730.00)

Notice of Time and Place of Trial and Mandatory Settlement Conference

NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON APR-16-2010 AT 11:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 303. NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR MAY-03-2010 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON OCT-09-2009 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ANSWER

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT MULLINS, TIMOTHY MULLINS & COMPANY

NOTICE OF EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE--EARLY SETTLEMENT PRGM

NOTICE OF EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT MCCANN, FRANK

NOTICE OF EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE--EARLY SETTLEMENT PRGM

AMENDED NOTICE OF EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM

NOTICE OF EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE--EARLY SETTLEMENT PRGM

AMENDED NOTICE OF EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM

Order Setting Case Management Conference

REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR ON MAY-10-2010. ASSIGNED TO PRETRIAL DEPT. 212 ON SEP-03-2010 AT 9:00 AM FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR STATUS OF STAY PENDING ARBITRATION. ORDER RE STIPULATION TO STAY LITIGATION FILED 3/4/10. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. (206)

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF SEP-03-2010 CONTINUED TO DEC-03-2010 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 212, FOR STATUS OF ARBITRATION STAY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAR-04-2011 CONTINUED TO JUL-08-2011 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF ARBITRATION STAY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT S.J. GOGOL CONSTRUCTION

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-08-2011 CONTINUED TO SEP-09-2011 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF ARBITRATION STAY OR DISMISSAL OF ALL CROSS-COMPLAINTS. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY MULLINS, TIMOTHY, MULLINS & COMPANY

Order To Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO CROSS-COMPLAINANT S.J. GOGOL CONSTRUCTION SET FOR OCT-24-2011 CONTINUED TO DEC-12-2011 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO DISMISS SEP-23-2009 S.J. GOGOL CONSTRUCTION CROSS-COMPLAINT. THE OCT-24-2011 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY S.J. GOGOL CONSTRUCTION

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF DEC-12-2011 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FILED BY DEFENDANT S.J. GOGOL CONSTRUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2011
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT S.J. GOGOL CONSTRUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY S.J. GOGOL CONSTRUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO CROSS-COMPLAINANT S.J. GOGOL CONSTRUCTION SET FOR OCT-24-2011 CONTINUED TO DEC-12-2011 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO DISMISS SEP-23-2009 S.J. GOGOL CONSTRUCTION CROSS-COMPLAINT. THE OCT-24-2011 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 THRU 20, INCL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR OCT-24-2011 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 1:30 PM FOR FAILURE TO DISMISS DOES 1-20 OF COMPLAINT; TO DISMISS S. J. GOGOL'S CROSS COMPLAINT. THE SEP-09-2011 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY MULLINS, TIMOTHY, MULLINS & COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-08-2011 CONTINUED TO SEP-09-2011 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF ARBITRATION STAY OR DISMISSAL OF ALL CROSS-COMPLAINTS. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT S.J. GOGOL CONSTRUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2009
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT S.J. GOGOL CONSTRUCTION JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2009
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT MULLINS & COMPANY JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT MCCANN, FRANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT S.J. GOGOL CONSTRUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • GENERAL DENIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT MCCANN, FRANK (Fee:365.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT MULLINS, TIMOTHY MULLINS & COMPANY AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT S.J. GOGOL CONSTRUCTION MCCANN, FRANK ROES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT MULLINS, TIMOTHY MULLINS & COMPANY (Fee:730.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT S.J. GOGOL CONSTRUCTION (Fee:365.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • FRAUD, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF POLLOCK, WILLIAM FRIEDBERG, VICKI AS TO DEFENDANT MULLINS, TIMOTHY MULLINS & CO. S.J. GOGOL CONSTRUCTION MCCANN, FRANK DOES 1 THRU 20, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-09-2009 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-07-2009 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON SEP-24-2009 (Fee:365.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.