This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 06/18/2018 at 16:03:20 (UTC).

WILLIAM FOLEY VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (BP) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 02/06/2007 WILLIAM FOLEY filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS BP AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PETER J. BUSCH, CHARLOTTE W. WOOLARD, DAVID BALLATI, JAMES J. MCBRIDE, PATRICK J. MAHONEY, PANG LY, THOMAS J. MELLON, JR., HAROLD E. KAHN and PAUL H. ALVARADO. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4054

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

PETER J. BUSCH

CHARLOTTE W. WOOLARD

DAVID BALLATI

JAMES J. MCBRIDE

PATRICK J. MAHONEY

PANG LY

THOMAS J. MELLON, JR.

HAROLD E. KAHN

PAUL H. ALVARADO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FOLEY, WILLIAM

Defendants

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

SUN SHIP, LLC

ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST

ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (BP) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, D, H, I

DOES 1-8500; AND SEE ATTACHED LIST

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC.

SEARIVER MARITIME, INC.

ADVOCATE MINES LIMITED

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

CRANE CO.

RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION

BARNETT TOOL & ENGINEERING, ERRONEOUSLY NAMED HEREIN AS BARNETT PERFORMANCE PRODUCTS, SUED AS DOE 12

PNEUMO ABEX LLC, SII TO ABEX CORP.

THOMAS DEE ENGINEERING CO., INC.

GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION

NATIONAL AUTOMOTIVE PARTS ASSOCIATION (NAPA)

POLAR TANKERS, INC., ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY, ARCO MARINE, INC., SINCLAIR REFINING COMPANY, SINCLAIR OIL COMPANY, AND PETROLEUM TANKERS, INC.

LEAR SIEGLER DIVERSIFIED HOLDINGS CORP.

CHEVRON SHIPPING CO.

46 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON AND PURCELL LLPATTORNEYS AT LAW, PO BOX 6169

222 Rush Landing Road

Novato, CA 94948

Defendant Attorneys

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

GIFFORD, DAVID ALLAN

Attorney at STEVENS DRUMMOND & GIFFORD

1910 Olympic Blvd #250

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

GRANIEZ, JOHN A.

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

221 North Figueroa St. #1200

Los Angeles, CA 90012

LANKFORD, PAUL V

Attorney at LANKFORD & CRAWFORD, LLP

2 Theatre Square, Suite 240

Orinda, CA 94563

GILL, RAYMOND LAWRENCE

Attorney at KIRKPATRICK & LOCKHART PRESTON GATES ELLIS LLP

55 Second Street,, Suite 1700

San Francisco, CA 94105

SAMSON, IVOR ELIAS

Attorney at SONNENSCHEIN NATH & ROSENTHAL LLP

525 Market Street, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 941052708

CARROLL, BROOK J.

Attorney at NORDMAN CORMANY HAIR & COMPTON LLP

1000 Town Center Drive, 6Th Floor

Oxnard, CA 93031

BOUTIN, PETER RUCKER

Attorney at KEESAL, YOUNG & LOGAN

4 Embarcadero Ctr #1500

San Francisco, CA 94111

Other Attorneys

HARRIS, JULIE

Attorney at NOVELIS CORPORATION

6060 Parkland Boulevard

Cleveland, OH 44124

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLPEMBARCADERO CENTER WEST

275 Battery Street, 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at ESKANOS & ADLER

2325 Clayton Road

Concord, CA 94520

TILLMAN, JOHN C

Attorney at NOVELIS CORPORATION

6060 Parkland Boulevard

Cleveland, OH 44124

SHELDON, CHARLES T

Attorney at SEDGWICK,DETERT,MORAN & ARNOLD LLP

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

ZELDIN, KIM STACY

Attorney at LINER GRODE STEIN YANKELEVITZ SUNSHINE REGENSTREIF & TAYLOR LLP

1999 Fremont Street, 20Th Flr

San Francisco, CA 941052255

RIEHLE, PAUL JEFFREY

Attorney at SEDGWICK, DETERT, MORAN & ARNOLD

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower, 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

CALLE, NANCY

Attorney at TROPIO & MORLAN

21700 Oxnard Street Ste 1700

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

TRAPANI, THOMAS ANTHONY

Attorney at ADAMS, NYE, SINUNU, BRUNI, BECHT LLP

222 Kearny Street, Seventh Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

KRAFT, ROBERT S

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

14 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Dismissal

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 35704071) FILED BY DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS, LLC

DEFENDANT DOWMAN PRODUCTS, INC.S MOTION IN LIMINE #8 TO EXCLUDE ALL WITNESSES, EVIDENCE AND CLAIMS NOT PREVIOUSLY DISCLOSED BY PLAINTIFFS IN DISCOVERY

DEFENDANT DOWMAN PRODUCTS, INC.S MOTION IN LIMINE #8 TO EXCLUDE ALL WITNESSES, EVIDENCE AND CLAIMS NOT PREVIOUSLY DISCLOSED BY PLAINTIFFS IN DISCOVERY (TRANSACTION ID # 33179457) FILED BY DEFENDANT DOWMAN PRODUCTS, INC.

DEFENDANT DOWMAN PRODUCTS, INC.S MOTION IN LIMINE # 3 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OR SIMILAR PENDING ACTIONS

DEFENDANT DOWMAN PRODUCTS, INC.S MOTION IN LIMINE # 3 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OR SIMILAR PENDING ACTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 33179457) FILED BY DEFENDANT DOWMAN PRODUCTS, INC.

Defendant Warren Pumps, LLCs Notice for Plaintiff to Appear at Trial

NOTICE FOR PLAINTIFF TO APPEAR AT TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 32976718) FILED BY DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS, LLC

Request for Dismissal

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 29542367) AS TO DEFENDANT J.T. THORPE & SON, INC.

DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS, LLC?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 12: TO EXCLUDE CAROL MCDONALD as plaintiff expert

MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 12: TO EXCLUDE CAROL MCDONALD AS PLTF EXPERT (TRANSACTION ID # 28620069) FILED BY DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS, LLC

DECLARATION OF SUSANNE G. ARANI IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS, LLC?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 11: TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF POST-SALE CONDUCT

DECLARATION OF SUSANNE G. ARANI IN SUPPORT OF MO IN LIMINE NO. 11: TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF POST-SALE CONDUCT (TRANSACTION ID # 28620069) FILED BY DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS, LLC

DECLARATION OF SUSANNE G. ARANI IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS, LLC?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5: TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF UNDISCLOSED WITNESSES

DECLARATION OF SUSANNE G. ARANI IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5: TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF UNDISCLOSED WITNESSES (TRANSACTION ID # 28596949) FILED BY DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS, LLC

DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS, LLC?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2: TO EXCLUDE THE ?NO SAFE DOSE? AND ?SINGLE FIBER? ARGUMENTS

MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2: TO EXCLUDE THE "NO SAFE DOSE" AND "SINGLE FIBER" ARGUMENTS (TRANSACTION ID # 28596949) FILED BY DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS, LLC

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 41148494) AS TO DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT HOPEMAN BROTHERS, INC. ONLY

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 38690944) AS TO DEFENDANT HOPEMAN BROTHERS, INC.

DECLARATION OF STEVE J. SHIN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT DOWMAN PRODUCTS, INC.S MOTION IN LIMINE #5 REGARDING REQUEST FOR OFFER OF PROOF RE: FIXALL

DECLARATION OF STEVE J. SHIN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT DOWMAN PRODUCTS, INC.S MOTION IN LIMINE #5 REGARDING REQUEST FOR OFFER OF PROOF RE: FIXALL (TRANSACTION ID # 33179457) FILED BY DEFENDANT DOWMAN PRODUCTS, INC.

DEFENDANT DOWMAN PRODUCTS, INC.S MOTION IN LIMINE #11 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE PERTAINING TO SAFETY ORDERS OR LABOR CODE STATUTES

DEFENDANT DOWMAN PRODUCTS, INC.S MOTION IN LIMINE #11 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE PERTAINING TO SAFETY ORDERS OR LABOR CODE STATUTES (TRANSACTION ID # 33179457) FILED BY DEFENDANT DOWMAN PRODUCTS, INC.

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENSE MOTION IN LIMINE FOR AN ORDER PRECLUDING EVIDENCE, ARGUMENT OR REFERENCE TO PUNITIVE DAMAGES UNTIL PRELIMINARY FINDING OF MALICE, FRAUD OR OPPRESSION MADE BY JURY

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENSE MOTION IN LIMINE FOR AN ORDER PRECLUDING EVIDENCE, ARGUMENT OR REFERENCE TO PUNITIVE DAMAGES UNTIL PRELIMINARY FINDING OF MALICE, FRAUD OR OPPRESSION MADE BY JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 33179457) FILED BY DEFENDANT DOWMAN PRODUCTS, INC.

DEFENDANT DOWMAN PRODUCTS, INC.S MOTION IN LIMINE #5 REGARDING REQUEST FOR OFFER OF PROOF RE: FIXALL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF STEVE J. SHIN

DEFENDANT DOWMAN PRODUCTS, INC.S MOTION IN LIMINE #5 REGARDING REQUEST FOR OFFER OF PROOF RE: FIXALL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF STEVE J. SHIN (TRANSACTION ID # 33179457) FILED BY DEFENDANT DOWMAN PRODUCTS, INC.

DEFENDANT DOWMAN PRODUCTS, INC.S MOTION IN LIMINE # 1-JOINDER IN ALL DEFENDANTS MOTIONS IN LIMINE

DEFENDANT DOWMAN PRODUCTS, INC.S MOTION IN LIMINE # 1-JOINDER IN ALL DEFENDANTS MOTIONS IN LIMINE (TRANSACTION ID # 33179457) FILED BY DEFENDANT DOWMAN PRODUCTS, INC.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY - CIVIL

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 32790699): CUNNINGHAM, JAMES PATRICK SUBSTITUTED FOR CUNNINGHAM, JAMES PATRICK AS ATTORNEY FOR WARREN PUMPS, LLC

DECLARATION OF SUSANNE ARANI IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS, LLC?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO 8: TO COMPEL PRODUCTION AND DISCLOSURE OF SETTLEMENTS REACHED IN THIS CASE

DECLARATION OF SUSANNE ARANI IN SUPPORT OF MO IN LIMINE NO 8: TO COMPEL PRODUCTION AND DISCLOSURE OF SETTLEMENTS REACHED IN THIS CASE (TRANSACTION ID # 28620069) FILED BY DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS, LLC

262 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2009
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $365; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : B1209302F017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2008
  • Payment : MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Amount : $200; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : B5208B17M002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2008
  • Payment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : R1608A15J027

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2008
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $40; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R0208A07M018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2008
  • Payment : JURY FEES; Amount : $150; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R0208A02J009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2008
  • Payment : OUT OF STATE DEPOSITION; Amount : $20; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : B4708808O001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2008
  • Payment : MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Amount : $200; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : B5208804M004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2008
  • Payment : MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Amount : $200; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : B7408714M005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2008
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $335; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : B1208711F021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2008
  • Payment : MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Amount : $200; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : W1508710M010

    Read MoreRead Less
370 More Docket Entries
  • 04/03/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14349820) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST (Fee:$335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14336683) FILED BY DEFENDANT J.T. THORPE & SON, INC. (Fee:$335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14315991) FILED BY DEFENDANT BP PRODUCTS NORTH AMERICA, INC. (Fee:$335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANT LESLIE CONTROLS, INC.S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 14290620) FILED BY DEFENDANT LESLIE CONTROLS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14279899) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY (Fee:$335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14235603) FILED BY DEFENDANT TEXACO MARINE SERVICES, INC. (Fee:$335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14220675) FILED BY DEFENDANT LESLIE CONTROLS, INC. (Fee:$335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF FOLEY, WILLIAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF FOLEY, WILLIAM AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (BP) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, D, H, I OTHER ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS DOES 1-8500; AND SEE ATTACHED LIST SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-21-2008 (Fee:$335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less