This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 05/15/2020 at 01:37:32 (UTC).

WILLIAM BYERLY VS. 2100 GREEN STREET, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/11/2020 WILLIAM BYERLY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against 2100 GREEN STREET, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GARRETT L. WONG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4406

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

GARRETT L. WONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BYERLY, WILLIAM

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE

2100 GREEN STREET, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WESTLEY, ANDREW E

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ANDREW WESTLEY

870 Market Street, Suite 788

San Francisco, CA 94102

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

QUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BYERLY, WILLIAM AS TO DEFENDANT 2100 GREEN STREET, INC. DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-14-2020 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-10-2020 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON SEP-21-2020

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2020
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: GARRETT L. WONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : B1020514F001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketQUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF BYERLY, WILLIAM AS TO DEFENDANT 2100 GREEN STREET, INC. DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-14-2020 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-10-2020 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON SEP-21-2020 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******4406
Case Title:WILLIAM BYERLY VS. 2100 GREEN STREET, INC. ET AL
Court Date:MAR-29-2022 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION TO STRIKE Amended COMPLAINT
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for March 29, 2022 line 2.DEFENDANT 2100 GREEN STREET, INC. MOTION TO STRIKE Amended COMPLAINTis continued May 13, 2022 on Court's own motion. =(501/CFH)Parties may appear in-person, telephonically or via Zoom (Video - Webinar ID: 836 2280 0051; Password: 613303; or Phone Dial in: (415) 762-9988; Webinar ID: 836 2280 0051; Password: 613303). Parties who intend to appear at the hearing must give notice to opposing parties and the court promptly, but no later than 4:00 p.m. the court day before the hearing unless the tentative ruling has specified that a hearing is required. Notice of contesting a tentative ruling shall be provided by sending an email to the court to Department501ContestTR@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. A party may not argue at the hearing if the opposing party is not so notified, and the opposing party does not appear.


Case Number:*******4406
Case Title:WILLIAM BYERLY VS. 2100 GREEN STREET, INC. ET AL
Court Date:MAR-15-2022 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION TO STRIKE Amended COMPLAINT
Rulings:Set for hearing on the Law and Motion Calendar for Tuesday, March 15, 2022, line 5. DEFENDANT 2100 GREEN STREET, INC'S MOTION TO STRIKE Amended COMPLAINT. Transferred to department 501 to be heard at 9:30 am on March 29, 2022. That department handles all real property matters SF Local Rule 8.10A1. =(302/RBU)


Case Number:*******4406
Case Title:WILLIAM BYERLY VS. 2100 GREEN STREET, INC. ET AL
Court Date:FEB-24-2022 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Plaintiff Further Responses To Written Discovery Without Objections And Request For Monetary Sanctions
Rulings:Matter on the Discovery Calendar for Thursday, February 24, 2022, Line 2, 1- DEFENDANT 2100 GREEN STREET, INC.'s Motion To Compel Plaintiff Further Responses To Written Discovery Without Objections And Request For Monetary Sanctions.Pro Tem Judge William Lynn, a member of the California State Bar who meets all the requirements set forth in CRC 2.812 to serve as a temporary judge, has been assigned to hear this motion. Prior to the hearing all parties to the motion will be asked to sign a stipulation agreeing that the motion may be heard by the Pro Tem Judge. If all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the hearing will proceed before the Judge Pro Tem who will decide the motion with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. If a party appears by telephone, the stipulation may be signed via fax or consent to sign given by email. If not all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the Pro Tem Judge will hold a hearing on the motion and, based on the papers submitted by the parties and the hearing, issue a report in the nature of a recommendation to the Dept. 302 Judge, who will then decide the motion. If a party does not appear at the hearing, the party will be deemed to have stipulated that the motion will be decided by the Pro Tem Judge with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. The Pro Tem Judge has issued the following tentative ruling:Parties to Appear. The Court notes that Defendant did not provide a courtesy copy of its moving and opposition papers as required by Local Rule 2.7. For the 9:00 a.m. Discovery calendar, all attorneys and parties are required to appear remotely. Hearings will be conducted by videoconference using Zoom. To appear at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link (DISCOVERY, DEPT 301 @ 9:00AM), or dial the corresponding phone number.Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to williamclynn@gmail.com with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. If parties have arranged for a court reporter to appear, please include the following in your email: (1) ensure that they are California Certified Shorthand Reporters; (2) the reporter's full contact information [name, CSR number, personal work email, and phone number]. If the reporter is not a California Certified Shorthand Reporter, the transcript cannot be certified for use in California courts. If the tentative ruling is not contested, the parties are deemed to have stipulated to the Pro Tem hearing the motion and the Pro Tem will sign an order confirming the tentative ruling. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must e-mail it to the Judge Pro Tem. =(302/JPT)


Case Number:*******4406
Case Title:WILLIAM BYERLY VS. 2100 GREEN STREET, INC. ET AL
Court Date:JAN-12-2022 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion For Leave To File Fourth Amended Complaint
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for January 12, 2022 line 4.PLAINTIFF WILLIAM BYERLY Notice Of Motion And Motion For Leave To File Fourth Amended Complaintis OFF CALENDAR. Stipulation and order on file. =(501/CFH)Parties may appear in-person, telephonically or via Zoom (Video - Webinar ID: 836 2280 0051; Password: 613303; or Phone Dial in: (415) 762-9988; Webinar ID: 836 2280 0051; Password: 613303). Parties who intend to appear at the hearing must give notice to opposing parties and the court promptly, but no later than 4:00 p.m. the court day before the hearing unless the tentative ruling has specified that a hearing is required. Notice of contesting a tentative ruling shall be provided by sending an email to the court to Department501ContestTR@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. A party may not argue at the hearing if the opposing party is not so notified, and the opposing party does not appear.


Case Number:*******4406
Case Title:WILLIAM BYERLY VS. 2100 GREEN STREET, INC. ET AL
Court Date:OCT-15-2020 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:DEMURRER to 1ST Amended COMPLAINT
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for October 15, 2020, line 3.DEFENDANT 2100 GREEN STREET, INC. DEMURRER to 1ST Amended COMPLAINTis SUSTAINED with leave to amend for plaintiff to re-assert its claim for injunctive relief as a remedy. =(501/CFH)


Case Number:*******4406
Case Title:WILLIAM BYERLY VS. 2100 GREEN STREET, INC. ET AL
Court Date:SEP-15-2020 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:DEMURRER to 1ST Amended COMPLAINT
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Tuesday, September 15, 2020, Line 11,DEFENDANT 2100 GREEN STREET, INC.'s DEMURRER to 1ST Amended COMPLAINTTransferred to be heard in Department 501 on October 15, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. That department handles all real property/breach of lease cases per SF Local Rule 8.10(A)(1). =(302/EPS)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WESTLEY, ANDREW E