Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/03/2016 at 17:42:38 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK, VS. MARIE ENRIQUE et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 WELLS FARGO BANK filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MARIE ENRIQUE. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4202

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR CERTIFICATE HOLDERS OF STRUCTURED ASSET MORTGAGE INVESTMENTS II INC. BEAR STEARNS MORTGAGE FUNDING TRUST 2006-AR1, MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2006-AR1

Defendants

ZEPEDA, SONIA

DOES 1 TO 6, INCL.

San Francisco, CA 94112

ENRIQUE, MARIE

San Francisco, CA 94112

ZEPEDA, GILMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NAIMAN, RANDALL D

Attorney at NAIMAN LAW GROUP, PC

466 La Jolla Village Dr., Suite 850

San Diego, CA 92122

Defendant Attorney

BRAVO, JOSEPH K.

Attorney at BRAVO & MARGULIES

901 Market Street, Suite 450

San Francisco, CA 94103

 

Court Documents

PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION

PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED BY DEFENDANT ZEPEDA, SONIA (Fee:IFP)

Entry of Default Reject

REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR CERTIFICATE HOLDERS OF STRUCTURED ASSET MORTGAGE INVESTMENTS II INC. BEAR STEARNS MORTGAGE FUNDING TRUST 2006-AR1, MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2006-AR1 AS TO DEFENDANT ENRIQUE, MARIE DOES 1 TO 6, INCL.

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ZEPEDA, SONIA

COMPLAINT

UNLAWFUL DETAINER - RESIDENTIAL, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR CERTIFICATE HOLDERS OF STRUCTURED ASSET MORTGAGE INVESTMENTS II INC. BEAR STEARNS MORTGAGE FUNDING TRUST 2006-AR1, MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2006-AR1 AS TO DEFENDANT ENRIQUE, MARIE DOES 1 TO 6, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:240.00)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ZEPEDA, GILMA

Notice to Defendants

NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS

PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION

PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED BY DEFENDANT ZEPEDA, GILMA (Fee:IFP)

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY NAIMAN, RANDALL D

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR CERTIFICATE HOLDERS OF STRUCTURED ASSET MORTGAGE INVESTMENTS II INC. BEAR STEARNS MORTGAGE FUNDING TRUST 2006-AR1, MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2006-AR1 AS TO DEFENDANT ENRIQUE, MARIE DOES 1 TO 6, INCL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ZEPEDA, GILMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ZEPEDA, SONIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2013
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY DEFENDANT ZEPEDA, SONIA ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2013
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY DEFENDANT ZEPEDA, GILMA ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED BY DEFENDANT ZEPEDA, GILMA (Fee:IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED BY DEFENDANT ZEPEDA, SONIA (Fee:IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY NAIMAN, RANDALL D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - RESIDENTIAL, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR CERTIFICATE HOLDERS OF STRUCTURED ASSET MORTGAGE INVESTMENTS II INC. BEAR STEARNS MORTGAGE FUNDING TRUST 2006-AR1, MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2006-AR1 AS TO DEFENDANT ENRIQUE, MARIE DOES 1 TO 6, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:240.00)

    Read MoreRead Less