This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 09/13/2019 at 13:08:02 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. VS. ELENA SERDYUK

Case Summary

On 02/15/2018 a Contract - Debt Collection case was filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, N A against ELENA SERDYUK in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4365

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

TERI L. JACKSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

Defendant

SERDYUK, ELENA

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. AS TO DEFENDANT SERDYUK, ELENA SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-14-2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100042785) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 2.0 HOURS

Order Setting Case Management Conference

REMOVED FROM MASTER COURT CALENDAR ON AUG-05-2019. ASSIGNED TO CASE MANAGEMENT DEPARTMENT 610 ON JAN-15-2020 AT 10:30 AM FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY STAY. NOTCE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS FILED 03/05/19. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. (206)

DECLARATION OF GOLNAZ HEIDARI RE OSC

DECLARATION OF GOLNAZ HEIDARI RE OSC (TRANSACTION ID # 100040135) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

DECLARATION OF SERVICE BY MAIL

DECLARATION OF SERVICE BY MAIL (TRANSACTION ID # 100042713) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

DECLARATION OF JOSEPH M PLEASANT RE OSC

DECLARATION OF JOSEPH M PLEASANT RE OSC (TRANSACTION ID # 100037529) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

Order Setting Case Management Conference from Order to Show Cause

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR APR-03-2019 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR THE SUBMISSION OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTS. THE MAR-05-2019 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Case Management Statement

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100064968) FILED BY DEFENDANT SERDYUK, ELENA ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 4.0 HOURS

MINUTE ORDER RE:

MINUTE ORDER RE: DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER BY PUBLICATION

Answer

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100061177) FILED BY DEFENDANT SERDYUK, ELENA

NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS REGARDING BANKRUPTCY (WITH REGARD TO: ELENA SERDYUK, DEFENDANT) (TRANSACTION ID # 100042713) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR OCT-02-2018 CONTINUED TO JAN-08-2019 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order To Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR OCT-02-2018 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR JAN-08-2019 CONTINUED TO MAR-05-2019 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

APPLICATION FOR ORDER PERMITTING PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS / APPLICATION FOR ORDER PERMITTING PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS CCP 585 (TRANSACTION ID # 100038598) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

Notice of Time and Place of Trial AND Trial Order

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, COURT TRIAL SET FOR AUG-05-2019 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON APR-03-2019 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

DECLARATION ISO ORDER PERMITTING SERVICE BY PUBLICATION

DECLARATION DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ORDER PERMITTING SERVICE BY PUBLICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 100038598) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 100040136) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2019
  • Payment : FIRST PAPER RESPONSE/PLEADING $2,500 - $10,000; Amount : $225; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R9219131F018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Payment : REQUEST OR STIP W/O HEARING; Amount : $20; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B4918A24S006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Payment : COMPLAINT/PETITION/FIRST PAPER; Amount : $225; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : Y0218215F006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REMOVED FROM MASTER COURT CALENDAR ON AUG-05-2019. ASSIGNED TO CASE MANAGEMENT DEPARTMENT 610 ON JAN-15-2020 AT 10:30 AM FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY STAY. NOTCE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS FILED 03/05/19. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, COURT TRIAL SET FOR AUG-05-2019 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON APR-03-2019 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100042785) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 2.0 HOURS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF SERVICE BY MAIL (TRANSACTION ID # 100042713) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS REGARDING BANKRUPTCY (WITH REGARD TO: ELENA SERDYUK, DEFENDANT) (TRANSACTION ID # 100042713) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100064968) FILED BY DEFENDANT SERDYUK, ELENA ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 4.0 HOURS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR APR-03-2019 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR THE SUBMISSION OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTS. THE MAR-05-2019 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING (TRANSACTION ID # 100040136) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF GOLNAZ HEIDARI RE OSC (TRANSACTION ID # 100040135) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER RE: DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER BY PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF DECLARATION OF GOLNAZ HEIDARI, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF ORDER PERMITTING SERVICE BY PUBLICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 100038598) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ORDER PERMITTING SERVICE BY PUBLICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 100038598) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS / APPLICATION FOR ORDER PERMITTING PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS CCP 585 (TRANSACTION ID # 100038598) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Fee:$20.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR OCT-02-2018 CONTINUED TO JAN-08-2019 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF JOSEPH M PLEASANT RE OSC (TRANSACTION ID # 100037529) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR OCT-02-2018 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. AS TO DEFENDANT SERDYUK, ELENA SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-14-2018 (Fee:$225.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.