This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/15/2016 at 07:28:21 (UTC).

WARREN CLAYTON STEPHENS, JR INDIVIDUALLY AND AS ET AL VS. WARREN CAPITAL CORPORATION ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/08/2014 WARREN CLAYTON STEPHENS, JR INDIVIDUALLY AND AS filed a Contract - Business Governance lawsuit against WARREN CAPITAL CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3097

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business Governance

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Others

ANNE FUGELSANG STEPHENS AS TRUSTEE OF THE WARREN C STEPHENS FAMILY TRUST

WARREN CLAYTON STEPHENS, JR INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WARREN C STEPHENS

KASOLAS, MICHAEL G. (RECEIVER)

WARREN CLAYTON STEPHENS, JR INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WARREN C STEPHENS FAMILY TRUST

Defendants

WARREN CAPITAL CORPORATION

WARREN EQUIPMENT FINANCE, INC

Others

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

3033 5Th Ave. Suite 300

San Diego, CA 92103

KASOLAS, MICHAEL G. (RECEIVER)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Other Attorneys

PALMER, EDWARD SCOTT

Attorney at PALMER, LOMBARDI & DONOHUE LLP

515 South Flower St. Ste 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90071

CRYAN, MICHAEL S.

Attorney at ARENT FOX LLP

55 Second Street, 21St Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105-3470

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF RECEIVERS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO EMPLOY ATTORNEYS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF RECEIVERS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO EMPLOY ATTORNEYS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS OF MICHAEL G. KASOLAS; MICHAEL S. CRYAN; AND SCOTT H. MCNUTT IN SUPPORT THEREOF (TRANSACTION ID # 15132128) FILED BY OTHER KASOLAS, MICHAEL G. (RECEIVER)

Receivers Ex Parte Application to Employ Attorneys; Memorandum of Poin

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO EMPLOY ATTORNEYS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS OF MICHAEL G. KASOLOAS AND MICHAEL S. CRYAN IN SUPPORT THEREOF (TRANSACTION ID # 14356140) FILED BY OTHER KASOLAS, MICHAEL G. (RECEIVER) (Fee:60.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

ORDER

ORDER APPROVING AN INTERIM DISTRIBUTION

Declaration of Michael G. Kasolas in Support of Motion for an Order Ap

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL G. KASOLAS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING AN INTERIM DISTRIBUTION (TRANSACTION ID # 15110173) FILED BY OTHER KASOLAS, MICHAEL G. (RECEIVER)

Notice of Receivers Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion R

NOTICE OF RECEIVERS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION REGARDING INTERIM DISTRIBUTION (TRANSACTION ID # 15110173) FILED BY OTHER KASOLAS, MICHAEL G. (RECEIVER)

Receivers Monthly Report for the Period Ended February 29, 2016

RECEIVERS MONTHLY REPORT FOR THE PERIOD ENDED FEBRUARY 29, 2016 (TRANSACTION ID # 16087013) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KASOLAS, MICHAEL G. (RECEIVER)

Receivers Monthly Report for the Period Ended November 30, 2015

RECEIVERS MONTHLY REPORT FOR THE PERIOD ENDED NOVEMBER 30, 2015 (TRANSACTION ID # 16006060) FILED BY OTHER KASOLAS, MICHAEL G. (RECEIVER)

Declaration of Michael G. Kasolas In Support of Ex Parte Application

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL G. KASOLAS IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 15132128) FILED BY OTHER KASOLAS, MICHAEL G. (RECEIVER)

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIVERS MONTHLY REPORT FOR THE PERIOD ENDED FEBRUARY 29, 2016 (TRANSACTION ID # 16087013) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KASOLAS, MICHAEL G. (RECEIVER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE NOTICE OF RECEIVERS FEES AND EXPENSES INCURRED FOR THE PERIOD ENDED FEBRUARY 29, 2016; AND INTERIM PAYMENTS (TRANSACTION ID # 16087013) FILED BY PLAINTIFF KASOLAS, MICHAEL G. (RECEIVER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MONTHLY REPORT FOR THE PERIOD ENDED JANUARY 31, 2016 (TRANSACTION ID # 16073009) FILED BY OTHER KASOLAS, MICHAEL G. (RECEIVER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RECEIVERS FEES AND EXPENSES INCURRED FOR THE PERIOD ENDED JANUARY 31, 2016; AND INTERIM PAYMENTS (TRANSACTION ID # 16073009) FILED BY OTHER KASOLAS, MICHAEL G. (RECEIVER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAR-16-2016 CONTINUED TO DEC-14-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIVERS MONTHLY REPORT FOR THE PERIOD ENDED DECEMBER 31, 2015 (TRANSACTION ID # 16049023) FILED BY OTHER KASOLAS, MICHAEL G. (RECEIVER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RECEIVERS FEES AND EXPENSES INCURRED FOR THE PERIOD ENDED DECEMBER 31, 2015; AND INTERIM PAYMENTS (TRANSACTION ID # 16049023) FILED BY OTHER KASOLAS, MICHAEL G. (RECEIVER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 16020048) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WARREN CLAYTON STEPHENS, JR INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WARREN C STEPHENS FAMILY TRUST ANNE FUGELSANG STEPHENS AS TRUSTEE OF THE WARREN C STEPHENS FAMILY TRUST ALSO FILED BY OTHER KASOLAS, MICHAEL G. (RECEIVER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIVERS MONTHLY REPORT FOR THE PERIOD ENDED NOVEMBER 30, 2015 (TRANSACTION ID # 16006060) FILED BY OTHER KASOLAS, MICHAEL G. (RECEIVER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RECEIVERS FEES AND EXPENSES INCURRED FOR THE PERIOD ENDED NOVEMBER 30, 2015; AND INTERIM PAYMENTS (TRANSACTION ID # 16006060) FILED BY OTHER KASOLAS, MICHAEL G. (RECEIVER)

    Read MoreRead Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 12/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF NON-OPPOSITION TO RECEIVERS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO EMPLOY ATTORNEYS AND WAIVER OF NOTICE (TRANSACTION ID # 14357083) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WARREN CLAYTON STEPHENS, JR INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WARREN C STEPHENS FAMILY TRUST ANNE FUGELSANG STEPHENS AS TRUSTEE OF THE WARREN C STEPHENS FAMILY TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO EMPLOY ATTORNEYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO EMPLOY ATTORNEYS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS OF MICHAEL G. KASOLOAS AND MICHAEL S. CRYAN IN SUPPORT THEREOF (TRANSACTION ID # 14356140) FILED BY OTHER KASOLAS, MICHAEL G. (RECEIVER) (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER APPOINTING RECEIVER (MICHAEL G. KASOLAS, ESQ.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2014
  • BOND #3368745 IN THE AMOUNT OF $10,000.00 FILED BY PLAINTIFF WARREN CLAYTON STEPHENS, JR INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WARREN C STEPHENS FAMILY TRUST ANNE FUGELSANG STEPHENS AS TRUSTEE OF THE WARREN C STEPHENS FAMILY TRUST EXECUTED BY SURETY COMPANY SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2014
  • RECEIVER'S OATH AND UNDERTAKING FILED BY PLAINTIFF WARREN CLAYTON STEPHENS, JR INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WARREN C STEPHENS FAMILY TRUST ANNE FUGELSANG STEPHENS AS TRUSTEE OF THE WARREN C STEPHENS FAMILY TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2014
  • DEPOSIT OF UNDERTAKING, TRAN # W2114C09D006, TAG # 033106 DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF WARREN CLAYTON STEPHENS, JR INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WARREN C STEPHENS FAMILY TRUST ANNE FUGELSANG STEPHENS AS TRUSTEE OF THE WARREN C STEPHENS FAMILY TRUST (Fee:500.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2014
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER FILED BY PLAINTIFF WARREN CLAYTON STEPHENS, JR INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WARREN C STEPHENS FAMILY TRUST ANNE FUGELSANG STEPHENS AS TRUSTEE OF THE WARREN C STEPHENS FAMILY TRUST (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PARTNERSHIP AND CORPORATE GOVERNANCE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WARREN CLAYTON STEPHENS, JR INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WARREN C STEPHENS FAMILY TRUST ANNE FUGELSANG STEPHENS AS TRUSTEE OF THE WARREN C STEPHENS FAMILY TRUST AS TO DEFENDANT WARREN CAPITAL CORPORATION WARREN EQUIPMENT FINANCE, INC SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAY-13-2015 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON FEB-06-2015 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON APR-20-2015 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******3097
Case Title:WARREN CLAYTON STEPHENS, JR INDIVIDUALLY AND AS ET AL VS. WARREN CAPITAL CORPORATION ET AL
Court Date:APR-13-2017 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion For An Order Establishing Claims Procedure, Setting Claims Bar Date, And Approving Bar Date Notice, Distribution Plan And Claim Form With Respect To Warren Capital Corporation And Warren Equipment Finance, Inc.
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Thursday, April 13, 2017, Line 1, PLAINTIFF MICHAEL KASOLAS Motion For An Order Establishing Claims Procedure, Setting Claims Bar Date, And Approving Bar Date Notice, Distribution Plan And Claim Form With Respect To Warren Capital Corporation And Warren Equipment Finance, Inc.Hearing required. The tentative ruling is: Receiver Michael Kasolas' motion for an order establishing claims procedure, setting claims bar date, and approving bar date notice, distribution plan and claim form re Warren Capital Corporation And Warren Equipment Finance, Inc. is granted. No opposition filed and good cause shown. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. Counsel for the Receiver is required to prepare a proposed order which conforms to the relief sought in the motion and must bring it to the hearing or email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the tentative ruling is not contested. =(302/HK)


Case Number:*******3097
Case Title:WARREN CLAYTON STEPHENS, JR INDIVIDUALLY AND AS ET AL VS. WARREN CAPITAL CORPORATION ET AL
Court Date:JUN-22-2015 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion For An Order Approving An Interim Distribution
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Monday, June 22, 2015, Line 11, RECEIVER MICHAEL KASOLAS' Motion For An Order Approving An Interim Distribution.Granted pursuant to stipulation. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order with the name and address of the prevailing party's counsel or the prevailing party if pro per in the top left of the first page of proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing or email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the motion is not opposed or the tentative ruling is not contested. =(302/EHG)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant