This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 17:05:22 (UTC).

WALTER RENNER et al VS. HOWE, ROBERT, TRUSTEE OF HOWE TRUST et al

Case Summary

On 07/02/2013 WALTER RENNER filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against HOWE, ROBERT, TRUSTEE OF HOWE TRUST. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2567

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BALDINI, AL

RENNER, WALTER

BALDINI, SUE

RENNER III, WALTER F TRUSTEES OF WALTER F. RENNER III AND BARBARA J. RENNER REVOCABLE TRUST

BANDINI, AL TRUSTEE OF BALDINI TRUST

RENNER, BARBARA J TRUSTEES OF WALTER F. RENNER III AND BARBARA J. RENNER REVOCABLE TRUST

Defendants

HOWE, ROBERT, TRUSTEE OF HOWE TRUST

ROBERT HOWE AND MARGERY J. HOWE, TRUSTEES OF HOWE TRUST

FAVRESSE, STEPHANIE M

DOES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE, AND ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING AN INTEREST IN THE

HOWE, MARGERY H., TRUSTEE OF THE HOWE TRUST

HOWE, MARGERY J., TRUSTEE OF HOWE TRUST

HOWE, ROBERT, TRUSTEE OF THE HOWE TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KEITH BRENDA CRUZ

KEITH, BRENDA CRUZ

1965 Market St 2Nd Fl

San Francisco, CA 94103

KOZUBAL, JOANNA

375 Potrero Avenue #5

San Francisco, CA 94103

Defendant Attorney

MACDONALD, STEVEN ADAIR

Attorney at STEVEN ADAIR MAC DONALD & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

870 Market Street, Suite 500

San Francisco, CA 94102

 

Court Documents

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

ANSWER

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PARTITION; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT HOWE, ROBERT, TRUSTEE OF THE HOWE TRUST HOWE, MARGERY H., TRUSTEE OF THE HOWE TRUST (Fee:900.00)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT FAVRESSE, STEPHANIE M (Fee:450.00)

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JAN-12-2015 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT. 206.

ORDER

ORDER AND STIPULATION FOR MOTION TO BE HEARD BY A MEMBER OF THE CALIFORNIA BAR SERVING AS A TEMPORARY JUDGE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING IN PART DEFTS' MOTION TO COMPEL AND SANCTIONS FILED BY DEFENDANT HOWE, ROBERT, TRUSTEE OF HOWE TRUST HOWE, MARGERY J., TRUSTEE OF HOWE TRUST

Order Setting Mandatory Settlement Conference

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR DEC-11-2014 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPT. 210 WITH CONFERENCE OFFICER MICHAEL MARX.

Notice of Entry of Order to Continue Trial Pursuant to Stipulation

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 56686605) TO CONTINUE TRIAL PURSUANT TO STIPULATION FILED BY DEFENDANT FAVRESSE, STEPHANIE M HOWE, MARGERY J., TRUSTEE OF HOWE TRUST HOWE, ROBERT, TRUSTEE OF THE HOWE TRUST

Request for Dismissal

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 15337025)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF RENNER, WALTER BALDINI, AL SERVED JUL-18-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT HOWE, ROBERT, TRUSTEE OF HOWE TRUST

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT/SUMMONS), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF RENNER III, WALTER F TRUSTEES OF WALTER F. RENNER III AND BARBARA J. RENNER REVOCABLE TRUST DATED AUGUST 19, 2012 BANDINI, AL TRUSTEE OF BALDINI TRUST BALDINI, SUE SERVED DEC-02-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT HOWE, ROBERT, TRUSTEE OF HOWE TRUST

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

OBJECTION TO NOTICE AND PLACE OF TRIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT HOWE, ROBERT, TRUSTEE OF THE HOWE TRUST

Notice of Motion

MOTION TO CONTINUE JURY TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 15103150) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RENNER, WALTER HEARING SET FOR MAY-07-2015 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 206 (Fee:60.00)

Motion

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES (TRANSACTION ID # 15103150) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RENNER, WALTER

Substitution of Attorney

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 15110038): KOZUBAL, JOANNA SUBSTITUTED FOR KEITH, BRENDA CRUZ AS ATTORNEY FOR BANDINI, AL TRUSTEE OF BALDINI TRUST

Substitution of Attorney

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, (TRANSACTION ID # 15110038): KOZUBAL, JOANNA SUBSTITUTED FOR KEITH, BRENDA CRUZ AS ATTORNEY FOR BALDINI, SUE

Stipulation Regarding Voluntary Judicial Mediation Program

STIPULATION REGARDING VOLUNTARY JUDICIAL MEDIATION PROGRAM; (TRANSACTION ID # 57355800) FILED BY DEFENDANT FAVRESSE, STEPHANIE M HOWE, MARGERY H., TRUSTEE OF THE HOWE TRUST

Continued Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF DEC-08-2015 CONTINUED TO JAN-12-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JAN-12-2016 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF DEC-08-2015 CONTINUED TO JAN-12-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 15337025)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF SEP-08-2015 CONTINUED TO DEC-08-2015 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 15188076) FILED BY PLAINTIFF RENNER, WALTER BANDINI, AL TRUSTEE OF BALDINI TRUST BALDINI, SUE RENNER, BARBARA J TRUSTEES OF WALTER F. RENNER III AND BARBARA J. RENNER REVOCABLE TRUST DATED AUGUST 19, 2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REMOVED FROM JUDICIAL MEDIATION CALENDAR SET FOR JUN-30-2015 - CASE SETTLED. ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON SEP-08-2015 AT 10:30 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR OCT-19-2015 - CASE SETTLED AT THE JUN-30-2015 JUDICIAL MEDIATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • MINI-MINUTES FOR JUN-30-2015 2:00 PM FOR DEPT 613

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL MEDIATION BEFORE JUDGE HAROLD E KAHN. JUDICIAL MEDIATION SET FOR JUN-30-2015 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPT. 613. NOTICE SENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE; (TRANSACTION ID # 57355800) FILED BY DEFENDANT FAVRESSE, STEPHANIE M HOWE, MARGERY H., TRUSTEE OF THE HOWE TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
69 More Docket Entries
  • 12/31/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR FEB-25-2014 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S) OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST DEFENDANT(S) STEPHANIE M FAVRESSE AS TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. THE JAN-15-2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PARTITION; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT HOWE, ROBERT, TRUSTEE OF THE HOWE TRUST HOWE, MARGERY H., TRUSTEE OF THE HOWE TRUST (Fee:900.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT/SUMMONS), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF RENNER III, WALTER F TRUSTEES OF WALTER F. RENNER III AND BARBARA J. RENNER REVOCABLE TRUST DATED AUGUST 19, 2012 BANDINI, AL TRUSTEE OF BALDINI TRUST BALDINI, SUE SERVED DEC-02-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT HOWE, MARGERY J., TRUSTEE OF HOWE TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT/SUMMONS), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF RENNER III, WALTER F TRUSTEES OF WALTER F. RENNER III AND BARBARA J. RENNER REVOCABLE TRUST DATED AUGUST 19, 2012 BANDINI, AL TRUSTEE OF BALDINI TRUST BALDINI, SUE SERVED DEC-02-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT HOWE, ROBERT, TRUSTEE OF HOWE TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF DEC-04-2013 CONTINUED TO JAN-15-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO PLAINTIFF RENNER III, WALTER F TRUSTEES OF WALTER F. RENNER III AND BARBARA J. RENNER REVOCABLE TRUST DATED AUGUST 19, 2012 BANDINI, AL TRUSTEE OF BALDINI TRUST BALDINI, SUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF RENNER III, WALTER F TRUSTEES OF WALTER F. RENNER III AND BARBARA J. RENNER REVOCABLE TRUST DATED AUGUST 19, 2012 BANDINI, AL TRUSTEE OF BALDINI TRUST BALDINI, SUE AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE, AND ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING AN INTEREST IN THE REAL PROPERTY ROBERT HOWE AND MARGERY J. HOWE, TRUSTEES OF HOWE TRUST FAVRESSE, STEPHANIE M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF RENNER, WALTER BALDINI, AL SERVED JUL-18-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT HOWE, ROBERT, TRUSTEE OF HOWE TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • QUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF RENNER, WALTER BALDINI, AL AS TO DEFENDANT HOWE, ROBERT, TRUSTEE OF HOWE TRUST DOES 1 TO 50, INCLUSIVE, AND ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING AN INTEREST IN THE REAL PROPERTY SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DEC-04-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON SEP-03-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON NOV-19-2013 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less