Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 22:18:32 (UTC).

WALTER COOK et al VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P) AS REFELECTED ON et al

Case Summary

On 08/15/2007 WALTER COOK filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B/P AS REFELECTED ON. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4347

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COOK, WALTER

Defendants

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

THE BOEING COMPANY

SCANDURA, INC.

COLTEC INDUSTRIES INC

THORPE INSULATION COMPANY

KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC.

PARKER-HANNIFIN CORP.

CHEVERON U.S.A., INC.

FOSTER WHEELER LLC (FROM THE THIRD CAUSE OF ACTION FALSE REPRESENTATION AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES)

HAMILTON SUNSTRAND CORPORATION

SIKORSKY AIRCRAFT CORP.

UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION

CURTISS-WRIGHT CORPORATION

VIACOM CORPORATION SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, FORMERLY KNOWN AS WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

CHRYSLER LLC

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

WESTERN FIBROUS GLASS PRODUCTS COMPANY (WESTGLAS)

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.

QUINTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.

19 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON & PURCELL LLP

222 Rush Landing Road, P.O.Box 6169

Novoto, CA 94948-6169

Defendant Attorneys

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

MCINTIRE, RONALD A.

Attorney at PERKINS COIE LLP

1620 26Th Street, South Tower, Sixth Floor

Santa Monica, CA 90404

TRAPANI, THOMAS ANTHONY

Attorney at ADAMS, NYE, SINUNU, BRUNI, BECHT LLP

222 Kearny Street, Seventh Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

GIFFORD, DAVID ALLAN

Attorney at STEVENS DRUMMOND & GIFFORD

1910 Olympic Blvd #250

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

ISLER, CURTISS L.

Attorney at TUCKER ELLIS & WEST LLP

515 South Flower Street, 42Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2223

VACCHINA, LEONARDO J

Attorney at BERRY & BERRY

2930 Lakeshore Ave.

Oakland, CA 94610

AUBERT, GARTH W.

Attorney at MENDES & MOUNT LLP

445 South Figueroa St. 38Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90071

SHELDON, CHARLES T

Attorney at SEDGWICK,DETERT,MORAN & ARNOLD LLP

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

BIDERMAN, DAVID T.

Attorney at PERKINS COIE LLP

Four Embarcadero, Suite 2400

San Francisco, CA 94111

MCCALL, MICHAEL T

Attorney at WALSWORTH, FRANKLIN, BEVINS & MCCALL, LLP

601 Montgomery Street, 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Other Attorneys

KUENSTER, JENNIFER A.

Attorney at THELEN REID BROWN RAYSMAN & STEINER LLP

101 Second Street, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94105

GLASPY, DAVID MICHAEL

Attorney at GLASPY & GLASPY

One Walnut Creek Center, 100 Pringle Ave, Suite 750

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

POND, FRANK D

Pond North Llp, 350 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2850

Los Angeles, CA 90071

ANGER, LAURIE KIRKPATRIC

Attorney at SCHIFF HARDIN LLP

One Market, Spear St Tower, 32Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

One Sansome St., Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

RIEHLE, PAUL JEFFREY

Attorney at SEDGWICK, DETERT, MORAN & ARNOLD

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower, 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

PRZETAK, LAURA

Attorney at BERRY & BERRYA PROFESSIONAL LAW CORP.

2930 Lakeshore Avenue

Oakland, CA 94610

 

Court Documents

ANSWER OF FOSTER WHEELER LLC TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM ??? ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16623049) FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC (Fee:335.00)

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice as to Complaint- As to Defendant Parker Hannifin Corporation only

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 19139982) AS TO DEFENDANT PARKER-HANNIFIN CORP.

DECLARATION OF MICHELLE M. CLOWSER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC???S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER WRITTEN DISCOVERY AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

DECLARATION OF MICHELLE M. CLOWSER IN SUPPORT OF MO TO COMPEL FURTHER WRITTEN DISCOVERY AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 19150026) FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC

EXHIBIT D (4 of 6) TO THE DECLARATION OF KIMBERLY M. PILE IN SUPPORT OF PLANT INSULATION COMPANYS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

EXHIBIT D (4 OF 6) TO THE DECL OF KIMBERLY M. PILE IN SUPPORT OF MO FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 19259940) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY

EXHIBIT G TO THE DECLARATION OF KIMBERLY M. PILE IN SUPPORT OF PLANT INSULATION COMPANYS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

EXHIBIT G TO THE DECL OF KIMBERLY M. PILE IN SUPPORT OF MO FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 19259940) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY

DECLARATION OF KIMBERLY M. PILE IN SUPPORT OF PLANT INSULATION COMPANYS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO PLANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUICATION

DECLARATION OF DECLARATION OF KIMBERLY M. PILE IN SUPPORT OF PLANT INSULATION COMPANYS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO PLANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 19443378) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY

EXHIBIT B DECLARATION OF KIMBERLY M. PILE IN SUPPORT OF PLANT INSULATION COMPANYS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO PLANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUICATION

EXHIBIT B DECLARATION OF KIMBERLY M. PILE IN SUPPORT OF PLANT INSULATION COMPANYS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO PLANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 19443378) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 19443378) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY

ORDER

ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION CO.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

COMPLAINT

ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF COOK, WALTER COOK, QUILLIA AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P) AS REFELECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-21-2008 (Fee:335.00)

Answer of Defendant to Plaintiffs Unverified Complaint for Personal Injury

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16369566) FILED BY DEFENDANT OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC (Fee:335.00)

DECLARATION OF ANNE T. ACU?A IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER, LLC?S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS AND PLAINTIFFS? REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

DECLARATION OF ANNE T. ACUA IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER, LLC'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS AND PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS (TRANSACTION ID # 19303213) FILED BY PLAINTIFF COOK, WALTER COOK, QUILLIA

EXHIBIT C TO DECLARATION OF KIMBERLY M. PILE IN SUPPORT OF PLANT INSULATION COMPANYS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO PLANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUICATION

EXHIBIT C TO DECLARATION OF KIMBERLY M. PILE IN SUPPORT OF PLANT INSULATION COMPANYS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO PLANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 19443378) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY

MIL#12 To Exclude Treatises, Books, And Articles As Hearsay

MOTION IN LIMINE (TRANSACTION ID # 19595486) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY

Motion in Limine #18

MOTION IN LIMINE (TRANSACTION ID # 19641594) FILED BY DEFENDANT CURTISS-WRIGHT CORPORATION

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANYS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 19839129) FILED BY PLAINTIFF COOK, WALTER COOK, QUILLIA

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 21155351) FILED BY DEFENDANT CURTISS-WRIGHT CORPORATION

Request for Dismissal

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 21964602) AS TO DEFENDANT VIACOM CORPORATION SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, FORMERLY KNOWN AS WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

210 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 26468674)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 21964602) AS TO DEFENDANT VIACOM CORPORATION SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, FORMERLY KNOWN AS WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 21793615) AS TO DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2008
  • JURY FEES OF 150.00 FOR TRANSACTION W2108408J021 TRANSFERRED INTO JPLUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 21342751) AS TO DEFENDANT GOODRICH CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 21319461) AS TO DEFENDANT QUINTEC INDUSTRIES, INC. WESTERN FIBROUS GLASS PRODUCTS COMPANY (WESTGLAS) WESTERN FIBERGLAS SUPPLY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 21201137) FILED BY DEFENDANT UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 21155351) FILED BY DEFENDANT CURTISS-WRIGHT CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 21121809) AS TO DEFENDANT CURTISS-WRIGHT CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 20685556) AS TO DEFENDANT UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION PRATT & WHITNEY SIKORSKY AIRCRAFT CORP. HAMILTON SUNSTRAND CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
241 More Docket Entries
  • 09/18/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (TRANSACTION ID # 16342170) FILED BY DEFENDANT CURTISS-WRIGHT CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE (TRANSACTION ID # 16342170) FILED BY DEFENDANT CURTISS-WRIGHT CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION TO MOTION FOR A CHANGE OF VENUE (TRANSACTION ID # 16342170) FILED BY DEFENDANT CURTISS-WRIGHT CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR CHANGE FOR A CHANGE OF VENUE, PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 16342170) FILED BY DEFENDANT CURTISS-WRIGHT CORPORATION HEARING SET FOR OCT-05-2007 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 (Fee:375.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16307916) FILED BY DEFENDANT CHRYSLER LLC FORMERLY KNOWN AS DAIMLERCHRYSLER COMPANY, LLC (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16236499) FILED BY DEFENDANT UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16153094) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE BOEING COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF COOK, WALTER COOK, QUILLIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF COOK, WALTER COOK, QUILLIA AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P) AS REFELECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-21-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HAMILTON SUNSTRAND CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where SCANDURA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SIKORSKY AIRCRAFT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Curtiss Wright Corp is a litigant