Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 09/10/2019 at 16:55:11 (UTC).

WAI KIU JANICE NAM VS. FLEXPORT, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/22/2018 WAI KIU JANICE NAM filed an Other lawsuit against FLEXPORT, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TERI L. JACKSON, CURTIS KARNOW and ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5169

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

TERI L. JACKSON

CURTIS KARNOW

ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NAM, WAI KIU JANICE ON BEHALF OF HERSELF, ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED, AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC

Defendants

FLEXPORT, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

DOES 1 TO 100, INCLUSIVE

SCHAFER, JUSTIN AN INDIVIDUAL

SCHAFER, JUSTIN

FLEXPORT, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOFFMAN, MICHAEL R

Attorney at HOFFMAN EMPLOYMENT LAWYERS

1999 Harrison Street 18Th Fl

Oakland, CA 94612

Defendant Attorney

HEINICKE, MALCOLM A

Attorney at MUNGER, TOLLES & OLSON LLP

560 Mission Street, Twenty Seventh Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FOR JUN-10-2019 3:30 PM

MINUTES FOR JUN-10-2019 3:30 PM

Order Denying Complex Designation For Failure to File Application Requ

ORDER DENYING COMPLEX DESIGNATION FOR FAILURE TO FILE APPLICATION REQUESTING DESIGNATION. (MO)

Proof of Service of Summons

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100034823), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF NAM, WAI KIU JANICE ON BEHALF OF HERSELF, ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED, AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC SERVED MAR-28-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT FLEXPORT, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

COMPLAINT

OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF NAM, WAI KIU JANICE ON BEHALF OF HERSELF, ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED, AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC AS TO DEFENDANT FLEXPORT, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION SCHAFER, JUSTIN AN INDIVIDUAL DOES 1 TO 100, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-22-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAY-21-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUL-30-2018 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANTS STATEMENT OF NONOPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMI

STATEMENT OF NONOPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 63632435) FILED BY DEFENDANT FLEXPORT, INC.

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 63565910) FILED BY PLAINTIFF NAM, WAI KIU JANICE ON BEHALF OF HERSELF, ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED, AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC

DECLARATION OF LEONARD EMMA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION

DECLARATION OF LEONARD EMMA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 63565910) FILED BY PLAINTIFF NAM, WAI KIU JANICE ON BEHALF OF HERSELF, ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED, AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC

NOTICE OF MOTION AND PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPRO

NOTICE OF MOTION AND PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 63565910) FILED BY PLAINTIFF NAM, WAI KIU JANICE ON BEHALF OF HERSELF, ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED, AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC HEARING SET FOR AUG-12-2019 AT 03:00 PM IN DEPT 304

ORDER

ORDER CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO.2 (TRANSACTION #63065042)

ORDER

ORDER - JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REQUESTING CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (TRANSACTION ID # 62977937)

PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REQUESTING CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (TRANSACTION ID # 62966141) FILED BY DEFENDANT FLEXPORT, INC.

ORDER

ORDER DENYING JOINT REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF INDIVIDUAL CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT JUSTIN SCHAFER (TRANSACTION #62901542)

JOINT REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF INDIVIDUAL CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT JUS

JOINT REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF INDIVIDUAL CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT JUSTIN SCHAFER ALSO FILED BY PLAINTIFF WAI KIU JANICE NAM (TRANSACTION ID # 62833355) FILED BY DEFENDANT FLEXPORT, INC. SCHAFER, JUSTIN

ORDER

ORDER GENERAL ORDER RE CASE REASSIGNMENT

Joint Case Management Statement in Advance of Initial Case Management

JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT IN ADVANCE OF INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (TRANSACTION ID # 62362174) FILED BY PLAINTIFF NAM, WAI KIU JANICE ON BEHALF OF HERSELF, ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED, AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC

Proof of Service for Plaintiffs Application for Complex Designation

PROOF OF SERVICE FOR PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR COMPLEX DESIGNATION (TRANSACTION ID # 100039745) FILED BY PLAINTIFF NAM, WAI KIU JANICE ON BEHALF OF HERSELF, ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED, AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC

DEFENDANT JUSTIN SCHAFERS ANSWER AND GENERAL DENIAL TO UNVERIFIED CLAS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 62112153) FILED BY DEFENDANT SCHAFER, JUSTIN

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2019
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B5219724M016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Payment : REQUEST OR STIP W/O HEARING; Amount : $20; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W6619702S003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Payment : REQUEST OR STIP W/O HEARING; Amount : $20; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B5219314S003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • Payment : REQ OR STIP AND ORDER W/O HEARING; Amount : $20; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W1519215C004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Payment : REQUEST OR STIP W/O HEARING; Amount : $20; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W2019214S006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Payment : REQ OR STIP AND ORDER W/O HEARING; Amount : $20; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W1519211C005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Payment : COMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION FEE; Amount : $2000; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : X4519114C001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W2118619M006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : R4918612F006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W1518516F016

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OPPOSING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR COMPLEX DESIGNATION (TRANSACTION ID # 62163487) FILED BY DEFENDANT FLEXPORT, INC. SCHAFER, JUSTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FOR PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR COMPLEX DESIGNATION (TRANSACTION ID # 100039745) FILED BY PLAINTIFF NAM, WAI KIU JANICE ON BEHALF OF HERSELF, ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED, AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF COMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION (TRANSACTION ID # 100039745) FILED BY PLAINTIFF NAM, WAI KIU JANICE ON BEHALF OF HERSELF, ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED, AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC (Fee:$60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF DEFENDANT JUSTIN SCHAFER'S ANSWER AND GENRAL DENIAL TO UNVERIFIED CLASS ACTION AND INDIVIDUAL COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 62112153) FILED BY DEFENDANT SCHAFER, JUSTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 62112153) FILED BY DEFENDANT SCHAFER, JUSTIN (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 62027725) (TRANSACTION ID # 62027725) FILED BY DEFENDANT FLEXPORT, INC. (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DENYING COMPLEX DESIGNATION FOR FAILURE TO FILE APPLICATION REQUESTING DESIGNATION. (MO)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100034823), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF NAM, WAI KIU JANICE ON BEHALF OF HERSELF, ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED, AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC SERVED MAR-28-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT FLEXPORT, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF NAM, WAI KIU JANICE ON BEHALF OF HERSELF, ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED, AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC AS TO DEFENDANT FLEXPORT, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION SCHAFER, JUSTIN AN INDIVIDUAL DOES 1 TO 100, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR AUG-22-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAY-21-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUL-30-2018 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:$1450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HEINICKE MALCOLM ALEXANDER