This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 20:41:21 (UTC).

VINCENT STUMPO VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al*****TRANSFERRED TO ORANGE COUNTY*****

Case Summary

On 04/05/2007 VINCENT STUMPO filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS B/P AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS TRANSFERRED TO ORANGE COUNTY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4151

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STUMPO, VINCENT

Defendants

RAYTHEON AIRCRAFT COMPANY

GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC, F/K/A GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORP.

FRONTIER BUILDING SUPPLY, INC.

AMCORD, INC.

HANSON PERMANENTE CEMENT, INC.

WESTSIDE BUILDING MATERIAL CORP.

DOES 1-8500

CANOGA BUILDERS SUPPLIES

ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I

JOHN K. BICE COMPANY, INC.

HIGHLAND STUCCO & LIME PRODUCTS, INC.

CALIFORNIA PORTLAND CEMENT COMPANY

PLANT INSULATION COMPANY

CURTISS-WRIGHT CORP.

MISSION STUCCO COMPANY

OMEGA PRODUCTS CORPORATION

ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS

PARKER-HANNIFIN CORP.

THOMPSON BUILDING MATERIALS, INC.

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON AND PURCELL LLPATTORNEYS AT LAW, PO BOX 6169

222 Rush Landing Road

Novato, CA 94948

Defendant Attorneys

OGDIE, SUSAN A.

Attorney at FILICE BROWN EASSA & MCLEOD LLP

1999 Harrison St, 18Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94612

BIDERMAN, DAVID T.

Attorney at PERKINS COIE LLP

Four Embarcadero, Suite 2400

San Francisco, CA 94111

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

Attorney at PRINDLE, DECKER & AMARO LLP

369 Pine Street, Ste 800

San Francisco, CA 94104

ADAMS, BARBARA ROSE

Attorney at ADAMS NYE SINUNU BRUNI BECHT LLP

222 Kearny St., 7Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

HUIE, JEREMY D.

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM LLP

351 California St. Ste 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

BLOMQUIST, SONJA ELIZABETH

Attorney at LOW, BALL & LYNCH

505 Montgomery St. 7Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

BUTY, MADELINE L

Attorney at BUTY & CURLIANO LLP

383 4Th Street, 3Rd Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

KANNETT, MARK SIMON

Attorney at BECHERER, KANNETT & SCHWEITZER

2200 Powell St., Suite 805

Emeryville, CA 94608

BLACKARD, EUGENE CHARLES

Attorney at ARCHER NORRIS

2033 North Main St., Suite 800, P.O. Box 8035

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

BERKES, ROBERT H

Attorney at BERKES CRANE ROBINSON & SEAL

515 S Figueroa St Ste 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90071

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at ESKANOS & ADLER

2325 Clayton Road

Concord, CA 94520

AUBERT, GARTH W.

Attorney at MENDES & MOUNT LLP

445 South Figueroa St. 38Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90071

LOVE, MARK A

Attorney at SELMAN BREITMAN LLP

33 New Montgomery, Sixth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Other Attorneys

TRAPANI, THOMAS ANTHONY

Attorney at ADAMS, NYE, SINUNU, BRUNI, BECHT LLP

222 Kearny Street, Seventh Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

BRYDON, JOHN R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

JEDEIKIN, JOSEPH

Attorney at HOAGLAND LONGO MORAN DUNST & DOUKAS LLP

333 Pine Street, Fifth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

MCCALL, MICHAEL T

Attorney at WALSWORTH, FRANKLIN, BEVINS & MCCALL, LLP

601 Montgomery Street, 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

Defendant AMCORD, INC.s Summary Answer To Complaint

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15373823) FILED BY DEFENDANT AMCORD, INC. (Fee:335.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE by electronic transmission of ntc of mo for change of

PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC TRANSMISSION OF NTC OF MO FOR CHANGE OF VENUE; MEMO OF P&A DECL OF CARMEN SANTANA; EXHIBITS; AND [PROPOSED] ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 15146008) FILED BY DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA PORTLAND CEMENT COMPANY

OBJECTION TO HEARING BEFORE A DISCOVERY COMMISSIONER AS A TEMPORARY JU

OBJECTION TO HEARING BEFORE A DISCOVERY COMMISSIONER AS A TEMPORARY JUDGE (TRANSACTION ID # 15237888) FILED BY DEFENDANT WESTSIDE BUILDING MATERIAL CORP.

Notice of Joinder and Joinder in California Portland Cement Companys M

NOTICE OF JOINDER AND JOINDER IN CALIFORNIA PORTLAND CEMENT COMPANYS MOTION FOR A CHANGE OF VENUE PURSUANT TO CCP ???? 396B. 397(A) (TRANSACTION ID # 15281435) FILED BY DEFENDANT CANOGA BUILDERS SUPPLIES HEARING SET FOR JUL-10-2007 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 (Fee:40.00)

Declaration of Madeline L. Buty in Support of Joinder in California Po

DECLARATION OF MADELINE L. BUTY IN SUPPORT OF JOINDER IN CALIFORNIA PORTLAND CEMENT COMPANYS MOTION FOR A CHANGE OF VENUE PURSUANT TO CCP ???? 396B. 397(A) (TRANSACTION ID # 15281435) FILED BY DEFENDANT CANOGA BUILDERS SUPPLIES

COMPLAINT

ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF STUMPO, VINCENT AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-17-2008 (Fee:335.00)

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT HAMILTON MATERIALS, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT F

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15379902) FILED BY DEFENDANT HAMILTON MATERIALS, INC. (Fee:335.00)

DEFENDANT FRONTIER BUILDING SUPPLY, INC.???S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF VINCE

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15180179) FILED BY DEFENDANT FRONTIER BUILDING SUPPLY, INC. (Fee:335.00)

answer to complaint

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15806423) FILED BY DEFENDANT SUPRO CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2008
  • DocketREMOVED FROM ASBESTOS STATUS CONFERENCE CALENDAR ON APR-17-2008. OFF CALENDAR. JUDGE: A. JAMES ROBERTSON, II; CLERK: D. LOK; REPORTER: SUSAN LEE, CSR #4280 (206)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2007
  • DocketTRANSFER RECEIPT RECEIVED FROM ORANGE COUNTY WITH NEW CASE NO. 07CC01409

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2007
  • DocketTRANSFER ORDER; FEES PAID, TRANSFERRED TO ORANGE COUNTY FILED BY PLAINTIFF STUMPO, VINCENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 16405168) FILED BY DEFENDANT JOHN K. BICE COMPANY, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16373414) AS TO DEFENDANT JOHN K. BICE COMPANY, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 16275234) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16216132) AS TO DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2007
  • DocketCHANGE OF VENUE TO ANOTHER COURT AND TRANSMITTAL OF PAPERS FILED BY PLAINTIFF STUMPO, VINCENT (Fee:50.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16011910) FILED BY DEFENDANT PLANT INSULATION COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO TRANSFER CASE - STIPULATION AND ORDER OF PLAINTIFF TO TRANSFER CASE FROM SAN FRANCISCO SUPERIOR COURT TO SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF ORANGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE PURSUANT TO CCP 396B, 397(A) (TRANSACTION ID # 15146008) FILED BY DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA PORTLAND CEMENT COMPANY HEARING SET FOR JUL-10-2007 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 301 (Fee:375.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15125078) FILED BY DEFENDANT CURTISS-WRIGHT CORP. (Fee:335.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15086616) FILED BY DEFENDANT MERLEX STUCCO, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15085042) FILED BY DEFENDANT WESTWOOD BUILDING MATERIALS CO. (Fee:335.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC TRANSMISSION (TRANSACTION ID # 15024512) FILED BY DEFENDANT JOHN K. BICE COMPANY, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15024477) FILED BY DEFENDANT JOHN K. BICE COMPANY, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15017039) FILED BY DEFENDANT RAYTHEON AIRCRAFT COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2007
  • DocketPRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF STUMPO, VINCENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF STUMPO, VINCENT AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (B/P)AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B, B-1, C, H, I DOES 1-8500 ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-17-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RAYTHEON AIRCRAFT COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where OMEGA PRODUCTS CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where Curtiss Wright Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where CANOGA BUILDER SUPPLIES is a litigant