This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 11/22/2020 at 01:38:43 (UTC).

VINCENT CELAYA VS. MCCLONE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 VINCENT CELAYA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MCCLONE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SAMUEL K. FENG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7925

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

SAMUEL K. FENG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CELAYA, VINCENT

Defendants

DEVCON CONSTRUCTION, INC.

MCCLONE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

DOES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHULTZ, BRAD A.

Attorney at DEMAS LAW GROUP

701 Howe Avenue, Suite A-1

Sacramento, CA 95825

 

Court Documents

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2021
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2020
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : H2520B21F025

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF CELAYA, VINCENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketPERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - NON-VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CELAYA, VINCENT AS TO DEFENDANT MCCLONE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY DEVCON CONSTRUCTION, INC. DOES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-14-2021 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JAN-08-2021 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAR-22-2021 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Devcon Construction, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Schultz, Brad A