This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/15/2019 at 21:22:57 (UTC).

VILLA DEI FIORI OWNERS' ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA VS. VILLA DEI FIORI CONDOMINIUMS L.P., A CALIFORNIA et al

Case Summary

On 04/01/2010 VILLA DEI FIORI OWNERS' ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against VILLA DEI FIORI CONDOMINIUMS L P , A CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KATHERINE FEINSTEIN, CYNTHIA M. LEE, TOMAR MASON, LORETTA GIORGI, ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH, CHARLOTTE W. WOOLARD, ARLENE T. BORICK, WALLACE P. DOUGLASS and HAROLD E. KAHN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8280

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2010

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

KATHERINE FEINSTEIN

CYNTHIA M. LEE

TOMAR MASON

LORETTA GIORGI

ERNEST H. GOLDSMITH

CHARLOTTE W. WOOLARD

ARLENE T. BORICK

WALLACE P. DOUGLASS

HAROLD E. KAHN

 

Party Details

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

STARLINE WINDOWS, INC.

SAN FRANCISCO FLOWER GROWERS' ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

THE SMITH COMPANY, INC.

NIBBI BROS CONSTRUCTION, A BUSINESS ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM

NIBBI BROTHERS

NIBBI BROTHERS, INC., A BUSINESS ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM

EDWARD W. SCOTT ELECTRIC, CO., INC.

DOES 1 THRU 200, INCL.

Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

STARLINE WINDOWS, INC., A WASHINGTON CORPORATION

SAN FRANCISCO FLOWER GROWERS' ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

KZ TILE COMPANY

NIBBI BROTHERS

EGAN PLUMBING, INC.

VALUE FIRE PROTECTION INC

JOHN KIM DBA MAGIC PAINTING

THE SMITH COMPANY, INC.

ZOES 1 THROUGH 500, INCLUSIVE

DUBLIN STEEL, INC.

ALUMINUM WEST

STARLINE WINDOWS, A DIVISION OF MARZEN ARTISTIC ALUMINUM LTD

EDWARD W. SCOTT ELECTRIC, CO., INC.

H & H PLASTERING, INC.

MOES 1 TO 100

Intervenor

LINCOLN GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

34 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

YEN, THOMAS

Attorney at NARAYAN & HUDSON

101 2Nd Street, Ste 160

San Francisco, CA 94105

ESTEP, MICHAEL JOSEPH

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF PEGAN & WAGNER

2633 Camino Ramon Ste 210

San Ramon, CA 94583

COTTER, PAUL R.

Attorney at DIEPENBROCK & COTTER, LLP

1545 River Park Dr., Ste 201

Sacramento, CA 95815

HELMER, PAMELA JANE

Attorney at ROGER SCOTT & HELMER

1001 Marshall Street #400

Redwood City, CA 94063-2000

NAKAGAWA, EDSIN S

Attorney at JOSEPH COSTELLA & ASSOCIATES

215 Lennon Lane, Suite 200

Walnut Creek, CA 94598

ANDERSON, JACK

Attorney at JACK ANDERSON, ESQ., APLC

7710 Balboa Ave. Ste. 228E

San Diego, CA 92111

BYBEE, ROBERT BRUCE

2010 Crow Canyon Place, #330

San Ramon, CA 94583-1344

PHAN-QUANG, TRUMAN

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF SANTANA & HART

71 Stevenson St Ste. 700

San Francisco, CA 94105

BARGER, GLENN T.

Attorney at CHAPMAN, GLUCKSMAN & DEAN

11900 W. Olympic Blvd, Ste 800

Los Angeles, CA 90064-0704

KELLY, RICHARD M

Attorney at KELLY LITIGATION GROUP, INC.

3 Lagoon Drive, Ste. 225

Redwood City, CA 94065

Intervenor Attorney

BLAKE, JAMES FREEMAN

Attorney at BURNHAM BROWN

P.O. Box 119 (Zip Code 94604), 1901 Harrison Street, 11Th Flr

Oakland, CA 94612

Other Attorneys

RIDDLE, JOHN EDWARD

Attorney at LAMORE BRAZIER RIDDLE & GIAMPAOLI

1570 The Alameda, # 150

San Jose, CA 95126-2305

MARTHA, RICHARD H.

Attorney at HORTON, OBERRECHT, KIRKPATRICK & MARTHA

980 Ninth Steet 16Th Floor

Sacramento, CA 95814

HALVERSON, JOEL L.

Attorney at SEVERSON & WERSON

One Embarcadero Center, Suite 2600

San Francisco, CA 94111-0000

TAYLOR, PATRICK ELSWORTH

Attorney at BRADY, VORWERCK, RYDER & CASPINO

1855 Gateway Blvd, Ste 650

Concord, CA 94520

HUGHES, MICHAEL JEFFREY

Attorney at HUGHES GILL COCHRANE, P.C.

1600 South Main Street, Suite 215

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

DAVIS, BRIAN R

Attorney at BOGAARDS DAVIS LLP

601 Montgomery Street,, Ste 1210

San Francisco, CA 94111

VIRJI, ARIF

Attorney at LYNCH, GILARDI & GRUMMER

170 Columbus Avenue 5Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94133

ELLIS, MICHAEL S.

Attorney at THE ELLIS LAW GROUP, APC

P.O. Box 150570

San Rafael, CA 94915

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

CONSTRUCTION, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF VILLA DEI FIORI OWNERS' ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF AND TO THE EXTENT ALLEGED THEREIN, ON BEHALF OF ITS MEMBERS AS TO DEFENDANT VILLA DEI FIORI CONDOMINIUMS L.P., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP INNOVATIVE REALTY SERVICES, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY INNOVATIVE INVESTMENT REALTY FUND LP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP NIBBI BROS. INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1 THRU 200, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR SEP-03-2010 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUN-01-2010 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON AUG-19-2010 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:920.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF VILLA DEI FIORI OWNERS' ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF AND TO THE EXTENT ALLEGED THEREIN, ON BEHALF OF ITS MEMBERS SERVED APR-08-2010, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON CORPORATION ON DEFENDANT VILLA DEI FIORI CONDOMINIUMS L.P., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF VILLA DEI FIORI OWNERS' ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF AND TO THE EXTENT ALLEGED THEREIN, ON BEHALF OF ITS MEMBERS SERVED APR-05-2010, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE APR-09-2010 ON DEFENDANT NIBBI BROS. INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF VILLA DEI FIORI OWNERS' ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF AND TO THE EXTENT ALLEGED THEREIN, ON BEHALF OF ITS MEMBERS SERVED APR-13-2010, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON CORPORATION ON DEFENDANT INNOVATIVE INVESTMENT REALTY FUND LP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

GENERAL DENIAL

GENERAL DENIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT NIBBI BROTHERS (Fee:920.00)

Entry of Default Reject

REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF VILLA DEI FIORI OWNERS' ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF AND TO THE EXTENT ALLEGED THEREIN, ON BEHALF OF ITS MEMBERS AS TO DEFENDANT INNOVATIVE INVESTMENT REALTY FUND LP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF VILLA DEI FIORI OWNERS' ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF AND TO THE EXTENT ALLEGED THEREIN, ON BEHALF OF ITS MEMBERS SERVED JUL-12-2010, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT VILLA DEI FIORI CONDOMINIUMS L.P., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF VILLA DEI FIORI OWNERS' ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF AND TO THE EXTENT ALLEGED THEREIN, ON BEHALF OF ITS MEMBERS SERVED JUL-12-2010, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT INNOVATIVE REALTY SERVICES, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

ORDER

ORDER PER STIPULATION, APPOINTING SPECIAL MASTER

ORDER

ORDER RE-TRIAL ORDER NO. 1

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF SEP-03-2010 CONTINUED TO OCT-22-2010 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 212, TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S) INNOVATIVE REALTY SERVICES, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, AND VILLA DEI FIORI CONDOMINIUMS L.P., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ORDER

ORDER - PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 2

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT PER ORDER DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS DOE 1 TO BE SAN FRANCISCO FLOWER GROWERS' ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-22-2010 CONTINUED TO DEC-23-2010 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 212, TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S) INNOVATIVE INVESTMENT REALTY FUND LP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, AND VILLA DEI FIORI CONDOMINIUMS L.P., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

CROSS COMPLAINT

CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT NIBBI BROTHERS AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT INLAND MASONRY, INC. LAWSON ROOFING CO., INC. ALLIED HEATING AND AIR CONDITIONING, INC. ALUMINUM WEST H & H PLASTERING, INC. DOLAN CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION EDWARD W. SCOTT ELECTRIC, CO., INC. VALUE FIRE PROTECTION WG THOMPSON, INC. EGAN PLUMBING RICHARD HANCOCK, INC. DELTA BAY WATERPROOFING, INC. ROES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF VILLA DEI FIORI OWNERS' ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF AND TO THE EXTENT ALLEGED THEREIN, ON BEHALF OF ITS MEMBERS SERVED OCT-11-2010, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT SAN FRANCISCO FLOWER GROWERS' ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT NIBBI BROTHERS

150 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2012
  • Payment : REQ OR STIP AND ORDER W/O HEARING; Amount : $20; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W1612627C001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2012
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $410; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W2112601F041

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2012
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $40; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W2212523M002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2012
  • Payment : REQ OR STIP AND ORDER W/O HEARING; Amount : $20; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W2012509C002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2012
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $960; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W1612507F036

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2012
  • Payment : REQUEST OR STIP W/O HEARING; Amount : $20; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W2212426S002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2012
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $40; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W2012320M004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2012
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $40; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W2112223M016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2012
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $40; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W2112125M029

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2011
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $960; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W1611A14F006

    Read MoreRead Less
263 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2010
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS AS TO DEFENDANT INNOVATIVE INVESTMENT REALTY FUND LP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF VILLA DEI FIORI OWNERS' ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF AND TO THE EXTENT ALLEGED THEREIN, ON BEHALF OF ITS MEMBERS SERVED JUL-12-2010, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT INNOVATIVE REALTY SERVICES, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF VILLA DEI FIORI OWNERS' ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF AND TO THE EXTENT ALLEGED THEREIN, ON BEHALF OF ITS MEMBERS SERVED JUL-12-2010, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT VILLA DEI FIORI CONDOMINIUMS L.P., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF VILLA DEI FIORI OWNERS' ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF AND TO THE EXTENT ALLEGED THEREIN, ON BEHALF OF ITS MEMBERS AS TO DEFENDANT INNOVATIVE INVESTMENT REALTY FUND LP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • GENERAL DENIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT NIBBI BROTHERS (Fee:$920.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF VILLA DEI FIORI OWNERS' ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF AND TO THE EXTENT ALLEGED THEREIN, ON BEHALF OF ITS MEMBERS SERVED APR-13-2010, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON CORPORATION ON DEFENDANT INNOVATIVE INVESTMENT REALTY FUND LP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF VILLA DEI FIORI OWNERS' ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF AND TO THE EXTENT ALLEGED THEREIN, ON BEHALF OF ITS MEMBERS SERVED APR-05-2010, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE APR-09-2010 ON DEFENDANT NIBBI BROS. INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF VILLA DEI FIORI OWNERS' ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF AND TO THE EXTENT ALLEGED THEREIN, ON BEHALF OF ITS MEMBERS SERVED APR-08-2010, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON CORPORATION ON DEFENDANT VILLA DEI FIORI CONDOMINIUMS L.P., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CONSTRUCTION, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF VILLA DEI FIORI OWNERS' ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION, ON BEHALF OF ITSELF AND TO THE EXTENT ALLEGED THEREIN, ON BEHALF OF ITS MEMBERS AS TO DEFENDANT VILLA DEI FIORI CONDOMINIUMS L.P., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP INNOVATIVE REALTY SERVICES, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY INNOVATIVE INVESTMENT REALTY FUND LP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP NIBBI BROS. INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1 THRU 200, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR SEP-03-2010 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUN-01-2010 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON AUG-19-2010 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:$920.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******8280
Case Title:VILLA DEI FIORI OWNERS' ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA VS. VILLA DEI FIORI CONDOMINIUMS L.P., A CALIFORNIA et al
Court Date:SEP-29-2011 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Ntc Of Motionm To File Complaint In Intervention
Rulings:Set for hearing on Thursday, September 29, 2011, line 4, INTERVENOR LINCOLN GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S Motion To File Complaint In Intervention - DUPLICATE ENTRY. =(302/CWW)


Case Number:*******8280
Case Title:VILLA DEI FIORI OWNERS' ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA VS. VILLA DEI FIORI CONDOMINIUMS L.P., A CALIFORNIA et al
Court Date:FEB-23-2012 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Otion To Set Case For Trial
Rulings:Set for hearing on Thursday, February 23, 2012, Line 4, PLAINTIFF VILLA DEI FIORI OWNERS' ASSOCIATION'S Motion To Set Case For Trial is off calendar. Trial setting matters are to be noticed before the Presiding Judge in Department 206. =(302/CK)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EDWARD W SCOTT ELECTRIC CO., INC is a litigant

Latest cases where SAN FRANCISCO FLOWER GROWERS' ASSOCIATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where EGAN PLUMBING, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where STARLINE WINDOWS INC is a litigant