This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 12:05:31 (UTC).

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS. FRANKLIN PERRY et al

Case Summary

On 04/11/2013 U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against FRANKLIN PERRY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0569

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE, ITS SUCCESSORS AND ASSIGNS,

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE, ITS SUCCESSORS AND ASSIGNS, FOR CASTLE PEAK 2012-1 LOAN TRUST MORTGAGE-BACKED NOTES, SERIES 2012-1

Defendants and Petitioners

CORTLAND, DAWN D.

ALL PARTIES CLAMING AN INTEREST IN 1416 7TH AVENUE SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94122

BRIGNON, JAY DBA LOAN STAR LEGAL AND COPY SERVICES

CONTINENTAL CREDIT CONTROL, INC.

CORTLAND, ROSEMARIE J.

CORTLAND, WARREN J.

GROSS, ROGER S.

MOSS, MARC

MOSS, VICTORIAL

PERRY, FRANKLIN

Palo Alto, CA 94306

TAX COLLECTOR FOR THE COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

THE NATIONAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC.

UNITED STATES INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

WEEMS, MARY L.

THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO SUED HEREIN AS TAX COLLECTOR FOR THE COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

DOES 1-50 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PLESSET, SONIA A

Attorney at ROBERT J. JACKSON & ASSOCIATES, INC.

4199 Campus Drive, Suite 350

Irvine, CA 92612

Defendant and Petitioner Attorneys

RUBIN, ROGER R

1155 Pine Street

San Francisco, CA 94109

POLLAND, JONATHAN

Attorney at GORDON & POLLAND

465 California Street, Ste 310

San Francisco, CA 94104

LEW, DEBRA DEE

Attorney at TAX COLLECTOR - LEGAL SECTION

Po Box 7426

San Francisco, CA 94120

 

Court Documents

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CORTLAND, DAWN D. (Fee:450.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE, ITS SUCCESSORS AND ASSIGNS, FOR CASTLE PEAK 2012-1 LOAN TRUST MORTGAGE-BACKED NOTES, SERIES 2012-1 SERVED MAY-08-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT CORTLAND, DAWN D.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE, ITS SUCCESSORS AND ASSIGNS, FOR CASTLE PEAK 2012-1 LOAN TRUST MORTGAGE-BACKED NOTES, SERIES 2012-1 SERVED APR-29-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT TAX COLLECTOR FOR THE COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE, ITS SUCCESSORS AND ASSIGNS, FOR CASTLE PEAK 2012-1 LOAN TRUST MORTGAGE-BACKED NOTES, SERIES 2012-1 SERVED APR-30-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT THE NATIONAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT FILED BY PETITIONER CORTLAND, DAWN D.

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER FILED BY UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT PERRY, FRANKLIN (Fee:450.00)

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF SEP-11-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR - DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

COMPLAINT

QUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE, ITS SUCCESSORS AND ASSIGNS, FOR CASTLE PEAK 2012-1 LOAN TRUST MORTGAGE-BACKED NOTES, SERIES 2012-1 AS TO DEFENDANT PERRY, FRANKLIN CORTLAND, DAWN D. CORTLAND, WARREN J. CORTLAND, ROSEMARIE J. WEEMS, MARY L. CONTINENTAL CREDIT CONTROL, INC. THE NATIONAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC. GROSS, ROGER S. MOSS, MARC MOSS, VICTORIAL TAX COLLECTOR FOR THE COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO BRIGNON, JAY DBA LOAN STAR LEGAL AND COPY SERVICES UNITED STATES INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE DOES 1-50 INCLUSIVE ALL PARTIES CLAMING AN INTEREST IN 1416 7TH AVENUE SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94122 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR SEP-11-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUN-10-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON AUG-27-2013 (Fee:450.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE, ITS SUCCESSORS AND ASSIGNS, FOR CASTLE PEAK 2012-1 LOAN TRUST MORTGAGE-BACKED NOTES, SERIES 2012-1 SERVED MAY-06-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT WEEMS, MARY L.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE, ITS SUCCESSORS AND ASSIGNS, FOR CASTLE PEAK 2012-1 LOAN TRUST MORTGAGE-BACKED NOTES, SERIES 2012-1 SERVED MAY-02-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT UNITED STATES INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT GROSS, ROGER S. MOSS, MARC MOSS, VICTORIAL

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO DEFENDANT THE NATIONAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC.

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO SUED HEREIN AS TAX COLLECTOR FOR THE COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO (Fee:EXEMPT)

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT CORTLAND, WARREN J. CORTLAND, ROSEMARIE J.

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT CONTINENTAL CREDIT CONTROL, INC. THE NATIONAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC.

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF SEP-11-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR - DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT PERRY, FRANKLIN (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE, ITS SUCCESSORS AND ASSIGNS, FOR CASTLE PEAK 2012-1 LOAN TRUST MORTGAGE-BACKED NOTES, SERIES 2012-1 SERVED JUN-05-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON CORPORATION ON DEFENDANT CONTINENTAL CREDIT CONTROL, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE, ITS SUCCESSORS AND ASSIGNS, FOR CASTLE PEAK 2012-1 LOAN TRUST MORTGAGE-BACKED NOTES, SERIES 2012-1 SERVED JUN-14-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT PERRY, FRANKLIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DISCLAIMER FILED BY UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT CONTINENTAL CREDIT CONTROL, INC. THE NATIONAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT CORTLAND, WARREN J. CORTLAND, ROSEMARIE J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO SUED HEREIN AS TAX COLLECTOR FOR THE COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO (Fee:EXEMPT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO DEFENDANT THE NATIONAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE, ITS SUCCESSORS AND ASSIGNS, FOR CASTLE PEAK 2012-1 LOAN TRUST MORTGAGE-BACKED NOTES, SERIES 2012-1 SERVED APR-29-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT TAX COLLECTOR FOR THE COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE, ITS SUCCESSORS AND ASSIGNS, FOR CASTLE PEAK 2012-1 LOAN TRUST MORTGAGE-BACKED NOTES, SERIES 2012-1 SERVED MAY-08-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT CORTLAND, DAWN D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE, ITS SUCCESSORS AND ASSIGNS, FOR CASTLE PEAK 2012-1 LOAN TRUST MORTGAGE-BACKED NOTES, SERIES 2012-1 SERVED MAY-02-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT UNITED STATES INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE, ITS SUCCESSORS AND ASSIGNS, FOR CASTLE PEAK 2012-1 LOAN TRUST MORTGAGE-BACKED NOTES, SERIES 2012-1 SERVED MAY-06-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT WEEMS, MARY L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2013
  • RECEIVED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT **STRAIGHT DEFAULT** FILED BY PLAINTIFF U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE, ITS SUCCESSORS AND ASSIGNS, FOR CASTLE PEAK 2012-1 LOAN TRUST MORTGAGE-BACKED NOTES, SERIES 2012-1 AS TO DEFENDANT THE NATIONAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT WEEMS, MARY L. (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT CORTLAND, DAWN D. (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION (LIS PENDENS)[CCP 405.20] FILED BY PLAINTIFF U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE, ITS SUCCESSORS AND ASSIGNS, FOR CASTLE PEAK 2012-1 LOAN TRUST MORTGAGE-BACKED NOTES, SERIES 2012-1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • QUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS INDENTURE TRUSTEE, ITS SUCCESSORS AND ASSIGNS, FOR CASTLE PEAK 2012-1 LOAN TRUST MORTGAGE-BACKED NOTES, SERIES 2012-1 AS TO DEFENDANT PERRY, FRANKLIN CORTLAND, DAWN D. CORTLAND, WARREN J. CORTLAND, ROSEMARIE J. WEEMS, MARY L. CONTINENTAL CREDIT CONTROL, INC. THE NATIONAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC. GROSS, ROGER S. MOSS, MARC MOSS, VICTORIAL TAX COLLECTOR FOR THE COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO BRIGNON, JAY DBA LOAN STAR LEGAL AND COPY SERVICES UNITED STATES INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE DOES 1-50 INCLUSIVE ALL PARTIES CLAMING AN INTEREST IN 1416 7TH AVENUE SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94122 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR SEP-11-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUN-10-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON AUG-27-2013 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less