This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 08/19/2019 at 10:57:03 (UTC).

URIEL CORONA AGUILAR VS. PG&E CORPORATION ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/13/2018 a Other - Complex Tort/Class Action case was filed by URIEL CORONA AGUILAR against PG E CORPORATION in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4268

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

TERI L. JACKSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AGUILAR, URIEL CORONA

Defendants

PG&E CORPORATION

DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE

PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY

PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ENTRY OF COORDINATION ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 100035825) FILED BY DEFENDANT PG&E CORPORATION PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

Notice of Submission for Coordination

NOTICE OF SUBMISSION FOR COORDINATION (TRANSACTION ID # 100033306) FILED BY DEFENDANT PG&E CORPORATION PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

COMPLAINT

MASS TORT, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF AGUILAR, URIEL CORONA AS TO DEFENDANT PG&E CORPORATION PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-18-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-16-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2018 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-18-2018 IS OFF CALENDAR. COORDINATED WITH JCCP 4955. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100062041) FILED BY DEFENDANT PG&E CORPORATION PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

Notice of Entry of Coordination Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF COORDINATION ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 100035825) FILED BY DEFENDANT PG&E CORPORATION PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

Notice of Stay of Proceedings

NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS REGARDING BANKRUPTCY (TRANSACTION ID # 100062041) FILED BY DEFENDANT PG&E CORPORATION PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100033306) FILED BY DEFENDANT PG&E CORPORATION PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $2900; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : W1718320F017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $1450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W1518213F012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100062041) FILED BY DEFENDANT PG&E CORPORATION PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS REGARDING BANKRUPTCY (TRANSACTION ID # 100062041) FILED BY DEFENDANT PG&E CORPORATION PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-18-2018 IS OFF CALENDAR. COORDINATED WITH JCCP 4955. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ENTRY OF COORDINATION ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 100035825) FILED BY DEFENDANT PG&E CORPORATION PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF COORDINATION ORDER (TRANSACTION ID # 100035825) FILED BY DEFENDANT PG&E CORPORATION PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100033306) FILED BY DEFENDANT PG&E CORPORATION PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SUBMISSION FOR COORDINATION (TRANSACTION ID # 100033306) FILED BY DEFENDANT PG&E CORPORATION PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY (Fee:$2900.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MASS TORT, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF AGUILAR, URIEL CORONA AS TO DEFENDANT PG&E CORPORATION PACIFIC GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-18-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-16-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2018 COMPLEX LITIGATION ASSIGNMENT REQUESTED BY FILING PARTIES; FEE INCLUDED IN FILING FEE (Fee:$1450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less