Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/16/2016 at 15:03:36 (UTC).

URA CHRISTIAN VS. TOPA INSURANCE CO. ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/22/2015 URA CHRISTIAN filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against TOPA INSURANCE CO. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8079

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHRISTIAN, URA

Defendants

ANCHOR CLAIMS SERVICES, INC.

DOES 1 TO 10

TOPA INSURANCE CO.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TABOR, ALLAN MERLE

Attorney at RYAN & TABOR

11 Embarcadero West Ste 130

Oakland, CA 94607

Defendant Attorney

MCGREEVY, RICHARD EARL

Attorney at LEACH & MCGREEVY LLP

2833 Laguna St

San Francisco, CA 94123

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

CIVIL RIGHTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHRISTIAN, URA AS TO DEFENDANT TOPA INSURANCE CO. ANCHOR CLAIMS SERVICES, INC. DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-24-2016 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON NOV-23-2015 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON FEB-01-2016 (Fee:450.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Memorandum of Points and Authorities re Demurrer

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER (TRANSACTION ID # 15349067) FILED BY DEFENDANT TOPA INSURANCE CO. ANCHOR CLAIMS SERVICES, INC.

Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike portions of Plaintiffs Complaint

MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15349067) FILED BY DEFENDANT TOPA INSURANCE CO. ANCHOR CLAIMS SERVICES, INC. HEARING SET FOR JAN-29-2016 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:NO FEE)

ORDER

ORDER SUSTAINING DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND

Notice of Entry of judgment or Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 100014553) FILED BY DEFENDANT TOPA INSURANCE CO. ANCHOR CLAIMS SERVICES, INC.

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-13-2016 CONTINUED TO JUN-08-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR DEFENDANT(S) TO FILE JUDGMENT FOLLOWING ORDER RE DEMURRER. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF CHRISTIAN, URA TAKE NOTHING FROM DEFENDANT TOPA INSURANCE CO. ANCHOR CLAIMS SERVICES, INC. SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

Memorandum of Costs

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AND DISBURSEMENTS, $960.00 TOTAL COSTS, MATURE DATE APR-27-2016,, (TRANSACTION ID # 100017199) FILED BY DEFENDANT TOPA INSURANCE CO. ANCHOR CLAIMS SERVICES, INC.

Notice of Defendants Demurrer and Demurrer to Plaintiffs Complaint

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15349067) FILED BY DEFENDANT TOPA INSURANCE CO. ANCHOR CLAIMS SERVICES, INC. HEARING SET FOR JAN-29-2016 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:900.00)

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendants Motion t

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE (TRANSACTION ID # 15349067) FILED BY DEFENDANT TOPA INSURANCE CO. ANCHOR CLAIMS SERVICES, INC.

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 15349067) FILED BY DEFENDANT TOPA INSURANCE CO. ANCHOR CLAIMS SERVICES, INC.

CCP 430.14 MEET AND CONFER DECLARATION OF BRIAN LEACH RE: DEMURRER TO

CCP 430.14 MEET AND CONFER DECLARATION OF BRIAN LEACH RE: DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16013123) FILED BY DEFENDANT TOPA INSURANCE CO. ANCHOR CLAIMS SERVICES, INC.

Declaration of Allan M. Tabor

DECLARATION OF ALLAN M. TABOR (TRANSACTION ID # 16021022) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHRISTIAN, URA

Points and Authorities in Response to Defendants Motion

POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION (TRANSACTION ID # 16021022) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHRISTIAN, URA

Defendants Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Reply to Plaintif

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (TRANSACTION ID # 16021044) FILED BY DEFENDANT TOPA INSURANCE CO. ANCHOR CLAIMS SERVICES, INC.

Defendants Reply to Plaintiffs Opposition to Demurrer to Plaintiffs Co

REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16021044) FILED BY DEFENDANT TOPA INSURANCE CO. ANCHOR CLAIMS SERVICES, INC.

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF FEB-24-2016 CONTINUED TO APR-13-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AND DISBURSEMENTS, $960.00 TOTAL COSTS, MATURE DATE APR-27-2016,, (TRANSACTION ID # 100017199) FILED BY DEFENDANT TOPA INSURANCE CO. ANCHOR CLAIMS SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF CHRISTIAN, URA TAKE NOTHING FROM DEFENDANT TOPA INSURANCE CO. ANCHOR CLAIMS SERVICES, INC. SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF APR-13-2016 CONTINUED TO JUN-08-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR DEFENDANT(S) TO FILE JUDGMENT FOLLOWING ORDER RE DEMURRER. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • MINI MINUTES FOR FEB-23-2016 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • MINI MINUTES FOR FEB-23-2016 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 100014553) FILED BY DEFENDANT TOPA INSURANCE CO. ANCHOR CLAIMS SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER SUSTAINING DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, DEFENDANTS TOPA INSURANCE CO. AND ANCHOR CLAIMS SERVICES, INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT IS OFF CALENDAR IN LIGHT OF THE RULING ON DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER. JUDGE: HAROLD KAHN; CLERK: SEAN KANE; REPORTER: SHERRY SAWYER, CSR #5976 (302/HK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, DEFENDANTS TOPA INSURANCE CO. AND ANCHOR CLAIMS SERVICES, INC.'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT TO BOTH CAUSES OF ACTION IS SUSTAINED WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND. SEE ORDER FOR FULL TEXT. ORDER SIGNED IN OPEN COURT. JUDGE: HAROLD KAHN; CLERK: SEAN KANE; REPORTER: SHERRY SAWYER, CSR #5976 (302/HK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF FEB-24-2016 CONTINUED TO APR-13-2016 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CCP 430.14 MEET AND CONFER DECLARATION OF BRIAN LEACH RE: DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16013123) FILED BY DEFENDANT TOPA INSURANCE CO. ANCHOR CLAIMS SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR (TRANSACTION ID # 15349067) FILED BY DEFENDANT TOPA INSURANCE CO. ANCHOR CLAIMS SERVICES, INC. (Fee:30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 15349067) FILED BY DEFENDANT TOPA INSURANCE CO. ANCHOR CLAIMS SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE (TRANSACTION ID # 15349067) FILED BY DEFENDANT TOPA INSURANCE CO. ANCHOR CLAIMS SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15349067) FILED BY DEFENDANT TOPA INSURANCE CO. ANCHOR CLAIMS SERVICES, INC. HEARING SET FOR JAN-29-2016 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:NO FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR (TRANSACTION ID # 15349067) FILED BY DEFENDANT TOPA INSURANCE CO. ANCHOR CLAIMS SERVICES, INC. (Fee:30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER (TRANSACTION ID # 15349067) FILED BY DEFENDANT TOPA INSURANCE CO. ANCHOR CLAIMS SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15349067) FILED BY DEFENDANT TOPA INSURANCE CO. ANCHOR CLAIMS SERVICES, INC. HEARING SET FOR JAN-29-2016 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:900.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL RIGHTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CHRISTIAN, URA AS TO DEFENDANT TOPA INSURANCE CO. ANCHOR CLAIMS SERVICES, INC. DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-24-2016 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON NOV-23-2015 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON FEB-01-2016 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TOPA INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer McGreevy, Richard Earl