This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 05:45:42 (UTC).

UNIFUND CCR, LLC VS. TRAN, SHELLY Q. A/K/A SHELLY QUAN et al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2013 UNIFUND CCR, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TRAN, SHELLY Q A/K/A SHELLY QUAN. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8425

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIFUND CCR, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

TRAN, SHELLY Q. A/K/A SHELLY QUAN

DOES 1 TO 5 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIELE, KENNETH J.

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF KENNETH J. MIELE

8581 Santa Monica Blvd. #17

Los Angeles, CA 90069

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SERVED FEB-28-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT TRAN, SHELLY Q. A/K/A SHELLY QUAN

memo of costs

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $440.03 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $878.37 INTEREST, $123.00 COSTS, (TRANSACTION ID # 15116030) FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

DECLARATION

DECLARATION KENNETH J. MIELE FILED RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

DECLARATION

DECLARATION CHRIS BLANTON FILED RE: ASSIGNMENT OF ACCOUNT, ACCOUNT BALANCE, INTEREST AND COSTS OF WAIVER OF ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, CLERK'S JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $285.00 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT TRAN, SHELLY Q. A/K/A SHELLY QUAN

COMPLAINT

EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT AND DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CCP 395(B) FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT TRAN, SHELLY Q. A/K/A SHELLY QUAN DOES 1 TO 5 INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-31-2013 (Fee:225.00)

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 5 INCLUSIVE

CLERKS JUDGMENT - GENERAL

UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT TRAN, SHELLY Q. A/K/A SHELLY QUAN $3,801.34 PRINCIPAL, $1,111.25 INTEREST, $285.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $5,197.59, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $440.03 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $878.37 INTEREST, $123.00 COSTS, (TRANSACTION ID # 15116030) FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2014
  • RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, PARTIALLY SATISFIED IN THE SUM OF $440.03 AS TO DEFENDANT TRAN, SHELLY Q. A/K/A SHELLY QUAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2013
  • EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT TRAN, SHELLY Q. A/K/A SHELLY QUAN (Fee:25.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2013
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $98.26 INTEREST, $53.00 COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2013
  • CRC 3.740 REVIEW - JUDGMENT ON FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2013
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Fee:25.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT TRAN, SHELLY Q. A/K/A SHELLY QUAN $3,801.34 PRINCIPAL, $1,111.25 INTEREST, $285.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $5,197.59, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 5 INCLUSIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION CHRIS BLANTON FILED RE: ASSIGNMENT OF ACCOUNT, ACCOUNT BALANCE, INTEREST AND COSTS OF WAIVER OF ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION KENNETH J. MIELE FILED RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, CLERK'S JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $285.00 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT TRAN, SHELLY Q. A/K/A SHELLY QUAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2013
  • RECEIVED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT, CLERK'S JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT TRAN, SHELLY Q. A/K/A SHELLY QUAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SERVED FEB-28-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT TRAN, SHELLY Q. A/K/A SHELLY QUAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT AND DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CCP 395(B) FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT TRAN, SHELLY Q. A/K/A SHELLY QUAN DOES 1 TO 5 INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-31-2013 (Fee:225.00)

    Read MoreRead Less