This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 05:45:13 (UTC).

UNIFUND CCR LLC, A LLC DOING BUSINESS VS. NOEL L. NEPACENA et al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2013 UNIFUND CCR LLC, A LLC DOING BUSINESS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NOEL L NEPACENA. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8421

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIFUND CCR LLC, A LLC DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA

Defendants

NEPACENA, NOEL L.

DOES 1 TO 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

QUALL, MATTHEW W.

Attorney at QUALL CARDOT LLP

205 East River Park Circle, Suite 110

Fresno, CA 93720

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF CHRIS BLANTON IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR JUDGMENT [CCP 585(B)-(D)] FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR LLC, A LLC DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA

Order To Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR MAY-20-2014 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

CLERKS JUDGMENT - GENERAL

UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR LLC, A LLC DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT NEPACENA, NOEL L. $705.46 PRINCIPAL, $240.00 ATTORNEY FEES, $139.46 INTEREST, $284.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $1,368.92, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULLY SATISFIED, (TRANSACTION ID # 15307053) FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR LLC, A LLC DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA AS TO DEFENDANT NEPACENA, NOEL L.

DECLARATION

DECLARATION OF DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR LLC, A LLC DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA

Default Judgment Reject

DEFAULT JUDGMENT REJECTED, PLACED IN PICKUP BOX, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR LLC, A LLC DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA AS TO DEFENDANT NEPACENA, NOEL L.

Case Ordered Off Calendar

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF MAY-20-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $284.00 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $31.36 AS TO DEFENDANT NEPACENA, NOEL L.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, CLERK'S JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $284.00 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT NEPACENA, NOEL L.

DECLARATION

DECLARATION RE THE COMPUTATION OF INTEREST FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR LLC, A LLC DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA

EXECUTION FOR MONEY/POSSESSION/SALE RETURN

RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO ALAMEDA COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, FULLY SATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT NEPACENA, NOEL L.

COMPLAINT

EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR LLC, A LLC DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA AS TO DEFENDANT NEPACENA, NOEL L. DOES 1 TO 100 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-31-2013 (Fee:225.00)

DECLARATION

DECLARATION RE THE COMPUTATION OF ATTORNEY'S FEES FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR LLC, A LLC DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR LLC, A LLC DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA SERVED FEB-20-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT NEPACENA, NOEL L.

DECLARATION

DECLARATION RE CCP 1033 FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR LLC, A LLC DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 100

EXECUTION FOR MONEY/POSSESSION/SALE RETURN

RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT NEPACENA, NOEL L.

DECLARATION

DECLARATION IN LIEU OF IMAGED OR LOST INSTRUMENTS/DOCUMENTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR LLC, A LLC DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULLY SATISFIED, (TRANSACTION ID # 15307053) FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR LLC, A LLC DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA AS TO DEFENDANT NEPACENA, NOEL L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, UNSATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT NEPACENA, NOEL L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO ALAMEDA COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, FULLY SATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT NEPACENA, NOEL L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 15041091) FILED BY ATTORNEY QUALL, MATTHEW W.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT NEPACENA, NOEL L. (Fee:25.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $115.09 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $46.68 INTEREST, $.00 COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR LLC, A LLC DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • DECLARATION RE COMPUTATION OF INTEREST FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR LLC, A LLC DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO ALAMEDA COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT NEPACENA, NOEL L. (Fee:25.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $115.09 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $21.76 INTEREST, $.00 COSTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR LLC, A LLC DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF MAY-20-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 06/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN LIEU OF IMAGED OR LOST INSTRUMENTS/DOCUMENTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR LLC, A LLC DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR LLC, A LLC DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF CHRIS BLANTON IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR JUDGMENT [CCP 585(B)-(D)] FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR LLC, A LLC DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE CCP 1033 FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR LLC, A LLC DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE THE COMPUTATION OF INTEREST FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR LLC, A LLC DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, CLERK'S JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $284.00 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT NEPACENA, NOEL L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2013
  • RECEIVED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT, CLERK'S JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR LLC, A LLC DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA AS TO DEFENDANT NEPACENA, NOEL L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR LLC, A LLC DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA SERVED FEB-20-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT NEPACENA, NOEL L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR LLC, A LLC DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA AS TO DEFENDANT NEPACENA, NOEL L. DOES 1 TO 100 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-31-2013 (Fee:225.00)

    Read MoreRead Less