This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 05:45:46 (UTC).

UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS. KAMSHEUNG MAN et al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2013 UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KAMSHEUNG MAN. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8426

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

MAN, KAMSHEUNG

DOES 1 TO 5 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIELE, KENNETH J.

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF KENNETH J. MIELE

8581 Santa Monica Blvd. #17

Los Angeles, CA 90069

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RE: ASSIGNMENT OF ACCOUNT, ACCOUNT BALANCE, INTEREST , WAIVER OF COST ,AND ATTORNEYS FEES FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Order To Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR MAY-20-2014 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

memo of costs

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $796.67 INTEREST, $104.00 COSTS, (TRANSACTION ID # 15200012) FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

CLERKS JUDGMENT - GENERAL

UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT MAN, KAMSHEUNG $4,340.43 PRINCIPAL, $1,872.93 INTEREST, TOTAL JUDGMENT $6,213.36, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

Default Judgment Reject

DEFAULT JUDGMENT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT MAN, KAMSHEUNG

memo of costs

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $590.69 INTEREST, $63.00 COSTS, (TRANSACTION ID # 15116034) FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, CLERK'S JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $345.00 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT MAN, KAMSHEUNG

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 5 INCLUSIVE

Case Ordered Off Calendar

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF MAY-20-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS AS TO DEFENDANT MAN, KAMSHEUNG

COMPLAINT

EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT AND DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CCP 395(B) FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT MAN, KAMSHEUNG DOES 1 TO 5 INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-31-2013 (Fee:225.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SERVED JUL-29-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT MAN, KAMSHEUNG

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $796.67 INTEREST, $104.00 COSTS, (TRANSACTION ID # 15200012) FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $590.69 INTEREST, $63.00 COSTS, (TRANSACTION ID # 15116034) FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF MAY-20-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Fee:25.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT MAN, KAMSHEUNG $4,340.43 PRINCIPAL, $1,872.93 INTEREST, TOTAL JUDGMENT $6,213.36, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RE: ASSIGNMENT OF ACCOUNT, ACCOUNT BALANCE, INTEREST , WAIVER OF COST ,AND ATTORNEYS FEES FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 5 INCLUSIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR CLERK'S JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS AS TO DEFENDANT MAN, KAMSHEUNG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • RECEIVED REQUEST FOR CLERK'S JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT MAN, KAMSHEUNG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR MAY-20-2014 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAULT JUDGMENT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT REJECTED, NOTICE MAILED, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT MAN, KAMSHEUNG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, CLERK'S JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $345.00 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT MAN, KAMSHEUNG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • RECEIVED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT, CLERK'S JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT MAN, KAMSHEUNG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2013
  • CRC 3.740 REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SERVED JUL-29-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT MAN, KAMSHEUNG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT AND DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CCP 395(B) FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT MAN, KAMSHEUNG DOES 1 TO 5 INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-31-2013 (Fee:225.00)

    Read MoreRead Less