Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 05:48:27 (UTC).

UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS. EVA M. ALLRED et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against EVA M ALLRED. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8455

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

ALLRED, EVA M.

DOES 1 TO 5, INCLUSIVE

ALLRED, EVA

Sf, CA 94109

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MIELE, KENNETH J.

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF KENNETH J. MIELE

8581 Santa Monica Blvd. #17

Los Angeles, CA 90069

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS REGARDING BANKRUPTCY FILED BY PETITIONER UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

ORDER

ORDER - AMENDED ORDER DENYING WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS AS TO DEFENDANT EVA ALLRED

Order Setting Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR FEB-26-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS REPORT RE BANKRUPTCY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF FEB-26-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

RULING ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF FEES

ORDER DENYING WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52 AS TO DEFENDANT ALLRED, EVA

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SERVED FEB-25-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT ALLRED, EVA M.

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ALLRED, EVA (Fee:IFP)

COMPLAINT

EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT AND DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CCP 395(B) FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT ALLRED, EVA M. DOES 1 TO 5, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-05-2013 (Fee:225.00)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF FEB-26-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR FEB-26-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS REPORT RE BANKRUPTCY. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS REGARDING BANKRUPTCY FILED BY PETITIONER UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER - AMENDED ORDER DENYING WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS AS TO DEFENDANT EVA ALLRED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DENYING WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52 AS TO DEFENDANT ALLRED, EVA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2013
  • MASTER CALENDAR MOTION ON MAY-08-2013 IN DEPT. 206, HEARING ON APPLICANT/DEFENDANT EVA ALLRED'S WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS. NO APPEARANCE BY APPLICANT. THE COURT DENIED THE APPLICATION IN WHOLE. ORDER SIGNED, AND ENDORSED-FILED COPY MAILED TO APPLICANT. JUDGE: CYNTHIA M. LEE; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ALLRED, EVA (Fee:IFP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • APPLICATION PENDING FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY DEFENDANT ALLRED, EVA HEARING SET FOR MAY-08-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 206

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SERVED FEB-25-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT ALLRED, EVA M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT AND DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CCP 395(B) FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT ALLRED, EVA M. DOES 1 TO 5, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON AUG-05-2013 (Fee:225.00)

    Read MoreRead Less