This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 05:45:51 (UTC).

UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS. ANDY C LEE et al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2013 UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ANDY C LEE. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8427

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

LEE, ANDY C

DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIELE, KENNETH J.

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF KENNETH J. MIELE

8581 Santa Monica Blvd. #17

Los Angeles, CA 90069

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT AND DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CCP 395(B) FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT LEE, ANDY C DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-31-2013 (Fee:225.00)

DECLARATION

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RE: ASSIGNMENT OF ACCOUNT, ACCOUNT BALANCE, INTEREST AND COSTS, WAIVER OF ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Order To Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR OCT-22-2013 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

DECLARATION

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, CLERK'S JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $465.00 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT LEE, ANDY C

Case Ordered Off Calendar

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF FEB-25-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Continued Order to Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR OCT-22-2013 CONTINUED TO FEB-25-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). THE OCT-22-2013 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

CLERKS JUDGMENT - GENERAL

UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT LEE, ANDY C $3,892.31 PRINCIPAL, $1,338.32 INTEREST, $465.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $5,695.63, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

DECLARATION

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE

memo of costs

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $928.93 INTEREST, $104.00 COSTS, (TRANSACTION ID # 15195016) FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

memo of costs

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $764.62 INTEREST, $63.00 COSTS, (TRANSACTION ID # 15116027) FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SERVED AUG-07-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT LEE, ANDY C

DECLARATION

DECLARATION IN RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

DECLARATION

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $928.93 INTEREST, $104.00 COSTS, (TRANSACTION ID # 15195016) FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT, $.00 CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED, $764.62 INTEREST, $63.00 COSTS, (TRANSACTION ID # 15116027) FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF FEB-25-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR. JUDGMENT ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2013
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (Fee:25.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT LEE, ANDY C $3,892.31 PRINCIPAL, $1,338.32 INTEREST, $465.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $5,695.63, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RE: ASSIGNMENT OF ACCOUNT, ACCOUNT BALANCE, INTEREST AND COSTS, WAIVER OF ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, CLERK'S JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $465.00 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT LEE, ANDY C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2013
  • RECEIVED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT LEE, ANDY C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2013
  • RECEIVED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT, CLERK'S JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT LEE, ANDY C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR OCT-22-2013 CONTINUED TO FEB-25-2014 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN AN ANSWER(S) FROM, OR ENTER DEFAULT(S) AGAINST, DEFENDANT(S). THE OCT-22-2013 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY SERVED AUG-07-2013, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON DEFENDANT LEE, ANDY C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR OCT-22-2013 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT AND DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CCP 395(B) FILED BY PLAINTIFF UNIFUND CCR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT LEE, ANDY C DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-31-2013 (Fee:225.00)

    Read MoreRead Less