This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 05:46:17 (UTC).

ULRIKE SILKEY et al VS. ROBERT BRADSHAW et al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2013 ULRIKE SILKEY filed a Property - Wrongful Eviction lawsuit against ROBERT BRADSHAW. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8432

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Wrongful Eviction

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

SILKEY, DAVID

SILKEY, ULRIKE

DOES 1 TO 20, INCL.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

BRADSHAW, ROBERT AKA BOB BRADSHAW

DOES 1 TO 20, INCL.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

BRACAMONTES, MICHAEL R

Attorney at BRACAMONTES & VLASAK, P.C.

220 Montgomery St., Ste. 870

San Francisco, CA 94104

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

RAIFSNIDER, MICHAEL JOSEPH

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

109 Geary Street, Fourth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

SALAZAR, JR., JOSEPH A.

Attorney at MAYALL, HURLEY, KNUTSEN, SMITH & GREEN

2453 Grand Canal Blvd., Second Floor

Stockton, CA 95207

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

WRONGFUL EVICTION, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SILKEY, ULRIKE SILKEY, DAVID AS TO DEFENDANT BRADSHAW, ROBERT AKA BOB BRADSHAW DOES 1 TO 20, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-03-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-02-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-18-2013 (Fee:450.00)

ORDER

ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES AND FOR ORDER FOR SANCTIONS

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NTC IN SUPPORT OF PLTFFS' OPPOS TO DEFT'S MTN TO QUASH PLTFF'S SUBPOENA TO DAVID PINE, M.D. FILED BY PLAINTIFF SILKEY, ULRIKE SILKEY, DAVID

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SILKEY, ULRIKE SILKEY, DAVID JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 9.0 DAYS

Case Ordered Off Calendar

CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF SEP-09-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order Setting Mandatory Settlement Conference

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR MAR-07-2014 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPT. 212 WITH CONFERENCE OFFICER MALCOLM SHER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SILKEY, ULRIKE SILKEY, DAVID SERVED FEB-09-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT BRADSHAW, ROBERT AKA BOB BRADSHAW

ANSWER

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT SILKEY, ULRIKE SILKEY, DAVID

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF ULRIKE SILKEY IN SUPPORT OF PLFF'S OPPOS TO DEFT'S MTN TO QUASH PLTFF'S SUBPOENA TO DAVID PINE, M.D. FILED BY PLAINTIFF SILKEY, ULRIKE SILKEY, DAVID

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY BRADSHAW, ROBERT

Order to Show Cause RE Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR MAR-24-2014. NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED ON 3/5/14. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON SEP-09-2014 AT 10:30 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. (206)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT BRADSHAW, ROBERT AKA BOB BRADSHAW JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT BRADSHAW, ROBERT AKA BOB BRADSHAW JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SILKEY, ULRIKE SILKEY, DAVID

OPPOSITION

OPPOSITION TO DEFT'S MTN TO QUASH PLTFF'S SUBPOENA TO DAVID PINE, M.D. FILED BY PLAINTIFF SILKEY, ULRIKE SILKEY, DAVID

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

ORDER

ORDER RE DEFENDANT BOB BRADSHAW'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO QUASH PLAINTIFFS' SUBPOENA TO DAVID PINE, M.D. (MOBILE CRISIS UNIT)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF SEP-09-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • REMOVED FROM SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR MAR-07-2014 - NOT HELD AND REMOVED BY THE COURT. CASE SETTLED PRIOR TO CONFERENCE. (1.0)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR MAR-24-2014. NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED ON 3/5/14. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON SEP-09-2014 AT 10:30 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SILKEY, ULRIKE SILKEY, DAVID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR MAR-07-2014 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPT. 212 WITH CONFERENCE OFFICER MALCOLM SHER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED FILED BY DEFENDANT BRADSHAW, ROBERT AKA BOB BRADSHAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2014
  • MINI MINUTES FOR JAN-15-2014 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR MOTION TO BE HEARD BY A MEMBER OF THE CALIFORNIA BAR SERVING AS A TEMPORARY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2014
  • DISCOVERY 302, PLAINTIFFS ULRIKE SILKEY'S AND DAVID SILKEY'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES AND FOR AN ORDER FOR SANCTIONS IS DENIED AS MOOT. DEFENDANT'S INITIAL RESPONSE TO FORM INTERROGATORY 15.1, CONSISTING SOLELY OF OBJECTIONS, WAS IMPROPER AND CONSTITUTES A MISUSE OF THE DISCOVERY PROCESS. A PARTY MAY NOT EVADE ITS RESPONSIBILITY TO RESPOND TO FORM INTERROGATORY 15.1 WITH FACTS SIMPLY BY ASSERTING THAT ITS INVESTIGATION AND DISCOVERY ARE NOT COMPLETE. NEVERTHELESS, DEFENDANT HAS SUPPLEMENTED ITS RESPONSES AFTER THE FILING OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION, AND PLAINTIFFS' REPLY BRIEF DOES NOT CHALLENGE THE ADEQUACY OF THE SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSES. REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IS DENIED. ORDER SIGNED IN OPEN COURT. JUDGE PRO TEM ERNEST A. HALPERIN, CLERK K. LIU, NOT REPORTED. (D302)

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT BRADSHAW, ROBERT AKA BOB BRADSHAW JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT BRADSHAW, ROBERT AKA BOB BRADSHAW JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 5.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT SILKEY, ULRIKE SILKEY, DAVID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS COMPLAINANT BRADSHAW, ROBERT AKA BOB BRADSHAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT BRADSHAW, ROBERT AKA BOB BRADSHAW AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT SILKEY, ULRIKE SILKEY, DAVID DOES 1 TO 20, INCL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND FOR JURY FILED BY DEFENDANT BRADSHAW, ROBERT AKA BOB BRADSHAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT BRADSHAW, ROBERT AKA BOB BRADSHAW (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF SILKEY, ULRIKE SILKEY, DAVID SERVED FEB-09-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT BRADSHAW, ROBERT AKA BOB BRADSHAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • WRONGFUL EVICTION, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SILKEY, ULRIKE SILKEY, DAVID AS TO DEFENDANT BRADSHAW, ROBERT AKA BOB BRADSHAW DOES 1 TO 20, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-03-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-02-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-18-2013 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less