This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 02/27/2023 at 05:26:12 (UTC).

TSIFRIN WORKS, LLC VS. PETER GRIFFITH ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/28/2022 TSIFRIN WORKS, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PETER GRIFFITH. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2664

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TSIFRIN WORKS, LLC

Defendants

BOND FASHION CORPORTION, A DELAWARE BUSINESS ENTITY

DOES 1 THROUGH 25, INCLUSIVE

GRAYLOR LLC, A BUSINESS ENTITY

GRIFFITH, PETER INDIVIDUALLY

TAYLOR, CORI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POLLACK, JASON A.

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JASON A. POLLACK

12400 Wilshire Blvd., Ste. 800

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant Attorney

CLYDE, HAL MICHAEL

Attorney at PERKINS COIE LLP

3150 Porter Drive

Palo Alto, CA 94304

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF

CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100180663) FILED BY PLAINTIFF TSIFRIN WORKS, LLC AS TO DEFENDANT GRIFFITH, PETER INDIVIDUALLY TAYLOR, CORI BOND FASHION CORPORTION, A DELAWARE BUSINESS ENTITY GRAYLOR LLC, A BUSINESS ENTITY DOES 1 THROUGH 25, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAR-29-2023 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON DEC-27-2022 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAR-06-2023

Civil Case Cover Sheet

CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 100180663) FILED BY PLAINTIFF TSIFRIN WORKS, LLC

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Summons

SUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 100180663) TO PLAINTIFF TSIFRIN WORKS, LLC

CORI TAYLOR?S ANSWER AND DEFENSES

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 68586384) FILED BY DEFENDANT TAYLOR, CORI

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF DEFENDANT CORI TAYLOR'S ANSWER AND DEFENSES (TRANSACTION ID # 68586384) FILED BY DEFENDANT TAYLOR, CORI

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2023
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount: $435; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: W2222C20F006

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF DEFENDANT CORI TAYLOR'S ANSWER AND DEFENSES (TRANSACTION ID # 68586384) FILED BY DEFENDANT TAYLOR, CORI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 68586384) FILED BY DEFENDANT TAYLOR, CORI; Fee: $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 100180663) TO PLAINTIFF TSIFRIN WORKS, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount: $435; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: R4122B03F009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 100180663) FILED BY PLAINTIFF TSIFRIN WORKS, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100180663) FILED BY PLAINTIFF TSIFRIN WORKS, LLC AS TO DEFENDANT GRIFFITH, PETER INDIVIDUALLY TAYLOR, CORI BOND FASHION CORPORTION, A DELAWARE BUSINESS ENTITY GRAYLOR LLC, A BUSINESS ENTITY DOES 1 THROUGH 25, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAR-29-2023 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON DEC-27-2022 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAR-06-2023; Fee: $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less