Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/10/2016 at 03:43:34 (UTC).

TOWN OF HILLSBOROUGH, A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPALITY VS. CALIFORNIA PUBLIC UTILITIES COMMISSION, A et al

Case Summary

On 12/12/2012 TOWN OF HILLSBOROUGH, A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPALITY filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against CALIFORNIA PUBLIC UTILITIES COMMISSION, A. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2661

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TOWN OF HILLSBOROUGH, A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPALITY

Respondents

PEEVEY, MICHAEL A CALIFORNIA RESIDENT

FLORIO, MICHAEL PETER A CALIFORNIA RESIDENT

CROWN CASTLE NG WEST INC.

FERRON, MICHAEL A CALIFORNIA RESIDENT

SIMON, TIMOTHY ALAN A CALIFORNIA RESIDENT

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC UTILITIES COMMISSION, A CALIFORNIA PUBLIC UTILITY

SANDOVAL, CATHERINE A CALIFORNIA RESIDENT

DOES 1 TO 20, INCL.

Interested Parties

DOES 21 TO 40, INCL.

NEWPATH NETWORKS LLC, A NEW JERSEY LIMITED COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HUDAK, MARK DANIEL

Attorney at CARR MCCLELLAN INGERSOLI THOMPSON& HORN A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION

216 Park Road, P.O.Box 513

Burlingame, CA 94011-0513

Interested Party Attorney

SHONAFELT, MICHAEL W.

Attorney at NEWMEYER & DILLION LLP

895 Dove St, 5Th Floor

Newport Beach, CA 92660

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE/ PROHIBITION/ CERTIFICATION

PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE/ PROHIBITION/ CERTIFICATION FILED BY PETITIONER TOWN OF HILLSBOROUGH, A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPALITY AS TO RESPONDENT CALIFORNIA PUBLIC UTILITIES COMMISSION, A CALIFORNIA PUBLIC UTILITY PEEVEY, MICHAEL A CALIFORNIA RESIDENT SIMON, TIMOTHY ALAN A CALIFORNIA RESIDENT FLORIO, MICHAEL PETER A CALIFORNIA RESIDENT SANDOVAL, CATHERINE A CALIFORNIA RESIDENT FERRON, MICHAEL A CALIFORNIA RESIDENT DOES 1 TO 20, INCL. JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:EXEMPT)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PETITIONER TOWN OF HILLSBOROUGH, A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPALITY SERVED DEC-17-2012, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON RESPONDENT CALIFORNIA PUBLIC UTILITIES COMMISSION, A CALIFORNIA PUBLIC UTILITY

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PETITIONER TOWN OF HILLSBOROUGH, A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPALITY SERVED DEC-14-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON REAL PARTY IN INTEREST NEWPATH NETWORKS LLC, A NEW JERSEY LIMITED COMPANY

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PETITIONER TOWN OF HILLSBOROUGH, A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPALITY SERVED DEC-20-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON RESPONDENT CALIFORNIA PUBLIC UTILITIES COMMISSION, A CALIFORNIA PUBLIC UTILITY

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PETITIONER TOWN OF HILLSBOROUGH, A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPALITY SERVED DEC-14-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON RESPONDENT CROWN CASTLE NG WEST INC.

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE/ PROHIBITION/ CERTIFICATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2013
  • LAW AND MOTION, 302, NO APPEARANCE ON THIS MATTER. THE COURT ADOPTED ITS TENTATIVE RULING. REAL PARTY IN INTEREST NEWPATH NETWORKS LLC'S DEMURRER TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE/ PROHIBITION/ CERTIFICATION IS OFF CALENDAR BECAUSE THE CASE WAS DISMISSED. JUDGE: MARLA J. MILLER; CLERK: GINA GONZALES; COURT REPORTER: ANTHONY C. VAUGHN, CSR # 6185

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • MINI MINUTES FOR MAR-18-2013 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE/ PROHIBITION/ CERTIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2013
  • LAW AND MOTION 302, REAL PARTIES IN INTEREST NEWPATH NETWORKS LLC & CROWN CASTLE WEST, INC'S DEMURRER TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE/ PROHIBITION/ CERTIFICATION IS CONTINUED TO MARCH 8, 2013 PER AGREEMENT OF PARTIES. JUDGE: PETER J. BUSCH, CLERK: LESLEY FISCELLA, NOT REPORTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2013
  • MINI MINUTES FOR FEB-14-2013 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2013
  • NOTICE OF NON-OPPOS TO DEMURRER OF REAL PARTIES-IN-INTEREST FILED BY REAL PARTY IN INTEREST NEWPATH NETWORKS LLC, A NEW JERSEY LIMITED COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2013
  • COURT REPORTING SERVICES LESS THAN 1 HOUR FILED BY REAL PARTY IN INTEREST NEWPATH NETWORKS LLC, A NEW JERSEY LIMITED COMPANY (Fee:30.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2013
  • DEMURRER TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE/ PROHIBITION/ CERTIFICATION, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY REAL PARTY IN INTEREST NEWPATH NETWORKS LLC, A NEW JERSEY LIMITED COMPANY HEARING SET FOR FEB-14-2013 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PETITIONER TOWN OF HILLSBOROUGH, A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPALITY SERVED DEC-14-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON RESPONDENT CROWN CASTLE NG WEST INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PETITIONER TOWN OF HILLSBOROUGH, A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPALITY SERVED DEC-20-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON RESPONDENT CALIFORNIA PUBLIC UTILITIES COMMISSION, A CALIFORNIA PUBLIC UTILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PETITIONER TOWN OF HILLSBOROUGH, A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPALITY SERVED DEC-14-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON REAL PARTY IN INTEREST NEWPATH NETWORKS LLC, A NEW JERSEY LIMITED COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PETITIONER TOWN OF HILLSBOROUGH, A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPALITY SERVED DEC-17-2012, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON RESPONDENT CALIFORNIA PUBLIC UTILITIES COMMISSION, A CALIFORNIA PUBLIC UTILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE/ PROHIBITION/ CERTIFICATION FILED BY PETITIONER TOWN OF HILLSBOROUGH, A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPALITY AS TO RESPONDENT CALIFORNIA PUBLIC UTILITIES COMMISSION, A CALIFORNIA PUBLIC UTILITY PEEVEY, MICHAEL A CALIFORNIA RESIDENT SIMON, TIMOTHY ALAN A CALIFORNIA RESIDENT FLORIO, MICHAEL PETER A CALIFORNIA RESIDENT SANDOVAL, CATHERINE A CALIFORNIA RESIDENT FERRON, MICHAEL A CALIFORNIA RESIDENT DOES 1 TO 20, INCL. JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:EXEMPT)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CROWN CASTLE NG WEST LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where California Public Utilities Commission is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHONAFELT MICHAEL W