This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/10/2016 at 17:41:00 (UTC).

TOTAL OUTDOOR CORP., A DELAWARE CORPORATION VS. POSTING ACCESS REVENUE, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY et al

Case Summary

On 11/29/2011 TOTAL OUTDOOR CORP , A DELAWARE CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against POSTING ACCESS REVENUE, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6205

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

TOTAL OUTDOOR CORP., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

ROES 1 THROUGH 20

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

KEVIN HICKS, AN INDIVIDUAL RESIDING AND DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA

DOES 3-25

ADVERTISING DISPLAY SYSTEMS 1, LLC, A LLLC DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA

PETER PRONGOS, AN INDIVIDUAL OWING PROPERTY IN CALIFORNIA

CATHY GIOUZELIS, AN INDIVIDUAL OWNING PROPERTY IN CALIFORNIA

POSTING ACCESS REVENUE, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA

CHRIS GIOUZELIS , AN INDIVIDUAL OWNING PROPERTY IN CALIFORNIA

REUDY, RAYMOND AN INDIVIDUAL RESIDING AND DOING BUISNESS IN CALIFORNIA

DOE 3 THROUGH 25

DOES 1 TO 25, INCLUSIVE

PANAGIOTA PRONGOS, AN INDIVIDUAL OWNING PROPERTY IN CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

VANAELSTYN, NICHOLAS W

Attorney at BEVERIDGE & DIAMOND, P.C.

456 Montgomery Street, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94104-1251

BAUER, STEVEN M

Attorney at LATHAM & WATKINS

505 Montgomery St, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

QUADRA, JAMES ANDREW

Attorney at QUADRA & COLL LLP

649 Mission St, 5Th Flr

San Francisco, CA 94105

VIGNOLES, NIALL

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF NIALI VIGNOLES

649 Mission St, 5Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

BOWLES, RICHARD THOMAS

Attorney at BOWLES & VERNA LLP

2121 N. California Boulevard, Suite 875

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

 

Court Documents

ORDER

ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO SET ASIDE THE ORDER GRANTING TOTAL OUTDOOR'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND RULING ON SANCTIONS [NO S.A.S.E. - COPY OF ORDER IN DEPT. 501 OUTBOX]

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF NICHOLAS W. VAN AELSTYN IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO SET ASIDE GRANT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF TOTAL OUTDOOR CORP., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

ORDER

ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND TO ALLOW MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT . FILED BY DEFENDANT POSTING ACCESS REVENUE, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA KEVIN HICKS, AN INDIVIDUAL RESIDING AND DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA CHRIS GIOUZELIS , AN INDIVIDUAL OWNING PROPERTY IN CALIFORNIA CATHY GIOUZELIS, AN INDIVIDUAL OWNING PROPERTY IN CALIFORNIA PETER PRONGOS, AN INDIVIDUAL OWING PROPERTY IN CALIFORNIA PANAGIOTA PRONGOS, AN INDIVIDUAL OWNING PROPERTY IN CALIFORNIA REUDY, RAYMOND AN INDIVIDUAL RESIDING AND DOING BUISNESS IN CALIFORNIA ADVERTISING DISPLAY SYSTEMS 1, LLC, A LLLC DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA HEARING SET FOR OCT-08-2014 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 501 (Fee:500.00)

REPLY

REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE ON THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO ALLOW MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DEC OF NIALL VIGNOLES FILED BY DEFENDANT POSTING ACCESS REVENUE, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA KEVIN HICKS, AN INDIVIDUAL RESIDING AND DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA CHRIS GIOUZELIS , AN INDIVIDUAL OWNING PROPERTY IN CALIFORNIA CATHY GIOUZELIS, AN INDIVIDUAL OWNING PROPERTY IN CALIFORNIA

ORDER

ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (SEE SCANNED ORDER FOR DETAILS)

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF TOTAL OUTDOOR'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (PREVAILING PARTY IS ORDERED TO SERVE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER)(COPY PLACED IN D501'S OUTBOX)

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION SHORTENING TIME BEFORE TRIAL WITHIN WHICH ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT CAN BE HEARD PLAINTIFF MUST SERVE NOTICE - 12//13/13; PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - 02/26/14 AT 9:30AM IN D501; OPPOSITION AND REPLY DUE PER CCP.

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF TOTAL OUTDOOR CORP., A DELAWARE CORPORATION (Fee:60.00)

COMPLAINT

QUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF TOTAL OUTDOOR CORP., A DELAWARE CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT POSTING ACCESS REVENUE, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA KEVIN HICKS, AN INDIVIDUAL RESIDING AND DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA CHRIS GIOUZELIS , AN INDIVIDUAL OWNING PROPERTY IN CALIFORNIA CATHY GIOUZELIS, AN INDIVIDUAL OWNING PROPERTY IN CALIFORNIA PETER PRONGOS, AN INDIVIDUAL OWING PROPERTY IN CALIFORNIA PANAGIOTA PRONGOS, AN INDIVIDUAL OWNING PROPERTY IN CALIFORNIA DOES 1 TO 25, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-27-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JAN-30-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON APR-12-2012 (Fee:410.00)

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR TRO; DECLARATION ROGER ROCHA, CHRISTOPHER T. DAUGHERTY, JESSE HENRY ZACHARY M. NORRIS IN SUPPORT, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY PLAINTIFF TOTAL OUTDOOR CORP., A DELAWARE CORPORATION (Fee:40.00)

ORDER

ORDER - TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF TOTAL OUTDOOR CORP., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF TOTAL OUTDOOR CORP., A DELAWARE CORPORATION SERVED DEC-08-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT CATHY GIOUZELIS, AN INDIVIDUAL OWNING PROPERTY IN CALIFORNIA

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF TOTAL OUTDOOR CORP., A DELAWARE CORPORATION SERVED DEC-09-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT PANAGIOTA PRONGOS, AN INDIVIDUAL OWNING PROPERTY IN CALIFORNIA

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF TOTAL OUTDOOR CORP., A DELAWARE CORPORATION SERVED DEC-07-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT PETER PRONGOS, AN INDIVIDUAL OWING PROPERTY IN CALIFORNIA

MOTION (CIVIL GENERIC)

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATIONS OF NICHOLAS W. VAN AELSTYN AND CHRISTOPHER T. DAUGHERTY IN SUPPORT AND PROOF OF SERVICER FILED BY PLAINTIFF TOTAL OUTDOOR CORP., A DELAWARE CORPORATION HEARING SET FOR JAN-11-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:40.00)

110 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2015
  • REMOVED FROM SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR JAN-27-2015 - NOT HELD AND REMOVED. (0.5)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 56631352) FILED BY PLAINTIFF TOTAL OUTDOOR CORP., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2015
  • MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR FEB-02-2015 VACATED. DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED ON 1/7/15. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 56566925)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR JAN-27-2015 AT 1:00 PM IN DEPT. 210 WITH CONFERENCE OFFICER KATHY GALLO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 56468153) FILED BY PLAINTIFF TOTAL OUTDOOR CORP., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2014
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME BEFORE WHICH PLAINTIFF MAY FILE ITS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF TOTAL OUTDOOR CORP., A DELAWARE CORPORATION (Fee:60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (SEE SCANNED ORDER FOR DETAILS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2014
  • REAL PROPERTY/HOUSING MOTION 501, DEFENDANTS POSTING ACCESS REVENUE, LLC, KEVIN HICKS, CHRIS GIOUZELIS, CATHY GIOUZELIS, PETER PRONGOS, PANAGIOTA PRONGOS, RAYMOND REUDY, ADVERTISING DISPLAY SYSTEMS 1, LLC'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT IS DENIED WITH PREJUDICE. MOVING PARTY FAILED TO COMPLY WITH CRC 3.1324(B). ORDER IS SIGNED IN OPEN COURT. JUDGE RONALD E. QUIDACHAY, CLERK: M. OLOPERNES, REPORTER DAVID DISBROW, CSR #7768, (415-298-1538).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2014
  • MINI MINUTES FOR DEC-09-2014 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 501

    Read MoreRead Less
282 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATIONS OF NICHOLAS W. VAN AELSTYN AND CHRISTOPHER T. DAUGHERTY IN SUPPORT AND PROOF OF SERVICER FILED BY PLAINTIFF TOTAL OUTDOOR CORP., A DELAWARE CORPORATION HEARING SET FOR JAN-11-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2011
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF TOTAL OUTDOOR CORP., A DELAWARE CORPORATION SERVED DEC-02-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT CATHY GIOUZELIS, AN INDIVIDUAL OWNING PROPERTY IN CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF TOTAL OUTDOOR CORP., A DELAWARE CORPORATION SERVED DEC-07-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT PETER PRONGOS, AN INDIVIDUAL OWING PROPERTY IN CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF TOTAL OUTDOOR CORP., A DELAWARE CORPORATION SERVED DEC-09-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT PANAGIOTA PRONGOS, AN INDIVIDUAL OWNING PROPERTY IN CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF TOTAL OUTDOOR CORP., A DELAWARE CORPORATION SERVED DEC-08-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT CATHY GIOUZELIS, AN INDIVIDUAL OWNING PROPERTY IN CALIFORNIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF TOTAL OUTDOOR CORP., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER - TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR TRO; DECLARATION ROGER ROCHA, CHRISTOPHER T. DAUGHERTY, JESSE HENRY ZACHARY M. NORRIS IN SUPPORT, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY PLAINTIFF TOTAL OUTDOOR CORP., A DELAWARE CORPORATION (Fee:40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • QUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF TOTAL OUTDOOR CORP., A DELAWARE CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT POSTING ACCESS REVENUE, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA KEVIN HICKS, AN INDIVIDUAL RESIDING AND DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA CHRIS GIOUZELIS , AN INDIVIDUAL OWNING PROPERTY IN CALIFORNIA CATHY GIOUZELIS, AN INDIVIDUAL OWNING PROPERTY IN CALIFORNIA PETER PRONGOS, AN INDIVIDUAL OWING PROPERTY IN CALIFORNIA PANAGIOTA PRONGOS, AN INDIVIDUAL OWNING PROPERTY IN CALIFORNIA DOES 1 TO 25, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-27-2012 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JAN-30-2012 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON APR-12-2012 (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******6205
Case Title:TOTAL OUTDOOR CORP., A DELAWARE CORPORATION VS. POSTING ACCESS REVENUE, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY et al
Court Date:OCT-08-2014 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION TO STRIKE 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT
Rulings:Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for Wednesday, October 8, 2014, line 1. DEFENDANTs POSTING ACCESS REVENUE, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY, KEVIN HICKS, CHRIS GIOUZELIS, CATHY GIOUZELIS, PETER PRONGOS, PANAGIOTA PRONGOS, RAYMOND REUDY and ADVERTISING DISPLAY SYSTEMS 1, LLC's MOTION TO STRIKE 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINTContinued to October 16, 2014 on Court's own motion. = (501/REQ)


Case Number:*******6205
Case Title:TOTAL OUTDOOR CORP., A DELAWARE CORPORATION VS. POSTING ACCESS REVENUE, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY et al
Court Date:MAY-23-2014 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Ntc Of Motion And Motion For Leave To File Third Amended Complaint
Rulings:Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for Friday, May 23, 2014, Line 2:PLAINTIFF TOTAL OUTDOOR CORPORATION's Motion For Leave To File Third Amended Complaint:Continued to June 16, 2014 on Court's own motion. = (501/REQ)


Case Number:*******6205
Case Title:TOTAL OUTDOOR CORP., A DELAWARE CORPORATION VS. POSTING ACCESS REVENUE, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY et al
Court Date:DEC-12-2013 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Defendant Kevin Hick'S Motion To Quash The Deposition Subpoena Of Diana Hicks, Or, In The Alternative, Motion For Protective Order; And Request For Monetary Sanctions
Rulings:Set for hearing on Thursday, December 12, 2013, Line 8, DEFENDANT KEVIN HICK'S Motion To Quash The Deposition Subpoena Of Diana Hicks, Or, In The Alternative, Motion For Protective Order; And Request For Monetary Sanctions.Pro Tem Judge Arlene Barton, a member of the California State Bar who meets all the requirements set forth in CRC 2.812 to serve as a temporary judge, has been assigned to hear this motion. Prior to the hearing all parties to the motion will be asked to sign a stipulation agreeing that the motion may be heard by the Pro Tem Judge. If all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the hearing will proceed before the Judge Pro Tem who will decide the motion with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. If a party appears by telephone, the stipulation may be signed via fax or consent to sign given by email. If not all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the Pro Tem Judge will hold a hearing on the motion and, based on the papers submitted by the parties and the hearing, issue a report in the nature of a recommendation to the Dept. 302 Judge, who will then decide the motion. If a party does not appear at the hearing, the party will be deemed to have stipulated that the motion will be decided by the Pro Tem Judge with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge.The Pro Tem Judge has issued the following tentative ruling: Kevin Hick's motion for a protective order is denied. Diana Hicks should testify as to matters associated with her role as an employee of the two companies at issue.Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to abarton@mckennalong.com with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. If the tentative ruling is not contested, the parties are deemed to have stipulated to the Pro Tem hearing the motion and the Pro Tem will sign an order confirming the tentative ruling. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing even if the motion is not opposed or the tentative ruling is not contested. =(302/JPT)


Case Number:*******6205
Case Title:TOTAL OUTDOOR CORP., A DELAWARE CORPORATION VS. POSTING ACCESS REVENUE, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY et al
Court Date:NOV-18-2013 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion For Protective Order
Rulings:On calendar for Monday, November 18, 2013, Line 6, PLAINTIFF TOTAL OUTDOOR CORP., A DELAWARE CORPORATION's Motion For Protective OrderGranted as to Special Interrogatories nos. 32 - 35 and 76 through 84 and Requests for Admission nos. 28, 29, 30, 45, 46, and denied as to all other challenged Special Interrogatories and Requests for Admission. Monetary sanctions are denied. The court will not provide a court reporter for this discovery hearing. If any party wishes a reporter, the parties must meet and confer and agree on a single reporter. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order with the name and address of the prevailing party's counsel or the prevailing party if pro per in the top left of the first page of proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing or email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the motion is not opposed or the tentative ruling is not contested. =302/pjb


Case Number:*******6205
Case Title:TOTAL OUTDOOR CORP., A DELAWARE CORPORATION VS. POSTING ACCESS REVENUE, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY et al
Court Date:OCT-31-2013 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion For Protective Order
Rulings:Set for hearing on Thursday, October 31, 2013, Line 3: Plaintiff TOTAL OUTDOOR CORP.'S Motion For Protective OrderPro Tem Judge Nils Rosenquest, a member of the California State Bar who meets all the requirements set forth in CRC 2.812 to serve as a temporary judge, has been assigned to hear this motion. Prior to the hearing all parties to the motion will be asked to sign a stipulation agreeing that the motion may be heard by the Pro Tem Judge. If all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the hearing will proceed before the Judge Pro Tem who will decide the motion with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. If a party appears by telephone, the stipulation may be signed via fax or consent to sign given by email. If not all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the Pro Tem Judge will hold a hearing on the motion and, based on the papers submitted by the parties and the hearing, issue a report in the nature of a recommendation to the Dept. 302 Judge, who will then decide the motion. If a party does not appear at the hearing, the party will be deemed to have stipulated that the motion will be decided by the Pro Tem Judge with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge.The Pro Tem Judge has issued the following tentative ruling: Hearing required. Court requests that the parties meet and confer prior to the hearing and provide the court a list of which RFA's or Special Interrogatories, if any, the parties have agreed will be answered.= (302/JPT)


Case Number:*******6205
Case Title:TOTAL OUTDOOR CORP., A DELAWARE CORPORATION VS. POSTING ACCESS REVENUE, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY et al
Court Date:OCT-15-2012 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR LEAVE TO (Re-Notice) File Second Amended Complaint
Rulings:Matter on calendar for Monday, October 15, 2012, Line 4, PLAINTIFF TOTAL OUTDOOR CORP.'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO (Re-Notice) File Second Amended Complaint.Granted on the condition that the trial date is vacated. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order with the name and address of the prevailing party's counsel or the prevailing party if pro per in the top left of the first page of proposed order which repeats verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing or email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing even if the motion is not opposed or the tentative ruling is not contested. =(302/HEK)


Case Number:*******6205
Case Title:TOTAL OUTDOOR CORP., A DELAWARE CORPORATION VS. POSTING ACCESS REVENUE, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY et al
Court Date:OCT-04-2012 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Moiton For Leave To File Second Amended Complaint Pursuant To Ccp 473
Rulings:Matter on Calendar for Thursday, October 4, 2012, Line 11, PLAINTIFF TOTAL OUTDOOR CORP.'S Motion For Leave To File Second Amended Complaint Pursuant To CCP 473.The motion has been re-noticed for October 15, 2012. =(302/HEK)


Case Number:*******6205
Case Title:TOTAL OUTDOOR CORP., A DELAWARE CORPORATION VS. POSTING ACCESS REVENUE, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY et al
Court Date:APR-24-2012 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion For Nunc Pro Tunc, Or In The Alternative, Modification Of Preliminary Injunction
Rulings:Set for hearing on Tuesday, April 24, 2012, Line 28, DEFENDANTs POSTING ACCESS REVENUE, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY, KEVIN HICKS, AN INDIVIDUAL RESIDING AND DOING, CHRIS GIOUZELIS , AN INDIVIDUAL OWNING PROPERTY IN, CATHY GIOUZELIS, AN INDIVIDUAL OWNING PROPERTY IN, PETER PRONGOS, AN INDIVIDUAL OWING PROPERTY IN, PANAGIOTA PRONGOS, AN INDIVIDUAL OWNING PROPERTY Motion For Nunc Pro Tunc, Or In The Alternative, Modification Of Preliminary Injunction.Both motions are denied. The easement is fairly characterized as an access easement, which can be obtained by prescription, rather than a traditional air and lights easement. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing even if the motion is not opposed or the tentative ruling is not contested. =(302/HEK)


Case Number:*******6205
Case Title:TOTAL OUTDOOR CORP., A DELAWARE CORPORATION VS. POSTING ACCESS REVENUE, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY et al
Court Date:APR-13-2012 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION TO STRIKE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Rulings:On calendar for Friday, April 13, 2012, line 17, DEFENDANT POSTING ACCESS REVENUE, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY, KEVIN HICKS, AN INDIVIDUAL RESIDING AND DOING, CHRIS GIOUZELIS , AN INDIVIDUAL OWNING PROPERTY IN, CATHY GIOUZELIS, AN INDIVIDUAL OWNING PROPERTY IN, PETER PRONGOS, AN INDIVIDUAL OWING PROPERTY IN, PANAGIOTA PRONGOS, AN INDIVIDUAL OWNING PROPERTY MOTION TO STRIKE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT IS Continued on the Court's own motion to April 24, 2012 to be heard by Judge Kahn. =302/HK


Case Number:*******6205
Case Title:TOTAL OUTDOOR CORP., A DELAWARE CORPORATION VS. POSTING ACCESS REVENUE, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY et al
Court Date:FEB-17-2012 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
Rulings:Set for hearing on Friday, February 17, 2012, Line 18, DEFENDANTS POSTING ACCESS REVENUE, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY, KEVIN HICKS, AN INDIVIDUAL RESIDING AND DOING, CHRIS GIOUZELIS , AN INDIVIDUAL OWNING PROPERTY IN, CATHY GIOUZELIS, AN INDIVIDUAL OWNING PROPERTY IN, PETER PRONGOS, AN INDIVIDUAL OWING PROPERTY IN, PANAGIOTA PRONGOS, AN INDIVIDUAL OWNING PROPERTY DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT, Hearing required. At the hearing the court will also issue its ruling on the motion that is under submission. =302/HK


Case Number:*******6205
Case Title:TOTAL OUTDOOR CORP., A DELAWARE CORPORATION VS. POSTING ACCESS REVENUE, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY et al
Court Date:JAN-11-2012 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion For Preliminary Injunction, Memorandum Of Points And Authorities, Declarations Of Nicholas W. Van Aelstyn And Christopher T. Daugherty In Support And Proof Of Servicer
Rulings:Set for hearing on Wednesday, January 11, 2012, Line 20. PLAINTIFF TOTAL OUTDOOR CORP. Motion For Preliminary Injunction. Granted. Plaintiff has shown that it is likely to prevail on its claim for a prescriptive easement. Plaintiff shall post a $10,000 bond. Defendant shall return the $2,500 pursuant to the temporary restraining order. Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to contestdept302tr@sftc.org with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must bring the proposed order to the hearing even if the motion is not opposed or the tentative ruling is not contested. =(302/HEK)