This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 10/18/2023 at 01:01:26 (UTC).

TOSHIA HOLLOWAY VS. ALADDIN ADNAN AWADALLA ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 TOSHIA HOLLOWAY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALADDIN ADNAN AWADALLA. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO and SAMUEL K. FENG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7723

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

SAMUEL K. FENG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOLLOWAY, TOSHIA

Cross Defendants and Defendants

AWADALLA, ALADDIN ADNAN

DOES 1 TO 10

AWADALLA, ALADDIN ADAN

CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

ROES 1 TO 25

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

AWADALLA, ALADDIN ADAN

CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PORTILLO, RICXZZIERY "RICK"

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

DAHM, STEPHEN LEWIS

SIMS, III, HUNTER W.

Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

SIMS, III, HUNTER W.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service By Electronic Mail

PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL RE: SUMMONS X-COMP, CROSS COMPLAINT, ADR (TRANSACTION ID # 68935366) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

Notice of Time and Place of Trial AND Trial Order

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR OCT-16-2023 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON DEC-28-2022 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

CROSS-COMPLAINANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO?S CROSS-COMPLAINT

CROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 68110472) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT AWADALLA, ALADDIN ADNAN ROES 1 TO 25

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF AUG-24-2022 CONTINUED TO OCT-26-2022 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610 FOR STATUS OF DOE AMENDMENT; FOR CROSS COMPLAINANT(S) TO BRING CROSS COMPLAINT(S) AT ISSUE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Request for Dismissal

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100189294)

Summons on Cross Complaint

SUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS-COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100163200) TO CROSS COMPLAINANT AWADALLA, ALADDIN ADAN

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF OCT-26-2022 CONTINUED TO DEC-28-2022 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100163200) FILED BY DEFENDANT AWADALLA, ALADDIN ADAN

Summons Cross-Complaint

SUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 68110318) TO CROSS COMPLAINANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/16/2023

HearingMatter(s): MASTER CALENDAR JURY Off Calendar Sep-26-2023 Vacated; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 206; Judge Name: ANNE-CHRISTINE MASSULLO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

DocketMASTER JURY TRIAL CALENDAR SET FOR OCT-16-2023 VACATED. DISMISSALS ON FILE. (206)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY AWADALLA, ALADDIN ADAN , AND DISMISSAL OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO FILED ON 9-15-22. EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS AND ATTORNEYS' FEES. (TRANSACTION ID # 100208664)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100189294)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL RE: SUMMONS X-COMP, CROSS COMPLAINT, ADR (TRANSACTION ID # 68935366) FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/28/2022

HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Off Calendar Dec-15-2022 Set For Trial On Oct-16-23 At 09:30 A.M. In Dept 206; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/15/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100185261) FILED BY DEFENDANT AWADALLA, ALADDIN ADAN JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 10.0 DAYS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/15/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR OCT-16-2023 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON DEC-28-2022 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2022

FinancialPayment: JURY FEES; Amount: $150; Payment Type: CHECK; Receipt Number: W1522B03J004

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2022

DocketJURY FEES DEPOSITED BY CROSS DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO; Fee: $150.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
05/06/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO CROSS-COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100163200) TO CROSS COMPLAINANT AWADALLA, ALADDIN ADAN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/06/2022

FinancialPayment: CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount: $435; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: R4122506F001

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCROSS COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100163200) FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT AWADALLA, ALADDIN ADAN AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO DOES 1 TO 10

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100163200) FILED BY DEFENDANT AWADALLA, ALADDIN ADAN; Fee: $435.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100158362), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF HOLLOWAY, TOSHIA SERVED MAR-03-2022, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT AWADALLA, ALADDIN ADNAN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 100152742) TO PLAINTIFF HOLLOWAY, TOSHIA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2022

FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount: $435; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: C7122125F048

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 100152742) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HOLLOWAY, TOSHIA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2022
View Court Documents

DocketPERSONAL INJURY/PROPERTY DAMAGE - VEHICLE RELATED, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100152742) FILED BY PLAINTIFF HOLLOWAY, TOSHIA AS TO DEFENDANT AWADALLA, ALADDIN ADNAN DOES 1 TO 10 NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-22-2022 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON MAR-21-2022 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAY-31-2022; Fee: $435.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less