This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 09/05/2019 at 11:40:52 (UTC).

TORRIE SPIKENER ET AL VS. DIGNITY HEALTH (DBA ST. FRANCIS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL)ETAL

Case Summary

On 02/14/2018 TORRIE SPIKENER filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against DIGNITY HEALTH DBA ST FRANCIS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL ETAL. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TERI L. JACKSON, GARRETT L. WONG and ETHAN P. SCHULMAN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4311

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judges

TERI L. JACKSON

GARRETT L. WONG

ETHAN P. SCHULMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MABREY, GENE

SPIKENER, TORRIE

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 40

ODEH, KHALID

ELLIS, CHANDRA

VAN SCHAIK, SANDRIJIN

DATAR, SANJEEV

DIGNITY HEALTH DBA ST. FRANCIS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL

ODEH, DR. KHALID

DATAR, DR. SANJEEV

ELLIS, DR. CHANDRA

VAN SCHAIK, DR. SANDRIJIN

ODEH, M.D., KHALID

THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEEDS, NATHANIEL M.

Attorney at MITCHELL LEEDS, LLP

1000 Fourth St Ste 750

San Rafael, CA 94901

Defendant Attorneys

MADDEN, ELISABETH ANN

Attorney at LYNCH, GILARDI & GRUMMER

170 Columbus Avenue, 5Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94133

ENOCHIAN, STEVEN R

Attorney at LOW MCKINLEY BALERIA & SALENKO, LLP

2175 N. California Blvd., Ste 500

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

WILLOUGHBY, ROBERT S.

Attorney at HASSARD BONNINGTON LLP

275 Battery Street, Suite 1600

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SUBSTITUTE "THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA" FOR DEFENDANT PREVIOUSLY NAMED AS "DOE 21" (TRANSACTION ID # 62262362) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SPIKENER, TORRIE MABREY, GENE

Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Defendant Chandra E

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CHANDRA ELLIS, M.D.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 63269978) FILED BY DEFENDANT ELLIS, CHANDRA

Defendant Chandra Ellis, M.D.s Motion for Summary Judgment

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 63269978) FILED BY DEFENDANT ELLIS, CHANDRA HEARING SET FOR AUG-01-2019 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302

NOTICE OF DEFENDANT THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIAS MOTIO

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 63138944) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA HEARING SET FOR JUN-26-2019 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302

Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts In Support of Defendan

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CHANDRA ELLIS, M.D.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 63269978) FILED BY DEFENDANT ELLIS, CHANDRA

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT THE REGEN

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 63138944) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDAN

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 63138944) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

DECLARATION OF ROBERT S WILLOUGHBY ESQ IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT THE REG

DECLARATION OF ROBERT S WILLOUGHBY ESQ IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 63138944) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

Declaration of Elisabeth A. Madden In Support of Defendant Chandra Ell

DECLARATION OF ELISABETH A. MADDEN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CHANDRA ELLIS, M.D.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, WITH EXHIBITS A-C (TRANSACTION ID # 63269978) FILED BY DEFENDANT ELLIS, CHANDRA

Declaration of Elisabeth A. Madden In Support of Defendant Chandra Ell

DECLARATION OF ELISABETH A. MADDEN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CHANDRA ELLIS, M.D.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AS TO SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION IN COMPLAINT, WITH EXHIBITS A-D (TRANSACTION ID # 63380578) FILED BY DEFENDANT ELLIS, CHANDRA

Reply-Notice of No Opposition In Support of Defendant Chandra Ellis, M

REPLY -NOTICE OF NO OPPOSITION IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CHANDRA ELLIS, M.D. MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AS TO SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION (TRANSACTION ID # 64142068) FILED BY DEFENDANT ELLIS, CHANDRA

Proof of Service

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 100075587) FILED BY DEFENDANT DIGNITY HEALTH DBA ST. FRANCIS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL ODEH, M.D., KHALID

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE BY OVERNIGHT COURRIER (TRANSACTION ID # 64089080) FILED BY DEFENDANT ELLIS, CHANDRA

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 63380578) FILED BY DEFENDANT ELLIS, CHANDRA

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS in support DEFENDANT T

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT DEFENDANT THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIAS MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF PLAINTIFFS SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION FOR NEGLIGENT INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 63384679) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON THE REGENTS MOTION FOR

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 63335146) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

Plaintiffs' Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support

PLAINTIFFS' SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION (TRANSACTION ID # 100078000) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SPIKENER, TORRIE MABREY, GENE

NOTICE OF DEFENDANT THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIAS MOTIO

MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF PLAINTIFFS SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION FOR NEGLIGENT INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 63384679) FILED BY DEFENDANT THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA HEARING SET FOR SEP-03-2019 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302

81 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2019
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B1419729M001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Payment : COURT REPORTER FEES < 1 HOUR; Amount : $30; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B1419626R031

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Payment : MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; Amount : $500; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B1419626S030

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Payment : MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; Payment Type : EXEMPT ; Receipt Number : B5219626S023

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Payment : COURT REPORTER FEES < 1 HOUR; Amount : $30; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B5219626R020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Payment : MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; Amount : $500; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B5219626S019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Payment : MOTION; Payment Type : EXEMPT ; Receipt Number : B5219604M001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Payment : COURT REPORTER FEES < 1 HOUR; Amount : $30; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B5219516R005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Payment : MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Amount : $500; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : B5219516M004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Payment : COURT REPORTER FEES < 1 HOUR; Payment Type : EXEMPT ; Receipt Number : R4919415R005

    Read MoreRead Less
110 More Docket Entries
  • 07/03/2018
  • JURY FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 62202656) DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT DIGNITY HEALTH DBA ST. FRANCIS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL (Fee:$150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUL-18-2018 CONTINUED TO AUG-29-2018 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • JURY FEES (TRANSACTION ID # 100040705) DEPOSITED BY PLAINTIFF SPIKENER, TORRIE MABREY, GENE (Fee:$150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 100040705) FILED BY PLAINTIFF SPIKENER, TORRIE MABREY, GENE JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62151188) FILED BY DEFENDANT ELLIS, CHANDRA JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 15.0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 100038930) FILED BY ATTORNEY ENOCHIAN, STEVEN R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100036731) FILED BY DEFENDANT DIGNITY HEALTH DBA ST. FRANCIS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61852581) FILED BY DEFENDANT ELLIS, CHANDRA (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MALPRACTICE - MEDICAL/DENTAL, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF SPIKENER, TORRIE MABREY, GENE AS TO DEFENDANT DIGNITY HEALTH DBA ST. FRANCIS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL ELLIS, DR. CHANDRA ODEH, DR. KHALID VAN SCHAIK, DR. SANDRIJIN DATAR, DR. SANJEEV DOES 1 TO 40 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-18-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-16-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2018 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.