This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 11/14/2018 at 05:12:39 (UTC).

TOMISLAV CULO VS. ACLARIA CAPITAL, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY

Case Summary

On 05/23/2013 TOMISLAV CULO filed a Labor - Wage Claim lawsuit against ACLARIA CAPITAL, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DONALD SULLIVAN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2999

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wage Claim

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

DONALD SULLIVAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CULO, TOMISLAV

Defendants and Not Classified By Court

ACLARIA CAPITAL, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

BARUA, GAUTAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GROENEVELD, GREG

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF GREG GROENEVELD

220 Montgomery Street Ste 961

San Francisco, CA 94104

LABOR COMMISSIONER, STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney at DEPARTMENT OF INDUSTRIAL RELATIONS; DIVISION OF LABOR STANDARDS ENFORCEMENT

455 Golden Gate Ave, 10Th Floor East

San Francisco, CA 94102

Defendant Attorney

MOORE, ROBERT RORY

Attorney at ALLEN MATKINS LECK GAMBLE MALLORY & NATSIS LLP

Three Embarcadero Center, 12Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 941114074

 

Court Documents

LABOR JUDGMENT

UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF CULO, TOMISLAV RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT ACLARIA CAPITAL, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY $126,977.72 PRINCIPAL, $679.43 INTEREST, $410.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $128,067.15, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

DECLARATION

DECLARATION OF GREG GROENEVELD IN SUPPORT OF OEX OF THIRD PERSON PER CCP 708.120 FILED BY PLAINTIFF CULO, TOMISLAV

ORDER OF EXAMINATION ISSUED

ORDER OF EXAMINATION ISSUED FILED BY PLAINTIFF CULO, TOMISLAV AS TO THIRD PARTY BARUA, GAUTAM OEX HEARING SET FOR SEP-05-2013 AT 02:00 PM IN DEPT 514 (Fee:60.00)

ORDER OF EXAMINATION ISSUED

ORDER OF EXAMINATION ISSUED FILED BY PLAINTIFF CULO, TOMISLAV AS TO DEFENDANT ACLARIA CAPITAL, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY OEX HEARING SET FOR SEP-05-2013 AT 02:00 PM IN DEPT 514 (Fee:60.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF (GENERIC)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT JUDGMENT DEBTOR, CIVIL SUBPOENA (DUCES TECUM) FOR PERSONAL APPEARANCE AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION, AND THINGS AT TRIAL OR HEARING AND DEC, ATTACHMENT 1 FILED BY PLAINTIFF CULO, TOMISLAV SERVED OCT-17-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT BARUA, GAUTAM

PROOF OF SERVICE OF (GENERIC)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT THIRD PERSON, WITNESS FEE OF $5.88, CIVIL SUBPOENA (DUCES TECUM) FOR PERSONAL APPEARANCE AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION, AND THINGS AT TRIAL OR HEARING AND DECLARATION, ATTACHMENT 1, DEC OF GREG GROENEVELD IN SUPPORT OF ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF 3RD PERSON FILED BY PLAINTIFF CULO, TOMISLAV SERVED OCT-17-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT BARUA, GAUTAM

STIPULATION

STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DATE OF ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION AND SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM FILED BY ACLARIA CAPITAL, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY CULO, TOMISLAV (Fee:450.00)

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: GROENEVELD, GREG SUBSTITUTED FOR LABOR COMMISSIONER, STATE OF CALIFORNIA AS ATTORNEY FOR CULO, TOMISLAV

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2013
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W3613B05F002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • Payment : ORDER OF EXAMINATION; Payment Type : NO FEE; Receipt Number : W2113829O021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • Payment : ORDER OF EXAMINATION; Payment Type : NO FEE; Receipt Number : W2113829O020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2013
  • Payment : ORDER OF EXAMINATION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W1513726O011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2013
  • Payment : ORDER OF EXAMINATION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W1513726O010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • Payment : ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT; Amount : $25; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W2213717A005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2013
  • ORDER OF EXAMINATION NOV-14-2013 DISCHARGED WITHOUT COSTS PER LOCAL RULE 8.9 (E) AS TO DEFENDANT GAUTAM BARUA, AS AN OFFICER OF ACLARIA CAPITAL, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY. NO APPEARANCE. PROCEEDINGS NOT REPORTED. (514)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2013
  • ORDER OF EXAMINATION NOV-14-2013 DISCHARGED WITHOTU COSTS PER LOCAL RULE 8.9 (E) AS TO DEFENDANT GAUTAM BARUA, AN INDIVIDUAL. NO APPEARANCE. PROCEEDINGS NOT REPORTED. (514)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: GROENEVELD, GREG SUBSTITUTED FOR LABOR COMMISSIONER, STATE OF CALIFORNIA AS ATTORNEY FOR CULO, TOMISLAV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2013
  • ORDER FOR EXAMINATION AS TO DEFENDANT GAUTAM BARUA, AS AN OFFICER OF ACLARIA CAPITAL, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ON NOV-05-2013 CONTINUED TO NOV-14-2013 AT 2:00 PM IN DEPT. 514 BY STIPULATION OF PARTIES FILED ON NOV. 5, 2013. PROCEEDINGS NOT REPORTED. (514)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/05/2013
  • ORDER OF EXAMINATION SEP-05-2013 DISCHARGED WITHOUT COSTS AS TO DEFENDANT GAUTAM BARUA, AS AN OFFICER OF ACLARIA CAPITAL, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. NO APPEARANCE NOR PROOF OF SERVICE ON FILE. PROCEEDINGS NOT REPORTED. (514)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2013
  • ORDER OF EXAMINATION SEP-05-2013 DISCHARGED WITHOUT COSTS AS TO DEFENDANT GAUTAM BARUA, PER LOCAL RULE 8.9 (E). NO APPEARANCE NOR PROOF OF SERVICE ON FILE. PROCEEDINGS NOT REPORTED. (514)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • ORDER OF EXAMINATION ISSUED FILED BY PLAINTIFF CULO, TOMISLAV AS TO DEFENDANT BARUA, GAUTAM OEX HEARING SET FOR NOV-05-2013 AT 02:00 PM IN DEPT 514 (Fee:NO FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • ORDER OF EXAMINATION ISSUED FILED BY PLAINTIFF CULO, TOMISLAV AS TO DEFENDANT ACLARIA CAPITAL, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY OEX HEARING SET FOR NOV-05-2013 AT 02:00 PM IN DEPT 514 (Fee:NO FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER OF EXAMINATION ISSUED FILED BY PLAINTIFF CULO, TOMISLAV AS TO DEFENDANT ACLARIA CAPITAL, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY OEX HEARING SET FOR SEP-05-2013 AT 02:00 PM IN DEPT 514 (Fee:$60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER OF EXAMINATION ISSUED FILED BY PLAINTIFF CULO, TOMISLAV AS TO THIRD PARTY BARUA, GAUTAM OEX HEARING SET FOR SEP-05-2013 AT 02:00 PM IN DEPT 514 (Fee:$60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF GREG GROENEVELD IN SUPPORT OF OEX OF THIRD PERSON PER CCP 708.120 FILED BY PLAINTIFF CULO, TOMISLAV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF CULO, TOMISLAV (Fee:$25.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 585(1) C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF CULO, TOMISLAV RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT ACLARIA CAPITAL, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY $126,977.72 PRINCIPAL, $679.43 INTEREST, $410.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $128,067.15, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2013
  • REQUEST THAT CLERK ENTER JUDGMENT ON FINAL ORDER, DECISION OR AWARD OF THE LABOR COMMISSIONER FILED BY PLAINTIFF CULO, TOMISLAV AS TO DEFENDANT ACLARIA CAPITAL, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED (Fee:$EXEMPT)

    Read MoreRead Less