Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/14/2016 at 08:52:34 (UTC).

TOM CUMMISKEY VS. LENA R. GILBERT

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 TOM CUMMISKEY filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against LENA R GILBERT. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3075

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CUMMISKEY, TOM

Pacifica, CA 94044

Defendant

GILBERT, LENA R.

Springville, IA 52336

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM

THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF CUMMISKEY, TOM IS NOT OWED ANY MONEY BY DEFENDANT GILBERT, LENA R. STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS NO EXHIBITS FILED

ORDER

ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARING FILED BY DEFENDANT IS "APPROVED", AND TRIAL CONTINUED TO MAY-23-2013 AT 3:30 PM DEPT.#506 - PER JUDGE DONALD S. MITCHELL

Notice of Entry of Judgment

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF

MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $3,802.98 FILED BY CUMMISKEY, TOM AS TO DEFENDANT GILBERT, LENA R. ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR MAR-22-2013 AT 03:30 PM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:50.00)

Small Claims - Continue Order

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF MAR-22-2013 - CONTINUED PER REQUEST OF DEFENDANT TO MAY-23-2013 AT 3:30 PM IN DEPT. 506

PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF SERVICE FEE $ 35.00. SERVED FEB-08-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT GILBERT, LENA R.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF CUMMISKEY, TOM IS NOT OWED ANY MONEY BY DEFENDANT GILBERT, LENA R. STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS NO EXHIBITS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF MAY-23-2013 - JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS CALENDAR OF MAY-23-2013 - TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION AS OF MAY-23-2013 BY DONALD S. MITCHELL APPEARANCES BY BOTH PARTIES. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE: DONALD S. MITCHELL. CLERK: M. GOODMAN. NOT REPORTED. (506)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF MAR-22-2013 - CONTINUED PER REQUEST OF DEFENDANT TO MAY-23-2013 AT 3:30 PM IN DEPT. 506

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARING FILED BY DEFENDANT IS "APPROVED", AND TRIAL CONTINUED TO MAY-23-2013 AT 3:30 PM DEPT.#506 - PER JUDGE DONALD S. MITCHELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2013
  • REQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARING FILED BY DEFENDANT GILBERT, LENA R. (Fee:10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF SERVICE FEE $ 35.00. SERVED FEB-08-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT GILBERT, LENA R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $3,802.98 FILED BY CUMMISKEY, TOM AS TO DEFENDANT GILBERT, LENA R. ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR MAR-22-2013 AT 03:30 PM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:50.00)

    Read MoreRead Less