Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/06/2016 at 06:39:13 (UTC).

TIMOTHY CURTIN et al VS. BANK OF AMERICA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 12/07/2009 TIMOTHY CURTIN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BANK OF AMERICA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5034

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CURTIN, TIMOTHY

Tiburon, CA 94920

TREASURE, CAROL

Tiburon, CA 94920

Defendants

LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING, LP

LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DOES 1 TO 25

BANK OF AMERICA

BANK OF AMERICA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

LENNAR MARE ISLAND LLC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

UNIVERSAL AMERICAN MORTGAGE COMPANY

LENNAR CORPORATION

Other

DEBENE, LINDA ( JAMES AS REFEREE)

Walnut Creek, CA 94597

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

PETERS, WILLIAM JOHN

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLPEMBARCADERO CENTER WEST

275 Battery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

POWELL, DAVID CARLYLE

Attorney at REED SMITH LLP

101 Second Street, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CURTIN, TIMOTHY TREASURE, CAROL SERVED DEC-08-2009, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE DEC-18-2009 ON DEFENDANT LENNAR MARE ISLAND LLC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CURTIN, TIMOTHY TREASURE, CAROL SERVED DEC-08-2009, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE DEC-18-2009 ON DEFENDANT LENNAR CORPORATION

COMPLAINT

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CURTIN, TIMOTHY TREASURE, CAROL AS TO DEFENDANT LENNAR MARE ISLAND LLC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION LENNAR CORPORATION BANK OF AMERICA LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING (LENNAR DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR) SEVERANCE

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAY-07-2010 CONTINUED TO JUN-18-2010 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 212. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-18-2010 CONTINUED TO JUL-30-2010 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 212,. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ORDER

ORDER ON STIPULATION TO APPOINT JUDICIAL REFEREE

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING SEVERANCE

COMPLAINT

3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CURTIN, TIMOTHY TREASURE, CAROL AS TO DEFENDANT LENNAR MARE ISLAND LLC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION LENNAR CORPORATION LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF SEP-17-2010 CONTINUED TO OCT-29-2010 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 212. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

COMPLAINT

4TH AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CURTIN, TIMOTHY TREASURE, CAROL AS TO DEFENDANT LENNAR MARE ISLAND LLC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION LENNAR CORPORATION LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ANSWER

ANSWER TO 4TH AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION LENNAR MARE ISLAND LLC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION LENNAR CORPORATION

Order to Show Cause - Mediation

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE MEDIATION SET FOR APR-13-2011 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 212. NOTICE SENT BY COURT

Notice of Time and Place of Trial and Mandatory Settlement Conference

NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON JUN-24-2011 AT 3:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT 624. NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR JUL-11-2011 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON DEC-30-2010 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING UNIVERSAL AMERICAN MORTGAGE COMPANY'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT UNIVERSAL AMERICAN MORTGAGE COMPANY

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION LENNAR MARE ISLAND LLC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION LENNAR CORPORATION

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 4TH AMENDED COMPLAINT

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 4TH AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION LENNAR MARE ISLAND LLC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION LENNAR CORPORATION UNIVERSAL AMERICAN MORTGAGE COMPANY

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF JUN-14-2011 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 4TH AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION LENNAR MARE ISLAND LLC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION LENNAR CORPORATION UNIVERSAL AMERICAN MORTGAGE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 4TH AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING, LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2011
  • REMOVED FROM SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE CALENDAR SET FOR SEP-16-2011 - BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2011
  • REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR OCT-03-2011 - BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385 SET FOR JUN-14-2011 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. APR-13-2011 MEDIATION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION LENNAR MARE ISLAND LLC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION LENNAR CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT UNIVERSAL AMERICAN MORTGAGE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING UNIVERSAL AMERICAN MORTGAGE COMPANY'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2011
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED FILED BY DEFENDANT UNIVERSAL AMERICAN MORTGAGE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
111 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2010
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY PRO PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2010
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION FILED BY DEFENDANT LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION LENNAR MARE ISLAND LLC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION LENNAR CORPORATION HEARING SET FOR MAR-18-2010 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2010
  • NOTCIE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE AND AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES;, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION FILED BY DEFENDANT LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION LENNAR MARE ISLAND LLC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION LENNAR CORPORATION HEARING SET FOR MAR-18-2010 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:1150.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2010
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA HEARING SET FOR MAR-10-2010 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CURTIN, TIMOTHY TREASURE, CAROL SERVED DEC-08-2009, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE DEC-18-2009 ON DEFENDANT LENNAR CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CURTIN, TIMOTHY TREASURE, CAROL SERVED DEC-08-2009, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE DEC-18-2009 ON DEFENDANT LENNAR MARE ISLAND LLC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CURTIN, TIMOTHY TREASURE, CAROL SERVED DEC-08-2009, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE DEC-28-2009 ON DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CURTIN, TIMOTHY TREASURE, CAROL SERVED DEC-08-2009, MAIL AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT DATE DEC-18-2009 ON DEFENDANT LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF CURTIN, TIMOTHY TREASURE, CAROL AS TO DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION LENNAR MARE ISLAND LLC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION LENNAR CORPORATION DOES 1 TO 25 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAY-07-2010 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON FEB-05-2010 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON APR-22-2010 (Fee:370.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSAL AMERICAN MORTGAGE CO is a litigant

Latest cases where LENNAR CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where LENNAR HOMES OF CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where BAC Home Loan Servicing, LP is a litigant