This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 05/08/2023 at 17:50:28 (UTC).

THREE EMBARCADERO CENTER VENTURE VS. DRYBAR HOLDINGS LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/28/2022 THREE EMBARCADERO CENTER VENTURE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DRYBAR HOLDINGS LLC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SAMUEL K. FENG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9411

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

SAMUEL K. FENG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THREE EMBARCADERO CENTER VENTURE A CALIFORNIA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP

Defendants

DOE ONE THROUGH DOE TEN, INCLUSIVE

DRYBAR HOLDINGS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

DB HOLDINGS SHOPS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

O'NEAL, MIKAYLA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 67518360) FILED BY PLAINTIFF THREE EMBARCADERO CENTER VENTURE A CALIFORNIA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP AS TO DEFENDANT DRYBAR HOLDINGS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DOE ONE THROUGH DOE TEN, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR SEP-28-2022 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUN-27-2022 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON SEP-06-2022

Civil Case Cover Sheet

CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 67518360) FILED BY PLAINTIFF THREE EMBARCADERO CENTER VENTURE A CALIFORNIA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Summons

SUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 67518360) TO PLAINTIFF THREE EMBARCADERO CENTER VENTURE A CALIFORNIA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR BREACH OF LEASE

1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 67757720) FILED BY PLAINTIFF THREE EMBARCADERO CENTER VENTURE A CALIFORNIA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP AS TO DEFENDANT DOE ONE THROUGH DOE TEN, INCLUSIVE DB HOLDINGS SHOPS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SUMMONS TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 67757720) TO PLAINTIFF THREE EMBARCADERO CENTER VENTURE A CALIFORNIA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 67832589), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF THREE EMBARCADERO CENTER VENTURE A CALIFORNIA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP SERVED JUL-13-2022, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT DB HOLDINGS SHOPS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67920371)

Order That Hearing is Off Calendar

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF SEP-28-2022 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2022
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Off Calendar Sep-12-2022 Off Calendar; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF SEP-28-2022 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67920371)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 67832589), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF THREE EMBARCADERO CENTER VENTURE A CALIFORNIA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP SERVED JUL-13-2022, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT DB HOLDINGS SHOPS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 67757720) TO PLAINTIFF THREE EMBARCADERO CENTER VENTURE A CALIFORNIA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 67757720) FILED BY PLAINTIFF THREE EMBARCADERO CENTER VENTURE A CALIFORNIA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP AS TO DEFENDANT DOE ONE THROUGH DOE TEN, INCLUSIVE DB HOLDINGS SHOPS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 67518360) TO PLAINTIFF THREE EMBARCADERO CENTER VENTURE A CALIFORNIA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • FinancialPayment: CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount: $435; Payment Type: ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number: W1122429F006

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVERSHEET FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 67518360) FILED BY PLAINTIFF THREE EMBARCADERO CENTER VENTURE A CALIFORNIA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 67518360) FILED BY PLAINTIFF THREE EMBARCADERO CENTER VENTURE A CALIFORNIA GENERAL PARTNERSHIP AS TO DEFENDANT DRYBAR HOLDINGS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DOE ONE THROUGH DOE TEN, INCLUSIVE NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR SEP-28-2022 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUN-27-2022 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON SEP-06-2022; Fee: $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less