This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 05/23/2020 at 01:36:29 (UTC).

THOMAS STELMASZYK VS. RIPPLE LABS, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/19/2020 THOMAS STELMASZYK filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against RIPPLE LABS, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GARRETT L. WONG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4488

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

GARRETT L. WONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STELMASZYK, THOMAS

Defendants

DOES 1-10

XRP II, LLC

RIPPLE LABS, INC.

GARLINGHOUSE, BRADLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POGODIN, PAVEL

Attorney at CONSENSUS LAW

5245 Ave. Isla Verde, Suite 302

Carolina, PR 00979

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

SECURITIES/INVESTMENT, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF STELMASZYK, THOMAS AS TO DEFENDANT RIPPLE LABS, INC. XRP II, LLC GARLINGHOUSE, BRADLEY DOES 1-10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-21-2020 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-20-2020 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON SEP-28-2020

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2020
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: GARRETT L. WONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : B1020522F007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSECURITIES/INVESTMENT, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF STELMASZYK, THOMAS AS TO DEFENDANT RIPPLE LABS, INC. XRP II, LLC GARLINGHOUSE, BRADLEY DOES 1-10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCT-21-2020 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-20-2020 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON SEP-28-2020 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******4488
Case Title:THOMAS STELMASZYK VS. RIPPLE LABS, INC. ET AL
Court Date:AUG-05-2020 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Dismiss Under Code Of Civil Procedure Section 418.10
Rulings:Matter on the Law & Motion Calendar for Wednesday, August 5, 2020, Line 11, DEFENDANTS RIPPLE LABS, INC., XRP II, LLC, AND BRADLEY GARLINGHOUSE'S Motion To Dismiss Under Code Of Civil Procedure Section 418.10.Grant. No opposition filed.Counsel for defendants is required to prepare a proposed order which states that the motion was not opposed and must email it to contestdept302tr@sftc.org prior to the hearing. =(302/EPS)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ripple Labs, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Pavel Igor Pogodin