Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/06/2016 at 06:26:00 (UTC).

THOMAS ROBERTS VS. EDUARDO PANIAGUA et al

Case Summary

On 12/01/2009 THOMAS ROBERTS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against EDUARDO PANIAGUA. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4876

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2009

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

ROBERTS, THOMAS

San Francisco, CA 94114

Defendants and Cross Defendants

PRUDENTIAL CALIFORNIA REALTY

DOES 1 TO 10

PANIAGUA CONSTRUCTION INC.

ASTURIAS, ELENA

PANIAGUA, EDUARDO

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ASTURIAS, ELENA

PANIAGUA, EDUARDO

Cross Defendants

ROES 1 THROUGH 20, INCLUSIVE

ROBERTS, THOMAS

San Francisco, CA 94114

PRUDENTIAL CALIFORNIA REALTY

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant, Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

MCREYNOLDS, CARY D.

Attorney at CDM LAW

3380 Deer Hill Road

Lafayette, CA 94549

MCGILL, MICHELE LYNN

PETERSON, PETER KURT

Attorney at PETERSON MARTIN & REYNOLDS LLP

49 Stevenson Street, Tenth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

PONIST, SEAN E

Attorney at PETERSON MARTIN & REYNOLDS LLP

49 Stevenson St, Ste 1075

San Francisco, CA 94105

MEJIA, LUCY BEDOLLA

Attorney at THE MEJIA LAW FIRM, INC.

851 Cherry Avenue, Ste. 27-414

San Bruno, CA 94066

SELLARDS, ROBERT M

Attorney at STUHR & MILLER, LLP

5012 Mission Street

San Francisco, CA 94112

ASTURIAS, ELENA MARIA

 

Court Documents

NOTICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER FILED BY DEFENDANT PANIAGUA, EDUARDO ASTURIAS, ELENA PANIAGUA CONSTRUCTION INC. PRUDENTIAL CALIFORNIA REALTY

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT PANIAGUA, EDUARDO ASTURIAS, ELENA PANIAGUA CONSTRUCTION INC. (Fee:1110.00)

Notice of Time and Place of Trial and Mandatory Settlement Conference

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, COURT TRIAL SET FOR MAR-21-2011 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. NOTICE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON MAR-04-2011 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 303. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order to Show Cause - Mediation

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE MEDIATION SET FOR JAN-26-2011 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 212. NOTICE SENT BY COURT

MINUTES FOR MAR-04-2011 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 303

MINUTES FOR MAR-04-2011 10:30 AM FOR DEPT 303

ORDER

ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF MAY-20-2011 CONTINUED TO AUG-26-2011 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ORDER

ORDER ON PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDATE (A131522, DIV. 5)

MOTION (CIVIL GENERIC)

MTN FOR ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED ANSWR FILED BY DEFENDANT PANIAGUA, EDUARDO ASTURIAS, ELENA PANIAGUA CONSTRUCTION INC. PRUDENTIAL CALIFORNIA REALTY HEARING SET FOR FEB-15-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:40.00)

DECLARATION

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY DEFENDANT PANIAGUA, EDUARDO ASTURIAS, ELENA PANIAGUA CONSTRUCTION INC. PRUDENTIAL CALIFORNIA REALTY

DECLARATION

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FILED BY DEFENDANT PANIAGUA, EDUARDO ASTURIAS, ELENA PANIAGUA CONSTRUCTION INC.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED ANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT PANIAGUA, EDUARDO

MOTION (CIVIL GENERIC)

NTC OF MTN AND MTN TO BE RELIEVE AS COUNSEL FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBERTS, THOMAS HEARING SET FOR MAY-15-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:40.00)

DECLARATION

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTY MTN TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBERTS, THOMAS

MOTION (CIVIL GENERIC)

NTC OF MOTION TO FILE SECOND AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT PANIAGUA, EDUARDO ASTURIAS, ELENA PANIAGUA CONSTRUCTION INC. HEARING SET FOR SEP-25-2012 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:60.00)

ORDER

ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE 2ND AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT

ANSWER

ANSWER TO 2ND AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT ROBERTS, THOMAS

ORDER

ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL PURSUANT TO STIPULATION

71 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF APR-15-2014 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 2ND AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY PANIAGUA, EDUARDO, ASTURIAS, ELENA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2013
  • RETURNED MAIL - FORWARD TIME EXPIRED: OSC RE DISMISSAL (CRC 3.1385) MAILED TO CARY D. MCREYNOLDS COUNSEL FOR X-DEFT PRUDENTIAL CALIFORNIA REALTY; UNABLE TO VERIFY ADDRESS ON 1ST APPEARANCE OF APR-01-2010; SAME ORDER SENT TO MCREYNOLDS ALSO COUNSEL FOR PLTF THOMAS ROBERTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REMOVED FROM MASTER COURT CALENDAR SET FOR APR-15-2013. NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT WAS FILED ON 4/9/13. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON APR-15-2014 AT 10:30 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBERTS, THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: MCREYNOLDS, CARY D. SUBSTITUTED FOR PRO PER AS ATTORNEY FOR ROBERTS, THOMAS ROBERTS, THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2012
  • MASTER COURT CALENDAR SET FOR JAN-22-2013 CONTINUED TO MASTER CALENDAR COURT ON APR-15-2013 AT 9:30 AM IN 206 PER STIPULATED EX PARTE ORDER FILED 12/28/12. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL PURSUANT TO STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO 2ND AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT ROBERTS, THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
142 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2010
  • DEMURRER TO CROSS COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT PRUDENTIAL CALIFORNIA REALTY HEARING SET FOR MAY-05-2010 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 (Fee:410.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT PANIAGUA, EDUARDO ASTURIAS, ELENA SERVED MAR-01-2010, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON ON CROSS DEFENDANT PRUDENTIAL CALIFORNIA REALTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT ROBERTS, THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT PANIAGUA, EDUARDO ASTURIAS, ELENA PANIAGUA CONSTRUCTION INC. (Fee:1110.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT PANIAGUA, EDUARDO ASTURIAS, ELENA AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT ROBERTS, THOMAS DOES 1 TO 10 PRUDENTIAL CALIFORNIA REALTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBERTS, THOMAS SERVED DEC-02-2009, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT PANIAGUA CONSTRUCTION INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBERTS, THOMAS SERVED DEC-02-2009, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT PANIAGUA, EDUARDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBERTS, THOMAS SERVED DEC-02-2009, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT ASTURIAS, ELENA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ROBERTS, THOMAS AS TO DEFENDANT PANIAGUA, EDUARDO ASTURIAS, ELENA PANIAGUA CONSTRUCTION INC. DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-30-2010 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON FEB-01-2010 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON APR-15-2010 (Fee:370.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRUDENTIAL CALIFORNIA REALTY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PETERSON, P. KURT