This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 21:51:06 (UTC).

THOMAS OLSON et al VS. ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (BP) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS et al

Case Summary

On 07/05/2007 THOMAS OLSON filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS BP AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4282

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OLSON, VICTORIA

Defendants

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION

ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST

DANA COMPANIES, LLC FKA DANA CORPORATION

ALTA BUILDING MATERIAL CO.

PACIFIC COAST BUILDING PRODUCTS, INC.

DOES 1-8500; AND SEE ATTACHED LIST

UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY

THE INDUSTRIAL MAINTENANCE ENGINEERING CONTRACTING COMPANY, INC., DBA TIMEC

VACA VALLEY AUTO PARTS

UNOCAL CORPORATION

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

PARKER-HANNIFIN CORP.

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

SCOTT CO. OF CALIFORNIA, ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS THE ALTERNATE ENTITY OF BROADWAY PLUMBING CO., INC. AND BROADWAY MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS, INC.

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

PACIFIC COAST BUILDING PRODUCTS, INC., SUED HEREIN AS DOE 8

HANSON PERMANENTE CEMENT, INC.

FEDERAL SIGNAL CORPORATION

58 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONADIO, DAVID R

Attorney at BRAYTON & PURCELL LLP

222 Rush Landing Road, P.O.Box 6169

Novoto, CA 94948-6169

Defendant Attorneys

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

MCKAGUE, BRETT L

Attorney at MCKAGUE & TONG,LLP

250 Montgomery St., Suite 1100

San Francisco, CA 94104

GILBERT, PETER RAY

Attorney at BERRY & BERRY

2930 Lakeshore Ave

Oakland, CA 94610-3614

VOGL, DAVID ROBERT

Attorney at VOGL AND MEREDITH

456 Montgomery St., 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Other Attorneys

BLACKARD, EUGENE CHARLES

Attorney at ARCHER NORRIS

2033 North Main St., Suite 800, P.O. Box 8035

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

SCHNEIDER, WALTER R

DUFFY, JOSEPH

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKIUS LLP

One Market, Spear Street Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105-1126

MCNEIL, CONSTANCE

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

One Sansome St., Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94104

ROME, HENRY DAVID

Attorney at HOWARD ROME MARTIN & RIDLEY LLP

1775 Woodside Road, Suite 200

Redwood City, CA 94061-3436

SHELDON, CHARLES T

Attorney at SEDGWICK,DETERT,MORAN & ARNOLD LLP

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

MCCALL, MICHAEL T

Attorney at WALSWORTH, FRANKLIN, BEVINS & MCCALL, LLP

601 Montgomery St., 9Th Flr.

San Francisco, CA 94111-2612

CROSBY, THOMAS CARLISLE

Attorney at CROSBY & ROWELL, LLPTHE AMERICAN BAG BUILDING

299 Third Street, Second Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

RIDLEY, SHAWN MICHAEL

Attorney at HOWARD ROME MARTIN & RIDLEY LLP

1775 Woodside Rd, Ste 200

Redwood City, CA 94061-3436

WAH, DOUGLAS GARTH

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD PLLP

1111 Broadway, 10Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94607

FADEFF, JEFFERY JOHN

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM, LLP

351 California Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

KANNETT, MARK SIMON

Attorney at BECHERER, KANNETT & SCHWEITZER

1255 Powell St

Emeryville, CA 94608-2604

SINUNU, JAMES NAJEEB

Attorney at SINUNU BRUNI LLP

333 Pine Street, Suite 400

San Francisco, CA 94104

KUENSTER, JENNIFER A.

Attorney at THELEN LLP

101 Second St., Ste 1800

San Francisco, CA 94105-3606

GAMBINO, MARY ELLEN

Attorney at SCHIFF HARDIN LLP

One Market Spear St Tower, 32Nd Fl

San Francisco, CA 94105

20 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

CBS CORPORATIONS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM - ASBESTOS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16034510) FILED BY DEFENDANT CBS CORPORATION A DELAWARE CORPORATION, FKA VIACOM INC., SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION, A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION, FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 16062953) AS TO DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA PORTLAND CEMENT CO.

Amended Proof of Service for Answer to Complaint for Personal Injury-Asbestos

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE FOR ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY-ASBESTOS (TRANSACTION ID # 17295785) FILED BY DEFENDANT PACIFIC COAST BUILDING PRODUCTS, INC., SUED HEREIN AS DOE 8

Unocals Request for Dismissal

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT , FILED. EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS. (TRANSACTION ID # 19696769) AS TO DEFENDANT UNOCAL CORPORATION

DEFENDANT EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION?S CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.1020 STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO FURTHER RESPOND TO (1) SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, (2) REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE, (3) REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION, SET ONE, AND (4) FORM INTERROGATORY

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS / CRC 3.1020 STMNT IN SUPPORT OF MO TO COMPEL PLTF TO FURTHER RESPOND TO (1) SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, (2) REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE, (3) REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION, SET ONE, AND (4) FORM INTERROGATORY NO. 17.1 (TRANSACTION ID # 25505957) FILED BY DEFENDANT EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION

MOTION TO SUBMIT JURY QUESTIONNAIRE TO JURY VENIRE BEFORE VOIR DIRE (MOTION NO. 1)

MOTION TO SUBMIT JURY QUESTIONNAIRE TO JURY VENIRE BEFORE VOIR DIRE (MOTION NO. 1) (TRANSACTION ID # 28696298) FILED BY DEFENDANT DEERE & COMPANY

MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE VIDEOTAPES, RESEARCH AND ALL OTHER MATERIALS CREATED OR PRODUCED BY WILLIAM E. LONGO, HIS FIRM M.A.S. OR ANYONE ASSOCIATED WITH M.A.S. [MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 13]

MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE VIDEOTAPES, RESEARCH AND ALL OTHER MATERIALS CREATED OR PRODUCED BY WILLIAM E. LONGO, HIS FIRM M.A.S. OR ANYONE ASSOCIATED WITH M.A.S. [MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 13](TRANSACTION ID # 30701832) FILED BY DEFENDANT REPUBLIC SUPPLY COMPANY

Defendant Pacific Coast Building Products, Inc.s Proof of Service of Motions in Limine Nos. 1-30 and Declaration of David A. Firestone

DEFENDANT PACIFIC COAST BUILDING PRODUCTS, INC.S PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTIONS IN LIMINE NOS. 1-30 AND DECLARATION OF DAVID A. FIRESTONE (TRANSACTION ID # 31704851) FILED BY DEFENDANT PACIFIC COAST BUILDING PRODUCTS, INC., SUED HEREIN AS DOE 8

Request for Dismissal as to Defendant Borg-Warner Corporation

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 32277960) AS TO DEFENDANT BORG-WARNER CORPORATION BY ITS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST BORGWARNER MORSE TEC, INC.

Proof of Service

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15822445) FILED BY DEFENDANT UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY

Defendant Stith Chevrolet-Oldsmobiles Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint for Personal Injury and Loss of Consortium - Asbestos; Proof of Service

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 19257347) FILED BY DEFENDANT STITH CHEVROLET-OLDSMOBILE (Fee:335.00)

Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporations Answer to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint for Personal Injury and Loss of Consortium

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 22727247) FILED BY DEFENDANT EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

Request for Dismissal [as to Defendant Lamons Gasket Company only]

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 23252073) AS TO DEFENDANT LAMONS GASKET COMPANY

DECLARATION OF KIMBERLY J. CHU IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE ALL CASES IN BRAYTON GROUP 511 FOR TRIAL

DECLARATION OF KIMBERLY J. CHU IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE ALL CASES IN BRAYTON GROUP 511 FOR TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 27446846) FILED BY PLAINTIFF OLSON, THOMAS OLSON, VICTORIA

MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF ARNOLD BRODY, PH.D. [MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10]

MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF ARNOLD BRODY, PH.D. [MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10](TRANSACTION ID # 30701832) FILED BY DEFENDANT REPUBLIC SUPPLY COMPANY

Motion in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Testimony as to Contents and Composition of Its Products Without Foundation of Personal Knowledge

MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY AS TO CONTENTS AND COMPOSITION OF ITS PRODUCTS WITHOUT FOUNDATION OF PERSONAL KNOWLEDGE (TRANSACTION ID # 31704851) FILED BY DEFENDANT PACIFIC COAST BUILDING PRODUCTS, INC., SUED HEREIN AS DOE 8

Motion in Limine No. 13 to Exclude Evidence of Insurance Coverage of Defendants

MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 13 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF INSURANCE COVERAGE OF DEFENDANTS (TRANSACTION ID # 31704851) FILED BY DEFENDANT PACIFIC COAST BUILDING PRODUCTS, INC., SUED HEREIN AS DOE 8

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE, AS TO VICTORIA OLSON ONLY.

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 56113890) AS TO PLAINTIFF OLSON, VICTORIA

353 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2016
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON FEB-04-2016 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAY-05-2016 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF THE PLAINTIFF. PATRICK CAMPBELL, ESQ. APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. JUDGE: GARRETT WONG; CLERK: JIROQUE; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON DEC-03-2015 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON FEB-04-2016 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, KIMBERLY CHU. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON OCT-01-2015 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON DEC-03-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503, PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF. TIFFANY VIVEROS APPEARING FOR PLAINTIFF. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: JIROQUE; COURT REPORTER: MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON AUG-06-2015 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON OCT-01-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, KIMBERLY CHU, FOR SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAY-07-2015 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON AUG-06-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 56113890) AS TO PLAINTIFF OLSON, VICTORIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2014
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON SEP-04-2014 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAY-07-2015 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 AT THE REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, SHAMIKA K. BAINS. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: EBURA; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2014
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON AUG-07-2014 TO SEP-04-2014 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503, ON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2014
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON FEB-06-2014 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON AUG-07-2014 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 AT THE REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF. JUDGE: TERRI L. JACKSON; CLERK: EBURA; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ALL ALLEGATIONS, IF ANY, RELATED TO EXPOSURE TO ASBESTOS ON OR AFTER DECEMBER 5, 1980 AS TO ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC FORMALLY KNOWN AS ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC. AND HEREBY AMENDS HIS OR HER COMPLAINT(S) ACCORDINGLY (TRANSACTION ID # 54283332)

    Read MoreRead Less
405 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15785118) FILED BY DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15785118) FILED BY DEFENDANT LEHIGH SOUTHWEST CEMENT COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15785093) FILED BY DEFENDANT J.T. THORPE & SON, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15765718) FILED BY DEFENDANT SHELL OIL COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15715900) FILED BY DEFENDANT CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLINATION OF STIPULATION FOR COMMISSIONER AT TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 15661606) FILED BY DEFENDANT BORG-WARNER CORPORATION BY ITS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST BORGWARNER MORSE TEC, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 15661606) FILED BY DEFENDANT BORG-WARNER CORPORATION BY ITS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST BORGWARNER MORSE TEC, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF OLSON, THOMAS OLSON, VICTORIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF OLSON, THOMAS OLSON, VICTORIA AS TO DEFENDANT ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS (BP) AS REFLECTED ON EXHIBITS B-1, C, H, I OTHER ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS DOES 1-8500; AND SEE ATTACHED LIST SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-19-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE INDUSTRIAL MAINTENANCE ENGINEERING CONTRACTING COMPANY, INC., DBA TIMEC is a litigant

Latest cases where Pacific Coast Building Products Inc ind and as successor in interest to Alcal Specialty Contracting Inc et al is a litigant

Latest cases where SCOTT COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant

Latest cases where ALLIS-CHALMERS CORPORATION PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST is a litigant