This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 12/21/2021 at 21:36:25 (UTC).

THOMAS MCGRATH VS. AIRSPACE SYSTEMS, INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/20/2021 THOMAS MCGRATH filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AIRSPACE SYSTEMS, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SAMUEL K. FENG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7217

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

SAMUEL K. FENG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCGRATH, THOMAS

Defendants

AIRSPACE SYSTEMS, INC.

BANGA, JASMINDER SINGH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WIEGEL, ANDREW J.

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Damages Breach of Contract

CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100150234) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MCGRATH, THOMAS AS TO DEFENDANT AIRSPACE SYSTEMS, INC. BANGA, JASMINDER SINGH NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAY-25-2022

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Summons

SUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 100150234) TO PLAINTIFF MCGRATH, THOMAS

 

Docket Entries

05/25/2022

HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: SAMUEL K. FENG

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2021
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED (TRANSACTION ID # 100150234) TO PLAINTIFF MCGRATH, THOMAS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2021

FinancialPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $435; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC ; Receipt Number : C7121C20F032

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 100150234) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MCGRATH, THOMAS AS TO DEFENDANT AIRSPACE SYSTEMS, INC. BANGA, JASMINDER SINGH NO SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET NOT FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MAY-25-2022 (Fee:$435.00)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******7217
Case Title:THOMAS MCGRATH VS. AIRSPACE SYSTEMS, INC. ET AL
Court Date:SEP-15-2022 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES FROM DEFENDANTS TO FORM INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS (PART 2 OF 2 FOR PURPOSES OF ENTRY OF TENTATIVE RULING)
Rulings:Matter on the Discovery Calendar for Thursday, September 15, 2022, Line 7,PLAINTIFF THOMAS MCGRATH's Motion To Compel Further Responses From Defendants To Form Interrogatories And Request For Monetary Sanctions.(Part 2 of 2 for purposes of entry of Tentative Ruling.)For the 9:00 a.m. Discovery calendar, all attorneys and parties are required to appear remotely. Hearings will be conducted by videoconference using Zoom. To appear at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link (DISCOVERY, DEPARTMENT 301 DAILY AT 9:00 A.M.), or dial the corresponding number and use the meeting ID, and password for Department 301. Please note that the Zoom link, meeting ID, and password changed recently. Do not rely on Zoom information from past hearings, and be sure to use the Zoom information currently posted on the court's website.Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to williamclynn@gmail.com with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. If parties have arranged for a court reporter to appear, please include the following in your email: (1) ensure that they are California Certified Shorthand Reporters; (2) the reporter's full contact information [name, CSR number, personal work email, and phone number]. If the reporter is not a California Certified Shorthand Reporter, the transcript cannot be certified for use in California courts. If the tentative ruling is not contested, the parties are deemed to have stipulated to the Pro Tem hearing the motion and the Pro Tem will sign an order confirming the tentative ruling. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must e-mail it to the Judge Pro Tem. =(302/JPT)



Case Number:*******7217
Case Title:THOMAS MCGRATH VS. AIRSPACE SYSTEMS, INC. ET AL
Court Date:AUG-08-2022 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Be Relived As Counsel
Rulings:Set for hearing on Monday, August 8, 2022 Line 9,DEFENDANT AIRSPACE SYSTEMS, INC., JASMINDER BANGA's Motion To Be Relived As Counsel.Hearing required.For the 9:30 a.m. Law & Motion calendar, all attorneys and parties may appear in Department 302 remotely. Remote hearings will be conducted by videoconference using Zoom. To appear remotely at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link, or dial the corresponding phone number.The court no longer provides a court reporter in the Law & Motion Department. Parties may retain their own reporter, who may appear in the courtroom or remotely. A retained reporter must be a California certified court reporter (CSR), for only a CSR's transcript may be used in California courts. If a CSR is being retained, include in your email all of the following: their name, CSR and telephone numbers, and their individual work email address.=(302/RBU)