This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 12/27/2018 at 16:06:15 (UTC).

Thomas F. Murphy Et Al Vs. Rothenberg Ventures Llc Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/13/2018 a Contract - Other Contract case was filed by Thomas F Murphy against Rothenberg Ventures Llc in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4259

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Undetermined

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Teri L. Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Murphy, Thomas F. As Settlor And Trustee Of The Murphy Trust Udt

Murphy, Martina As Settlor And Trustee Of The Murphy Trust Udt

Defendants

Does 1 To 20, Inclusive

First American Title Insurance Company , A Nebraska Corporation

Rothenberg Ventures Llc , A Delaware Limited Liability Company

First American Title Insurance Company

 

Court Documents

First American Title Insurance Company Answer to Complaint

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61923939) FILED BY DEFENDANT FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice of Motion and Motion for Order Discharging Stakeholder and for

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER DISCHARGING STAKEHOLDER AND FOR RELATED ORDERS, MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT, DECLARATION OF L. BRYANT JAQUES, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION (TRANSACTION ID # 61923939) FILED BY DEFENDANT FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY HEARING SET FOR MAY-23-2018 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 501

Case Management Statement of Plaintiffs Murphys

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62191983) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MURPHY, THOMAS F. AS SETTLOR AND TRUSTEE OF THE MURPHY TRUST UDT DATED OCTOBER 3, 2003 MURPHY, MARTINA AS SETTLOR AND TRUSTEE OF THE MURPHY TRUST UDT DATED OCTOBER 3, 2003

Order Setting Case Management Conference

REMOVED FROM MASTER SHORT CAUSE CALENDAR ON NOV-13-2018 - APPEARANCE ONLY BY LEONARD P. MASTROMONACO, ESQ. FOR PLAINTIFFS. ASSIGNED TO CASE MANAGEMENT DEPARTMENT 610 ON FEB-06-2019 AT 10:30 AM FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR ORDER AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: JIROQUE; COURT REPORTER: MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

Notice of Deposit of Funds with the Superior Court

NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF FUNDS WITH THE SUPERIOR COURT (TRANSACTION ID # 62152738) FILED BY DEFENDANT FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

Request for Default against Rothenberg Ventures LLC

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED (TRANSACTION ID # 61881689) AS TO DEFENDANT ROTHENBERG VENTURES LLC , A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED DISCHARGING STAKEHOLDER AND RELATED ORDERS(TRANSACTION ID # 62152738) FILED BY DEFENDANT FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

Proof of Service of summons and Complaint on Rothenberg Ventures LLC

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61754299), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MURPHY, THOMAS F. AS SETTLOR AND TRUSTEE OF THE MURPHY TRUST UDT DATED OCTOBER 3, 2003 MURPHY, MARTINA AS SETTLOR AND TRUSTEE OF THE MURPHY TRUST UDT DATED OCTOBER 3, 2003 SERVED FEB-22-2018, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE FEB-22-2018 AS TO DEFENDANT ROTHENBERG VENTURES LLC , A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Notice of Time and Place of Trial AND Trial Order

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, SHORT CAUSE TRIAL SET FOR NOV-13-2018 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JUL-18-2018 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

ORDER

ORDER DISCHARGING STAKEHOLDER AND RELATED ORDERS

COMPLAINT

CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MURPHY, THOMAS F. AS SETTLOR AND TRUSTEE OF THE MURPHY TRUST UDT DATED OCTOBER 3, 2003 MURPHY, MARTINA AS SETTLOR AND TRUSTEE OF THE MURPHY TRUST UDT DATED OCTOBER 3, 2003 AS TO DEFENDANT ROTHENBERG VENTURES LLC , A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY , A NEBRASKA CORPORATION DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-18-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-16-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2018

NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FIRST AMERICAN TITLE

NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANYS MOTION FOR ORDER DISCHARGING STAKEHOLDER (TRANSACTION ID # 61949612) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MURPHY, THOMAS F. AS SETTLOR AND TRUSTEE OF THE MURPHY TRUST UDT DATED OCTOBER 3, 2003 MURPHY, MARTINA AS SETTLOR AND TRUSTEE OF THE MURPHY TRUST UDT DATED OCTOBER 3, 2003

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Proof of Service of Summons; Complaint; Civil Cover Sheet; Notice to P

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61702464) (TRANSACTION ID # 61702464), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MURPHY, THOMAS F. AS SETTLOR AND TRUSTEE OF THE MURPHY TRUST UDT DATED OCTOBER 3, 2003 MURPHY, MARTINA AS SETTLOR AND TRUSTEE OF THE MURPHY TRUST UDT DATED OCTOBER 3, 2003 SERVED FEB-14-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY , A NEBRASKA CORPORATION

Proof of service of Summons and complaint on First American Title Comp

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61754299), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MURPHY, THOMAS F. AS SETTLOR AND TRUSTEE OF THE MURPHY TRUST UDT DATED OCTOBER 3, 2003 MURPHY, MARTINA AS SETTLOR AND TRUSTEE OF THE MURPHY TRUST UDT DATED OCTOBER 3, 2003 SERVED FEB-14-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY , A NEBRASKA CORPORATION

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2018
  • Payment : OTHER TRUST DEPOSIT; Amount : $49490; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W1618618D009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Payment : MOTION; Amount : $60; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R4718417M003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL FIRST PAPER ANSWER/RESPONSE/PLEADING; Amount : $450; Payment Type : ELECTRONIC; Receipt Number : R4718417F002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Payment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CREDIT CARD; Receipt Number : W1518213F004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REMOVED FROM MASTER SHORT CAUSE CALENDAR ON NOV-13-2018 - APPEARANCE ONLY BY LEONARD P. MASTROMONACO, ESQ. FOR PLAINTIFFS. ASSIGNED TO CASE MANAGEMENT DEPARTMENT 610 ON FEB-06-2019 AT 10:30 AM FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR ORDER AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: JIROQUE; COURT REPORTER: MATTER NOT REPORTED. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, SHORT CAUSE TRIAL SET FOR NOV-13-2018 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON JUL-18-2018 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 62191983) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MURPHY, THOMAS F. AS SETTLOR AND TRUSTEE OF THE MURPHY TRUST UDT DATED OCTOBER 3, 2003 MURPHY, MARTINA AS SETTLOR AND TRUSTEE OF THE MURPHY TRUST UDT DATED OCTOBER 3, 2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED DISCHARGING STAKEHOLDER AND RELATED ORDERS(TRANSACTION ID # 62152738) FILED BY DEFENDANT FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF FUNDS WITH THE SUPERIOR COURT (TRANSACTION ID # 62152738) FILED BY DEFENDANT FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DEPOSIT OF UNDERTAKING, TRAN # W1618618D009, TAG # 035404 DEPOSITED BY DEFENDANT FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY (Fee:$49,490)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2018
  • MINI MINUTES FOR MAY-23-2018 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 501

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANYS MOTION FOR ORDER DISCHARGING STAKEHOLDER (TRANSACTION ID # 61949612) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MURPHY, THOMAS F. AS SETTLOR AND TRUSTEE OF THE MURPHY TRUST UDT DATED OCTOBER 3, 2003 MURPHY, MARTINA AS SETTLOR AND TRUSTEE OF THE MURPHY TRUST UDT DATED OCTOBER 3, 2003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER DISCHARGING STAKEHOLDER AND FOR RELATED ORDERS, MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT, DECLARATION OF L. BRYANT JAQUES, PROOF OF SERVICE, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION (TRANSACTION ID # 61923939) FILED BY DEFENDANT FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY HEARING SET FOR MAY-23-2018 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 501 (Fee:$60.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61923939) FILED BY DEFENDANT FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED (TRANSACTION ID # 61881689) AS TO DEFENDANT ROTHENBERG VENTURES LLC , A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61754299), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MURPHY, THOMAS F. AS SETTLOR AND TRUSTEE OF THE MURPHY TRUST UDT DATED OCTOBER 3, 2003 MURPHY, MARTINA AS SETTLOR AND TRUSTEE OF THE MURPHY TRUST UDT DATED OCTOBER 3, 2003 SERVED FEB-22-2018, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON, MAILING DATE FEB-22-2018 AS TO DEFENDANT ROTHENBERG VENTURES LLC , A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61754299), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MURPHY, THOMAS F. AS SETTLOR AND TRUSTEE OF THE MURPHY TRUST UDT DATED OCTOBER 3, 2003 MURPHY, MARTINA AS SETTLOR AND TRUSTEE OF THE MURPHY TRUST UDT DATED OCTOBER 3, 2003 SERVED FEB-14-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY , A NEBRASKA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 61702464) (TRANSACTION ID # 61702464), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF MURPHY, THOMAS F. AS SETTLOR AND TRUSTEE OF THE MURPHY TRUST UDT DATED OCTOBER 3, 2003 MURPHY, MARTINA AS SETTLOR AND TRUSTEE OF THE MURPHY TRUST UDT DATED OCTOBER 3, 2003 SERVED FEB-14-2018, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY , A NEBRASKA CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CONTRACT/WARRANTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF MURPHY, THOMAS F. AS SETTLOR AND TRUSTEE OF THE MURPHY TRUST UDT DATED OCTOBER 3, 2003 MURPHY, MARTINA AS SETTLOR AND TRUSTEE OF THE MURPHY TRUST UDT DATED OCTOBER 3, 2003 AS TO DEFENDANT ROTHENBERG VENTURES LLC , A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY , A NEBRASKA CORPORATION DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUL-18-2018 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-16-2018 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON JUN-25-2018 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.