This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 08/08/2020 at 01:41:07 (UTC).

THOMAS C. O'KANE ET AL VS. WALGREEN'S INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/07/2020 THOMAS C O'KANE filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against WALGREEN'S INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERI L. JACKSON. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5826

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

TERI L. JACKSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

O'KANE, THOMAS C.

O'KANE, SHARON

Defendants

MAR FAMILY PARTNERSHIP LP

WALGREEN'S INC.

DOES 1 TO 20

LIM FAMILY LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREEN, JAMES P.

335 West Portal Ave.

San Francisco, CA 94127

 

Court Documents

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2021
  • HearingMatter(s): CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 610; Judge Name: TERI L. JACKSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • FinancialPayment : CIVIL COMPLAINT/PETITION/OTHER FIRST PAPER; Amount : $450; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W1320807F010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketQUIET TITLE - REAL PROPERTY, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF O'KANE, THOMAS C. O'KANE, SHARON AS TO DEFENDANT WALGREEN'S INC. LIM FAMILY LP MAR FAMILY PARTNERSHIP LP DOES 1 TO 20 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JAN-06-2021 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON OCT-06-2020 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON DEC-14-2020 (Fee:$450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number:*******5826
Case Title:THOMAS C. O'KANE ET AL VS. WALGREEN'S INC. ET AL
Court Date:OCT-21-2020 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for October, 21, 2020, Line 6, PLAINTIFFS THOMAS O'KANE, SHARON O'KANE MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGSis OFF CALENDAR. Defendants to file Amended Answers pursuant to stipulation no later than noon on October 21, 2020. =(501/CFH)


Case Number:*******5826
Case Title:THOMAS C. O'KANE ET AL VS. WALGREEN'S INC. ET AL
Court Date:NOV-05-2020 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Oder To Show Cause For Issuance Of Preliminary And Permanent Injunction
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for November 5, 2020 line 6.Order To Show Cause For Issuance Of Preliminary And Permanent InjunctionContinued to November 9, 2020 for parties to provide courtesy copies of their respective filings in compliance with SFLR 2.7B. Courtesy copies to be delivered to department 50 1 no later than November 5, 2020 with cover letter reflecting new hearing date. =(501/CFH)


Case Number:*******5826
Case Title:THOMAS C. O'KANE ET AL VS. WALGREEN'S INC. ET AL
Court Date:NOV-09-2020 09:30 AM
Calendar Matter:Order To Show Cause For Issuance Of Preliminary And Permanent Injunction
Rulings:Real Property/Housing Court Law and Motion Calendar for November 9, 2020 line 6.Order To Show Cause For Issuance Of Preliminary And Permanent InjunctionHearing Required. By no later than 8:30 a.m. on November 9, 2020 Defendant to file (a hard courtesy copy to be delivered to department 501) a declaration stating that: (1) appropriate city officials have been contacted and an inspection re: repairs has been scheduled; and (2) all appropriate permits have been obtained or, if no permits have been obtained, state the authority allowing for repairs without permits. Declarations shall be provided by individuals competent to testify on these matters having personal knowledge. Declaration shall not exceed 1 page and shall be limited to the issues listed above. = (501/CFH)


Case Number:*******5826
Case Title:THOMAS C. O'KANE ET AL VS. WALGREEN'S INC. ET AL
Court Date:JUL-28-2021 09:00 AM
Calendar Matter:Notice Of Motion And Motion To Quash Subpeona Duces Tecum Of Records - S.F. Public Utilities Commission
Rulings:Matter on the Discovery Calendar for Wednesday, July 27, 2021, Line 2,PLAINTIFFS THOMAS O'KANE and SHARON O'KANE's Motion To Quash Subpeona Duces Tecum Of Records - S.F. Public Utilities Commission:Pro Tem Judge Paul Renne, a member of the California State Bar who meets all the requirements set forth in CRC 2.812 to serve as a temporary judge, has been assigned to hear this motion. Prior to the hearing all parties to the motion will be asked to sign a stipulation agreeing that the motion may be heard by the Pro Tem Judge. If all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the hearing will proceed before the Judge Pro Tem who will decide the motion with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. If a party appears by telephone, the stipulation may be signed via fax or consent to sign given by email. If not all parties to the motion sign the stipulation, the Pro Tem Judge will hold a hearing on the motion and, based on the papers submitted by the parties and the hearing, issue a report in the nature of a recommendation to the Dept. 302 Judge, who will then decide the motion. If a party does not appear at the hearing, the party will be deemed to have stipulated that the motion will be decided by the Pro Tem Judge with the same authority as a Superior Court Judge. The Pro Tem Judge has issued the following tentative ruling: PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO QUASH THE SUPOENA DUCE TECUM FOR RECORDS - SF PUBLIC UTILITIES COMMISSION IS DENIED. ALTHOUGH IT APPEARS THAT NO SUCH RECORDS EXIST, DEFENDANT IS NOT REQUIRED TO ACCEPT PLAINTIFFS' ASSERTION THAT NO SUCH RECORDS EXIST. BECAUSE OF THE LIMITED SCOPE OF THE REQUESTED DOCUMENTS NO SIGNIFICANT BURDEN IS PLACED ON THE PUC TO RESPOND. THE COURT WILL IMPOSE NO MONETARY SANCTIONS AT THIS TIME. For the 9:00a.m. Discovery calendar, all attorneys and parties are required to appear remotely. Hearings will be conducted by videoconference using Zoom. To appear at the hearing, go to the court's website at sfsuperiorcourt.org under "Online Services," navigate to "Tentative Rulings," and click on the appropriate link (DISCOVERY, DEPT 301 @ 9:00AM), or dial the corresponding phone number.Any party who contests a tentative ruling must send an email to rennepar85@gmail.com with a copy to all other parties by 4pm stating, without argument, the portion(s) of the tentative ruling that the party contests. The subject line of the email shall include the line number, case name and case number. If parties have arranged for a court reporter to appear, please include the following in your email: (1) ensure that they are California Certified Shorthand Reporters; (2) the reporter's full contact information [name, CSR number, personal work email, and phone number]. If the reporter is not a California Certified Shorthand Reporter, the transcript cannot be certified for use in California courts. If the tentative ruling is not contested, the parties are deemed to have stipulated to the Pro Tem hearing the motion and the Pro Tem will sign an order confirming the tentative ruling. The prevailing party is required to prepare a proposed order repeating verbatim the substantive portion of the tentative ruling and must e-mail it to the Judge Pro Tem. =(302/JPT)


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Walgreen Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREEN, JAMES PAUL