This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/21/2016 at 18:43:09 (UTC).

THOMAS ALVA et al VS. AC AND S INC et al

Case Summary

On 02/09/2007 THOMAS ALVA filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AC AND S INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4067

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2007

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALVA, THOMAS

ALVA, THOMAS GEORGE

Defendants

FOUR HUNDRED FIRST DOE THROUGH FIVE HUNDREDTH DOE, INCLUSIVE

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

TAWNY VALDEZ

CRANE CO.

RILEY POWER, INC.

APPLIED INDUSTRIAL TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

WEBTEC CORPORATION, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO WESTINGHOUSE AIR BRAKE TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION

OGLEBAY NORTON COMPANY

CERTAIN-TEED CORPORATION

P-G INDUSTRIES, INC. ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS PRYOR GIGGEY CO.

FOSECO, INC.

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. FKA ALLIED SIGNAL,INC./ THE BENDIX CORP.

SOCO WEST, INC., FORMERLY KNOWN AND SUED HEREIN AS SOCO-LYNCH CORPORATION

EATON CORPORATION, AS SII TO EATON ELECTRICAL INC. AND CUTLER-HAMMER INC., SUED HEREIN AS DOE 18

PACIFIC MECHANICAL CORPORATION

THYSSENKRUPP BUDD COMPANY

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION

69 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLP

275 Battery Street, 20Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

GILL, RAYMOND LAWRENCE

Attorney at K & L GATES LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, Suite 1200

San Francsico, CA 94111

FOLEY, STEPHEN J.

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD, PLLP

300 Lakeside Drive, Suite 1900

Oakland, CA 94612

MURPHY, PAUL DAVID

Attorney at MURPHY ROSEN & MEYLAN LLP

100 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1300

Santa Monica, CA 90401-1142

PRINDLE, KENNETH B

Attorney at PRINDLE, AMARO, GOETZ, HILLYARD, BARNES & REINHOLTZ LLP

310 Gloden Shore, 4Th Floor

Long Beach, CA 90802

RIEHLE, PAUL JEFFREY

Attorney at SEDGWICK, DETERT, MORAN & ARNOLD

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower, 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

RIDLEY, SHAWN MICHAEL

Attorney at HOWARD ROME MARTIN & RIDLEY LLP

1775 Woodside Rd, Ste 200

Redwood City, CA 94061-3436

JACKSON, GABRIEL ANNE

HUGO, EDWARD R

Attorney at BRYDON HUGO & PARKER

135 Main Street, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

SAMSON, IVOR ELIAS

Attorney at SONNENSCHEIN NATH & ROSENTHAL LLP

525 Market Street, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105-2708

Other Attorneys

BLACKARD, EUGENE CHARLES

Attorney at ARCHER NORRIS

2033 North Main Street, Suite 800

Walnut Creek, CA 94596-3759

GLASPY, DAVID MICHAEL

Attorney at GLASPY & GLASPY

One Walnut Creek Center, 100 Pringle Ave, Suite 750

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

BRAINICH, MARC

Attorney at SEDGWICK DETERT MORAN & ARNOLD LLP

One Market Plaza, Steuart Tower, 8Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

AUBERT, GARTH W.

Attorney at FITZPATRICK & HUNT, TUCKER, COLLIER, PAGANO, AUBERT, LLP

633 W. Fifth Street, 60Th Flr

Los Angeles, CA 90071

HUIE, JEREMY D.

Attorney at BASSI, MARTINI, EDLIN & BLUM LLP

351 California St. Ste 200

San Francisco, CA 94104

CATALDO, LORI A.

Attorney at FOLEY & MANSFIELD, PLLP

300 Lakeside Drive, Suite 1900

Oakland, CA 94612

RHOADES, RALPH

Attorney at PARTON SELL

750 Lindaro Street, Suite 140

San Rafael, CA 94901

BERKES, ROBERT H

Attorney at BERKES CRANE ROBINSON & SEAL

515 S Figueroa St Ste 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90071

JUDIN, JENNIFER

Attorney at DEHAY & ELLISTON LLP

1300 Clay Street, Ste 840

Oakland, CA 94612

NYE, BRUCE GRANT

Attorney at ADAMS NYE SINUNU BRUNI BECHT LLP

222 Kearny Street, Seventh Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

28 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.???S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DEFENDANT KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.???S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 14220689) FILED BY DEFENDANT KAISER GYPSUM COMPANY, INC.

Def. THYSSENKRUPP BUDD COMPANYs Demand for Trial by Jury and Estimate of Length of Trial.

DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 18447955) FILED BY DEFENDANT THYSSENKRUPP BUDD COMPANY

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND ESTIMATE OF LENGTH OF TRIAL (TRANSACTION ID # 18594939) FILED BY DEFENDANT FAMILIAN CORPORATION

OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COMMISSIONER HEWLETT

OBJECTION TO STIPULATION OF HEARING BY COMMISSIONER HEWLETT (TRANSACTION ID # 18594939) FILED BY DEFENDANT FAMILIAN CORPORATION

Answer to Complaint-Asbestos

ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 23950347) FILED BY DEFENDANT GRAYBAR ELECTRIC COMPANY, INC. (Fee:365.00)

EXHIBITS B THROUGH D TO THE REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF T H AGRICULTURE & NUTRITIONS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS

EXHIBITS B THROUGH D TO THE REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF T H AGRICULTURE NUTRITIONS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS (TRANSACTION ID # 28723253) FILED BY DEFENDANT T H AGRICULTURE & NUTRITION, LLC

DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATIONS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MO FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES (TRANSACTION ID # 31957923) FILED BY DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION

DECLARATION OF HONG T. LE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

DECLARATION OF HONG T. LE IN SUPPORT OF MO FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES (TRANSACTION ID # 31957923) FILED BY DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION

Request for Dismissal as to Defendant KAISER VENTURES LLC, ONLY

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 34031871) AS TO DEFENDANT KAISER VENTURES LLC

REPLY OF DEFENDANT FOSECO, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO ITS DEMURR

REPLY TO PLTFS' OPPOSITION TO ITS DEMURRER (TRANSACTION ID # 14483816) FILED BY DEFENDANT FOSECO, INC.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO THE 9th (NUISANCE) CAUSE

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT ONLY AS TO THE 9TH (NUISANCE) CAUSE OF ACTION (TRANSACTION ID # 14495540) AS TO DEFENDANT HANSON PERMANENTE CEMENT, INC.

DEFENDANT CRANE CO.S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 18096728) FILED BY DEFENDANT CRANE CO.

BEAZER EAST, INC,S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE SAN FRANCISO SUPERIOR COURT CASES CGC-07-274067, CGC-08-274327, CGC-08-274506 AND CGC-08274766 INTO HAROWITZ GROUP 10 FOR TRIAL PURPOSES - Alva SFSC 274067

OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE SAN FRANCISO SUPERIOR COURT CASES CGC-07-274067, CGC-08-274327, CGC-08-274506 AND CGC-08274766 INTO HAROWITZ GROUP 10 FOR TRIAL PURPOSES - ALVA SFSC 274067 (TRANSACTION ID # 30758484) FILED BY DEFENDANT BEAZER EAST, INC.

DECLARATION OF ROSEANNA M. CASTILLO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC. FKA SQUARE D COMPANY?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS? MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE HAROWITZ GROUP 10

DECLARATION OF ROSEANNA M. CASTILLO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC. FKA SQUARE D COMPANYS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE HAROWITZ GROUP 10 (TRANSACTION ID # 30756817) FILED BY DEFENDANT SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC. FKA SQUARE D COMPANY

Defendant Graybar Electric Company, Inc.s Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 31376271) FILED BY DEFENDANT GRAYBAR ELECTRIC COMPANY, INC. HEARING SET FOR AUG-19-2010 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 220 (Fee:200.00)

DEFENDANT GRINNELL LLCa??S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 32646927) FILED BY DEFENDANT GRINNELL LLC ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS GRINNELL CORPORATION

Beazer East, Inc.s Evidentiary Objections to Evidence Submitted in Plaintiffs Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the alternative, Summary Adjudication

EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED IN PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (TRANSACTION ID # 33970378) FILED BY DEFENDANT BEAZER EAST, INC.

Request for Dismissal as to Def Ingersoll-Rand Co.

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 41902848) AS TO DEFENDANT INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

474 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2014
  • REMOVED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON OCT-02-2014. DISMISSAL FILED ON 9/18/14. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 56054591)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2013
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON OCT-03-2013 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON OCT-02-2014 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER LETTER SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2013
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON SEP-05-2013 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON OCT-03-2013 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503. NO APPEARANCE FOR PLAINTIFF. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED. (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2013
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-07-2013 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON SEP-05-2013 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, ATTY. BRENDEN SULLIVAN. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKON; CLERK: R. VELUZ; MATTER NOT REPORTED (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2013
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON FEB-28-2013 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-07-2013 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 ON THE COURT'S OWN. (206)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2012
  • CONTINUED FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-29-2012 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON FEB-28-2013 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 503 PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF COUNSEL, FOR STATUS OF "INACTIVE CASE." JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED (503)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 41902848) AS TO DEFENDANT INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 40615323) AS TO DEFENDANT METALCLAD INSULATION CORPORATION AS SII TO NORCAL INSULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2011
  • CONTINUED PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL FROM ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON SEP-29-2011 TO ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CALENDAR ON MAR-29-2012 AT 9:45 AM IN DEPT. 503, INACTIVE DOCKET FOR STATUS OF BANKRUPT-DEFENDANT(S) OR FILING OF DISMISSAL. JUDGE: TERI L. JACKSON; CLERK: D. LOK; MATTER NOT REPORTED (220)

    Read MoreRead Less
536 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14065200) FILED BY DEFENDANT DOUGLASS INSULATION COMPANY, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14057626) FILED BY DEFENDANT MODERN PLASTICS, INC. (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 14004849) FILED BY DEFENDANT GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 13974484), PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALVA, THOMAS ALVA, DORINA INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATEOF THOMAS NAVOR ALVA, DECEDENT SERVED FEB-12-2007, MAIL ON DEFENDANT FOSECO, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 13941682) FILED BY DEFENDANT RAPID-AMERICAN CORPORATION (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 13940313) DEFENDANT SUED HEREIN AS FIRST DOE TO BE SOCO-LYNCH CORPORATION, SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO WESTERN CHEMICAL AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2007
  • PRELIMINARY FACT SHEET FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALVA, THOMAS ALVA, DORINA INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATEOF THOMAS NAVOR ALVA, DECEDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • ASBESTOS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALVA, THOMAS ALVA, DORINA INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATEOF THOMAS NAVOR ALVA, DECEDENT AS TO DEFENDANT AC AND S INC AMERICAN ASBESTOS COMPANY A.W.CHESTERTON COMPANY CROWN,CORK & SEAL COMPANY INC DEE ENGINEERING COMPANY FIRST DOE THROUGH THREE HUNDREDTH DOE INCLUSIVE ALL ASBESTOS DEFENDANTS SEE SCANNED DOCUMENTS SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR FEB-20-2008 (Fee:335.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2007
  • OBJECTION TO ASSIGNMENT TO COMMISSIONER FOR TRIAL FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALVA, THOMAS ALVA, DORINA INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE ESTATEOF THOMAS NAVOR ALVA, DECEDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FOSECO, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where APPLIED INDUSTRIAL TECHNOLOGIES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where RAPID AMERICAN CORP is a litigant

Latest cases where Riley Power, Inc. is a litigant