This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 11/22/2021 at 15:25:44 (UTC).

THIEN TRAN VS. BAM TRADING SERVICES INC. DBA BINANCE.US

Case Summary

On 07/29/2021 THIEN TRAN filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against BAM TRADING SERVICES INC DBA BINANCE US. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE TONG. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4618

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE TONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRAN, THIEN

Lodi, CA 95242

Defendant

BAM TRADING SERVICES INC. DBA BINANCE.US ONE LETTERMAN DR. SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94129

 

Court Documents

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF

MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $6,170.03 FILED BY TRAN, THIEN AS TO DEFENDANT BAM TRADING SERVICES INC. DBA BINANCE.US ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR SEP-29-2021 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT 506

PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FEE FOR SERVICE $25.00 SERVED AUG-09-2021, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT BAM TRADING SERVICES INC. DBA BINANCE.US

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

REQUEST TO APPEAR AT HEARING BY ZOOM FILED BY PLAINTIFF TRAN, THIEN

DECLARATION

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST TO APPEAR AT HEARING BY ZOOM FILED BY PLAINTIFF TRAN, THIEN

ORDER

ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO APPEAR AT HEARING BY ZOOM. THE REQUEST IS GRANTED. [HEARING SCHEDULED FOR: SEPT-29-21 AT 10:00AM]

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

SC-109 AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR (STEVEN HUYNH - ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT: BAM TRADING) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAM TRADING SERVICES INC. DBA BINANCE.US

DECLARATION

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST TO APPEAR AT HEARING BY ZOOM FILED BY DEFENDANT BAM TRADING SERVICES INC. DBA BINANCE.US

GENERIC CIVIL FILING (NO FEE)

REQUEST TO APPEAR AT HEARING BY ZOOM (SMALL CLAIMS) (HEARING SET FOR SEPT-29-21 AT 10:00AM) (REQUEST FORWARDED TO DEPT 506 FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW & SIGNATURE.) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAM TRADING SERVICES INC. DBA BINANCE.US

ORDER

ORDER ON DEFENDANT [BAM TRADING] REQUEST TO APPEAR AT HEARING BY ZOOM. THE REQUEST IS GRANTED. [HEARING SET FOR SEP-29-2021 AT 10:00AM]

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE CLAIM HEARING OF SEP-29-2021 OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2021
  • HearingMatter(s): PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM Off Calendar Sep-23-2021 Dismissal Of Entire Action Filed; Location: CIVIC CENTER COURTHOUSE ROOM 506; Judge Name: MICHELLE TONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE CLAIM HEARING OF SEP-29-2021 OFF CALENDAR, DISMISSAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON DEFENDANT [BAM TRADING] REQUEST TO APPEAR AT HEARING BY ZOOM. THE REQUEST IS GRANTED. [HEARING SET FOR SEP-29-2021 AT 10:00AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO APPEAR AT HEARING BY ZOOM (SMALL CLAIMS) (HEARING SET FOR SEPT-29-21 AT 10:00AM) (REQUEST FORWARDED TO DEPT 506 FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW & SIGNATURE.) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAM TRADING SERVICES INC. DBA BINANCE.US

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION RE: REQUEST TO APPEAR AT HEARING BY ZOOM FILED BY DEFENDANT BAM TRADING SERVICES INC. DBA BINANCE.US

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSC-109 AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR (STEVEN HUYNH - ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT: BAM TRADING) FILED BY DEFENDANT BAM TRADING SERVICES INC. DBA BINANCE.US

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO APPEAR AT HEARING BY ZOOM. THE REQUEST IS GRANTED. [HEARING SCHEDULED FOR: SEPT-29-21 AT 10:00AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketREMARK:PLANTIFF'S EXHIBITS RECEIVED AND PLACED WITH CASE FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION RE: REQUEST TO APPEAR AT HEARING BY ZOOM FILED BY PLAINTIFF TRAN, THIEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO APPEAR AT HEARING BY ZOOM FILED BY PLAINTIFF TRAN, THIEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FEE FOR SERVICE $25.00 SERVED AUG-09-2021, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT BAM TRADING SERVICES INC. DBA BINANCE.US

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • FinancialPayment : SMALL CLAIMS > 5000; Amount : $75; Payment Type : CHECK ; Receipt Number : W0521729S001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $6,170.03 FILED BY TRAN, THIEN AS TO DEFENDANT BAM TRADING SERVICES INC. DBA BINANCE.US ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR SEP-29-2021 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:$75.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAM Trading Services Inc. doing business as Binance.US is a litigant