This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 06/24/2019 at 06:47:40 (UTC).

THE SAN FRANCISCO ART INSTITUTE VS. HOPE A. PLESCIA et al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2013 THE SAN FRANCISCO ART INSTITUTE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HOPE A PLESCIA. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8420

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE SAN FRANCISCO ART INSTITUTE

Defendants

PLESCIA, HOPE A.

DOES 1 TO 10, INCL.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HARTLEY, ROBERT

Attorney at HOLLINSLAW ATTORNEYS

2601 Main Street, Penthouse Suite 1300

Irvine, CA 926144239

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF ROBERT A. HARTLEY, IN SUPPORT OF CALCULATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE SAN FRANCISCO ART INSTITUTE

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, COURT JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $264.00 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT PLESCIA, HOPE A.

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF ROBERT A. HARTLEY RE: ATTORNEY'S FEES PURSUANT TO CC 1717.5 FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE SAN FRANCISCO ART INSTITUTE

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $264.00 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT PLESCIA, HOPE A.

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10, INCL.

DEFAULT COURT JUDGMENT - GENERAL

THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF THE SAN FRANCISCO ART INSTITUTE RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT PLESCIA, HOPE A. $5,625.04 PRINCIPAL, $800.00 ATTORNEY FEES, $2,482.48 INTEREST, $264.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $9,171.52, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

DECLARATION

DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT [CCP 585(D)] FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE SAN FRANCISCO ART INSTITUTE

Default Judgment Reject

DEFAULT JUDGMENT REJECTED, PLACED IN PICKUP BOX, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF THE SAN FRANCISCO ART INSTITUTE AS TO DEFENDANT PLESCIA, HOPE A.

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF ROBERT A. HARTLEY RE: ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE SAN FRANCISCO ART INSTITUTE

COMPLAINT

EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE SAN FRANCISCO ART INSTITUTE AS TO DEFENDANT PLESCIA, HOPE A. DOES 1 TO 10, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-31-2013 (Fee:225.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE SAN FRANCISCO ART INSTITUTE SERVED FEB-20-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT PLESCIA, HOPE A.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2013
  • Payment : COMPLAINT/PETITION/FIRST PAPER; Amount : $225; Payment Type : CHECK; Receipt Number : W1213201F008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2014
  • CRC 3.740 REVIEW - JUDGMENT ON FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF THE SAN FRANCISCO ART INSTITUTE RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT PLESCIA, HOPE A. $5,625.04 PRINCIPAL, $800.00 ATTORNEY FEES, $2,482.48 INTEREST, $264.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $9,171.52, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2013
  • CRC 3.740 REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT [CCP \u00a7585(D)] FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE SAN FRANCISCO ART INSTITUTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF ROBERT A. HARTLEY RE: ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE SAN FRANCISCO ART INSTITUTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF ROBERT A. HARTLEY RE: ATTORNEY'S FEES PURSUANT TO CC \u00a71717.5 FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE SAN FRANCISCO ART INSTITUTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF ROBERT A. HARTLEY, IN SUPPORT OF CALCULATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE SAN FRANCISCO ART INSTITUTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 10, INCL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR CLERK'S JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $264.00 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT PLESCIA, HOPE A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • RECEIVED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT, COURT JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE SAN FRANCISCO ART INSTITUTE AS TO DEFENDANT PLESCIA, HOPE A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT REJECTED, PLACED IN PICKUP BOX, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF THE SAN FRANCISCO ART INSTITUTE AS TO DEFENDANT PLESCIA, HOPE A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, COURT JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS, COST BILL $264.00 FILED, CREDIT ACKNOWLEDGED $.00 AS TO DEFENDANT PLESCIA, HOPE A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • RECEIVED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT, COURT JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE SAN FRANCISCO ART INSTITUTE AS TO DEFENDANT PLESCIA, HOPE A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE SAN FRANCISCO ART INSTITUTE SERVED FEB-20-2013, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT PLESCIA, HOPE A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • EXEMPT COLLECTIONS (RULE 3.740), COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE SAN FRANCISCO ART INSTITUTE AS TO DEFENDANT PLESCIA, HOPE A. DOES 1 TO 10, INCL. SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JUL-31-2013 (Fee:$225.00)

    Read MoreRead Less