This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/12/2016 at 19:47:28 (UTC).

THE HARTFORD ACCIDENT & INDEMNITY COMPANY VS. THE GAP, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 11/16/2012 THE HARTFORD ACCIDENT INDEMNITY COMPANY filed a Labor - Wage Claim lawsuit against THE GAP, INC. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, San Francisco County Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6192

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wage Claim

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE HARTFORD ACCIDENT & INDEMNITY COMPANY

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

THE GAP, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

DOES 1 TO 25, INCLUSIVE

AMPCO SYSTEM PARKING

Cross Defendant

ROES 1-20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COLTON, BRIAN

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MELISSA M. BALLARD

1551 North Tustin Avenue, Suite 100

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

DZIESINSKI, KENNETH LEE

Attorney at BRAGG & DZIENSINSKI

275 Battery St Ste 100

San Francisco, CA 94111

WIGGINS, TROY DEAN

Attorney at WIGGINS MARKS ROSENBLATT LLP

351 California Street, Suite 300

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY THE GAP, INC. ON FEB-20-2013

DISMISSAL

DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 25, INCLUSIVE

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF DZIESINSKI, KENNETH LEE ON JUL-18-2013 THROUGH JUL-29-2013 FILED BY DEFENDANT THE GAP, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION

NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE HARTFORD ACCIDENT & INDEMNITY COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT THE GAP, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Notice of Time and Place of Trial

NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR DEC-16-2013 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON APR-17-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME AND MAILING ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY COLTON, BRIAN

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT AMPCO SYSTEM PARKING JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT THE GAP, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

CROSS COMPLAINT

CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT THE GAP, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT ROES 1-20

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT THE GAP, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION (Fee:450.00)

ANSWER

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT AMPCO SYSTEM PARKING (Fee:450.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE HARTFORD ACCIDENT & INDEMNITY COMPANY SERVED NOV-19-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT AMPCO SYSTEM PARKING A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE HARTFORD ACCIDENT & INDEMNITY COMPANY SERVED NOV-19-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT THE GAP, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT

OTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE HARTFORD ACCIDENT & INDEMNITY COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT THE GAP, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION AMPCO SYSTEM PARKING A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1 TO 25, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-17-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JAN-15-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON APR-02-2013 (Fee:450.00)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2013
  • DocketMASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR DEC-16-2013 VACATED. DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED ON 11/7/13. (206)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY THE GAP, INC. ON FEB-20-2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 25, INCLUSIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF DZIESINSKI, KENNETH LEE ON JUL-18-2013 THROUGH JUL-29-2013 FILED BY DEFENDANT THE GAP, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDING ACTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE HARTFORD ACCIDENT & INDEMNITY COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT THE GAP, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF TRIAL, JURY TRIAL SET FOR DEC-16-2013 AT 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 206. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON APR-17-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME AND MAILING ADDRESS FILED BY ATTORNEY COLTON, BRIAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT AMPCO SYSTEM PARKING JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT THE GAP, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION JURY DEMANDED, ESTIMATED TIME FOR TRIAL: 7.0 DAYS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS COMPLAINANT THE GAP, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT ROES 1-20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT THE GAP, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION (Fee:450.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT AMPCO SYSTEM PARKING (Fee:450.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE HARTFORD ACCIDENT & INDEMNITY COMPANY SERVED NOV-19-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT AMPCO SYSTEM PARKING A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE HARTFORD ACCIDENT & INDEMNITY COMPANY SERVED NOV-19-2012, PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANT THE GAP, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER NON EXEMPT COMPLAINTS, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF THE HARTFORD ACCIDENT & INDEMNITY COMPANY AS TO DEFENDANT THE GAP, INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION AMPCO SYSTEM PARKING A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOES 1 TO 25, INCLUSIVE SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR APR-17-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON JAN-15-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON APR-02-2013 (Fee:450.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GAP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ABM PARKING SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where HARTFORD ACCIDENT & INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DZIESINSKI, KENNETH LEE