Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 03/26/2016 at 19:31:46 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF VINCENT GUS GIAMPAOLETTI

Case Summary

On 02/04/2013 THE ESTATE OF VINCENT GUS GIAMPAOLETTI was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts, Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6452

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GULDBECH, KATHLEEN

Decedent

GIAMPAOLETTI, VINCENT GUS AKA VINCENT GIAMPOALETTI

San Francisco, CA USA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CUSACK, MICHELE

Pollak & Cusack, 1701 Novato Blvd, Suite 304

Novato, CA 94947

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY, WILL FILED, FILED BY PETITIONER GULDBECH, KATHLEEN AS TO DECEDENT GIAMPAOLETTI, VINCENT GUS AKA VINCENT GIAMPOALETTI HEARING SET FOR MAR-06-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:450.00)

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PETITIONER GULDBECH, KATHLEEN

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

PROOF OF PUBLICATION (THE S.F. DAILY JOURNAL)

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE

NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE AND PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER GULDBECH, KATHLEEN

DECLARATION

DECLARATION [SUPPLEMENTAL] TO PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED BY PETITIONER GULDBECH, KATHLEEN

GENERIC PROBATE PLEADING

WILL ADMITTED INTO PROBATE

ORDER APPOINTING EXECUTOR/EXECUTRIX

ORDER APPOINTING EXECUTOR/EXECUTRIX, APPOINTMENT UNDER IAEA, NO BOND REQUIRED FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE GULDBECH, KATHLEEN

LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

LETTERS TESTAMENTARY ISSUED AND FILED GULDBECH, KATHLEEN APPOINTED WITH AUTHORITY UNDER THE IAEA

ACCOUNTING PETITION RE:

ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION FILED BY PETITIONER GULDBECH, KATHLEEN HEARING SET FOR DEC-16-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:435.00)

WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING

WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING (TWO) FILED BY PETITIONER GULDBECH, KATHLEEN

NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER GULDBECH, KATHLEEN

ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION

ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION

RECEIPT ON DISTRIBUTION

RECEIPT ON DISTRIBUTION FILED BY PETITIONER GULDBECH, KATHLEEN

EX PARTE PETITION FOR FINAL DISCHARGE AND ORDER

EX PARTE PETITION FOR FINAL DISCHARGE AND ORDER FILED BY PETITIONER GULDBECH, KATHLEEN

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE PETITION FOR FINAL DISCHARGE AND ORDER FILED BY PETITIONER GULDBECH, KATHLEEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT ON DISTRIBUTION FILED BY PETITIONER GULDBECH, KATHLEEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2013
  • ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION, CALENDAR OF DEC-16-2013, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER AS MODIFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PETITIONER GULDBECH, KATHLEEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING (TWO) FILED BY PETITIONER GULDBECH, KATHLEEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ACCOUNTING PETITION RE: REPORT, FEES, FINAL DISTRIBUTION FILED BY PETITIONER GULDBECH, KATHLEEN HEARING SET FOR DEC-16-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:435.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL FINAL FILED BY PETITIONER GULDBECH, KATHLEEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTERS TESTAMENTARY ISSUED AND FILED GULDBECH, KATHLEEN APPOINTED WITH AUTHORITY UNDER THE IAEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER APPOINTING EXECUTOR/EXECUTRIX, APPOINTMENT UNDER IAEA, NO BOND REQUIRED FILED BY PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE GULDBECH, KATHLEEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • COPYING FEES (1 PAGE, 1 CERTIFIED COPY) (Fee:25.50)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY, CALENDAR OF MAR-19-2013, GRANTED PER WRITTEN ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • WILL ADMITTED INTO PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION [SUPPLEMENTAL] TO PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED BY PETITIONER GULDBECH, KATHLEEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2013
  • PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY CONTINUED FROM MAR-06-2013 TO MAR-19-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 PER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE AND PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PETITIONER GULDBECH, KATHLEEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION (THE S.F. DAILY JOURNAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY PETITIONER GULDBECH, KATHLEEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND FOR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY, WILL FILED, FILED BY PETITIONER GULDBECH, KATHLEEN AS TO DECEDENT GIAMPAOLETTI, VINCENT GUS AKA VINCENT GIAMPOALETTI HEARING SET FOR MAR-06-2013 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPT 204 (Fee:450.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CUSACK, MICHELE